This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 11/11/2019 at 06:07:49 (UTC).

Andrew Bennett, et al v. Jefferson County, Alabama

Case Summary

On 09/12/2019 Andrew Bennett filed a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit against Jefferson County, Alabama. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-13577

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

CARLYN R. CULPEPPER

SHARON OWENS

SHARON RICE

REGINALD THREADGILL

WILLIAM R. MUHAMMAD

DAVID RUSSELL

JOHN W. ROGERS, Alabama State Legislator

ANDREW BENNETT

FREDDIE H. JONES, II, Lt. Col. Rt.

RICKEY DAVIS, JR.

ANGELINA BLACKMON

RODERICK V. ROYAL, Former Birmingham City Council President

MARY MOORE, Alabam State Legislator

Defendant / Appellee

JEFFERSON COUNTY, ALABAMA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Calvin Grigsby

Attorney at Grigsby & Associates

2406 Saddleback Dr

Danville, CA 94506

David A. Sullivan

Attorney at David A. Sullivan Atty At Law

208 23Rd St N Ste 2

Birmingham, AL 35203

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Jay Robert Bender

Attorney at Bradley Arant Boult Cummings, LLP

1819 5Th Ave N

Birmingham, AL 35203

R. Aaron Chastain

Attorney at Bradley Arant Boult Cummings, LLP

1819 5Th Ave N

Birmingham, AL 35203

James B. Bailey

Attorney at Bradley Arant Boult Cummings, LLP

1819 5Th Ave N

Birmingham, AL 35203

Matthew Howard Lembke

Attorney at Bradley Arant Boult Cummings, LLP

1819 5Th Ave N

Birmingham, AL 35203

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #2

exhibit 1

Open Document #1

Motion to file civil appeals statement out of time

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #4

DKT-7CIV Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #3

DC #23 Memo & Opinion

Open Document #2

DC #24 Order

Open Document #1

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2019
  • Received paper copies of EBrief filed by Appellants Andrew Bennett, Angelina Blackmon, Carlyn R. Culpepper, Rickey Davis, Jr., Freddie H. Jones, II, Mary Moore, William R. Muhammad, Sharon Owens, Sharon Rice, John W. Rogers, Roderick V. Royal, Roderick V. Royal, David Russell and Reginald Threadgill. [Entered: 10/25/2019 02:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Appellant's brief filed by Andrew Bennett, Angelina Blackmon, Carlyn R. Culpepper, Rickey Davis, Jr., Freddie H. Jones, II, Mary Moore, William R. Muhammad, Sharon Owens, Sharon Rice, John W. Rogers, Roderick V. Royal, Roderick V. Royal, David Russell and Reginald Threadgill. [19-13577] (ECF: Calvin Grigsby) [Entered: 10/23/2019 12:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Calvin Grigsby for Appellants Andrew Bennett, Angelina Blackmon, Carlyn R. Culpepper, Rickey Davis, Jr., Freddie H. Jones, II, Mary Moore, William R. Muhammad, Sharon Owens, Sharon Rice, John W. Rogers, Roderick V. Royal, Roderick V. Royal, David Russell and Reginald Threadgill. [19-13577] (ECF: Calvin Grigsby) [Entered: 10/11/2019 12:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER: Motion for Leave to File civil appeal statement Out of Time filed by Appellants Andrew Bennett, Roderick V. Royal, Roderick V. Royal, Mary Moore, John W. Rogers, William R. Muhammad, David Russell, Carlyn R. Culpepper, Freddie H. Jones, II, Sharon Owens, Reginald Threadgill, Rickey Davis, Jr., Angelina Blackmon and Sharon Rice is GRANTED by clerk. [ # 8905958-2 ] [Entered: 10/15/2019 01:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney James B. Bailey for Appellee Jefferson County, Alabama. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-13577] (ECF: James Bailey) [Entered: 10/14/2019 04:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Supplemental to Motion to file Civil Appeal Statement Out of Time [ # 8905958-2 ], Motion to file civil appeal statement form [ # 8905958-3 ], Motion to file civil appeal statement form out of time [ # 8905958-4 ] filed by Appellants Andrew Bennett, Angelina Blackmon, Carlyn R. Culpepper, Rickey Davis, Jr., Freddie H. Jones, II, Mary Moore, William R. Muhammad, Sharon Owens, Sharon Rice, John W. Rogers, Roderick V. Royal, Roderick V. Royal, David Russell and Reginald Threadgill. [19-13577]--[Edited 10/17/2019 by CRL, to correct docket text and correct relief] (ECF: Calvin Grigsby) [Entered: 10/12/2019 05:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION for leave to file civil appeal statement out of timefiled by Andrew Bennett, Angelina Blackmon, Carlyn R. Culpepper, Rickey Davis, Jr., Freddie H. Jones, II, Mary Moore, William R. Muhammad, Sharon Owens, Sharon Rice, John W. Rogers, Roderick V. Royal, Roderick V. Royal, David Russell and Reginald Threadgill. Opposition to Motion is Unknown. [8905958-1] [19-13577] (ECF: Calvin Grigsby) [Entered: 10/12/2019 12:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • Notice of deficient Civil Appeal Statement filed by Calvin Grigsby for Andrew Bennett, Roderick V. Royal, Mary Moore, John W. Rogers, William R. Muhammad, David Russell, Carlyn R. Culpepper, Freddie H. Jones, II, Sharon Owens, Reginald Threadgill, Rickey Davis, Jr., Angelina Blackmon and Sharon Rice. please file a motion to file out of time as per the notice sent to you on 10/7. [Entered: 10/11/2019 01:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Andrew Bennett, et al Attorney Calvin Grigsby for Appellants Andrew Bennett, Angelina Blackmon, Carlyn R. Culpepper, Rickey Davis, Jr., Freddie H. Jones, II, Mary Moore, William R. Muhammad, Sharon Owens, Sharon Rice, John W. Rogers, Roderick V. Royal, Roderick V. Royal, David Russell and Reginald Threadgill. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-13577] (ECF: Calvin Grigsby) [Entered: 10/10/2019 05:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Calvin Grigsby for Andrew Bennett, Roderick V. Royal, Mary Moore, John W. Rogers, William R. Muhammad, David Russell, Carlyn R. Culpepper, Freddie H. Jones, II, Sharon Owens, Reginald Threadgill, Rickey Davis, Jr., Angelina Blackmon and Sharon Rice. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol CIP via the court's public web-page and have not filed the CIP via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 10/10/2019 03:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Calvin Grigsby for Appellants Andrew Bennett, Roderick V. Royal, Mary Moore, John W. Rogers, William R. Muhammad, David Russell, Carlyn R. Culpepper, Freddie H. Jones, II, Sharon Owens, Reginald Threadgill, Rickey Davis, Jr., Angelina Blackmon and Sharon Rice and David A. Sullivan for Appellants Andrew Bennett, Roderick V. Royal, Mary Moore, John W. Rogers, William R. Muhammad, David Russell, Carlyn R. Culpepper, Freddie H. Jones, II, Sharon Owens, Reginald Threadgill, Rickey Davis, Jr., Angelina Blackmon and Sharon Rice has been notified that upon expiration of fourteen (14) days from this date, this appeal will be dismissed by the clerk without further notice unless the required Civil Appeal Statement has been received. A motion to file the Civil Appeal Statement out of time should also be filed at this time. [Entered: 10/07/2019 03:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by David A. Sullivan for Andrew Bennett, Angelina Blackmon, Carlyn R. Culpepper, Rickey Davis, Jr., Freddie H. Jones, II, Mary Moore, William R. Muhammad, Sharon Owens, Sharon Rice, John W. Rogers, Roderick V. Royal, Roderick V. Royal, David Russell and Reginald Threadgill. [19-13577] (ECF: David Sullivan) [Entered: 09/20/2019 02:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by James B. Bailey for Jefferson County, Alabama. [19-13577] (ECF: James Bailey) [Entered: 09/19/2019 12:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Matthew Howard Lembke for Jefferson County, Alabama. [19-13577] (ECF: Matthew Lembke) [Entered: 09/19/2019 12:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Calvin Grigsby for Andrew Bennett, Angelina Blackmon, Carlyn R. Culpepper, Rickey Davis, Jr., Freddie H. Jones, II, Mary Moore, William R. Muhammad, Sharon Owens, Sharon Rice, John W. Rogers, Roderick V. Royal, Roderick V. Royal, David Russell and Reginald Threadgill. [19-13577] (ECF: Calvin Grigsby) [Entered: 09/19/2019 10:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellants Andrew Bennett, Angelina Blackmon, Carlyn R. Culpepper, Rickey Davis, Jr., Freddie H. Jones, II, Mary Moore, William R. Muhammad, Sharon Owens, Sharon Rice, John W. Rogers, Roderick V. Royal, Roderick V. Royal, David Russell and Reginald Threadgill on 08/29/2019. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 10/22/2019. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 09/26/2019 as to Appellant Andrew Bennett. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 10/10/2019 as to Appellee Jefferson County, Alabama [Entered: 09/16/2019 01:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JEFFERSON COUNTY, ALABAMA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jay R Bender(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James B Bailey(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew Howard Lembke