This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 01/24/2021 at 06:01:13 (UTC).

Andrew Drazdik, Jr. v. Secretary US Dept Education, et al

Case Summary

On 11/25/2020 Andrew Drazdik, Jr filed a Labor - National Labor Relations Act lawsuit against Secretary US Dept Education. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-3378

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - National Labor Relations Act

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees and Defendants

KEIZAI DOYUKAI, (Japan Association of Corporate Executives) (Corporate Management & Social Policy Research (Tokyo Japan)

UNIVERSITY OF PITTSBURGH, Office of University Counsel

TOKYO METROPOLITAN INDUSTRIAL BUREAU OF LABOR EMPLOYMENT, (Employment Department) (Toyko Japan)

SECRETARY UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION

UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF LABOR

OFFICE OF ENVIRONMENTAL INFORMATION, Minister's Secretariat, Ministry of the Environment (Tokyo Japan)

UNITED STATES OFFICE OF COMPENSATION AND WORK CONDITIONS

PENNSYLVANIA STATE BOARD OF EDUCATION

STATE BOARD OF EDUCATION

OFFICE OF COMPENSATION AND WORK CONDITIONS

Plaintiff / Appellant

ANDREW STEPHEN DRAZDIK, JR.

Jeannette, PA 15644

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee and Defendant Attorney

Laura S. Irwin Esq.

Attorney at Office of United States Attorney

700 Grant Street, Suite 4000

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Andrew Stephen Drazdik Jr.

313 Sunview Avenue

Jeannette, PA 15644

 

Court Documents

#1

Notice of Appeal

1 #2

District Court Opinion

1 #3

District Court Order

1 #4

Case Caption

1 #5

Case Opening Letter

3 #1

Send screening letter

3 #2

Rule 4a

#4

#5

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER (Clerk) dismissing case, pursuant to F.R.A.P. 3(a) and LAR 3.3 and Misc. 107.1(a), for failure to pay the filing fee for the notice of appeal. Case terminated on 01/04/2021. (MB) [Entered: 01/04/2021 02:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ECF FILER: LETTER from Attorney Laura S. Irwin, Esq. for Appellee Secretary United States Department of Education non-participation letter. Certificate of Service dated 11/30/2020. Service made by ECF, US mail. [20-3378] (LSI) [Entered: 11/30/2020 01:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) LEGAL DIVISION LETTER SENT advising that the case has been listed for possible dismissal due to jurisdictional defect. (SH) [Entered: 11/27/2020 04:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • Docket(#2) RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (AMR) [Entered: 11/25/2020 10:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Andrew Stephen Drazdik, Jr. in District Court No. 2-20-cv-01143. (AMR) [Entered: 11/25/2020 10:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Secretary of the United States Department of Education is a litigant

Latest cases where STATE BOARD OF EDUCATION is a litigant

Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Laura S. Irwin Esq.