This case was last updated from PACER on 12/01/2021 at 07:01:51 (UTC).

Andrew Bamforth v. Facebook, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 10/12/2021 Andrew Bamforth filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Facebook, Inc . This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-16681

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

ANDREW DAVID BAMFORTH

Walnut, CA 91789

Defendant / Appellees

FACEBOOK, INC.

MARK ZUCKERBERG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Andrew David Bamforth

340 S. Lemon Ave., No. 3051

Walnut, CA 91789

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Angela Dunning

Attorney at Cooley, LLP

3175 Hanover Street

Palo Alto, CA 94304

Bobby Ghajar Esquire

Attorney at Cooley, LLP

1333 2Nd Street, Suite 400

Santa Monica, CA 90401

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Pro Se Case Opening Packet

#2

(#2) Streamlined request by Appellant Andrew David Bamforth to extend time to file the brief is approved. Amended briefing schedule: Appellant Andrew David Bamforth opening brief due 02/17/2022. Appellees Facebook, Inc. and Mark Zuckerberg answering brief due 03/21/2022. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [12268234] (JN) [Entered: 10/25/2021 05:07 PM]

#3

(#3) Filed order MEDIATION (CL): The Mediation Program of the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. See Fed. R. App. P. 33 and Ninth Cir. R. 33-1. As part of a pilot project, the Mediation Program is exploring settlement potential in some cases in which one party is proceeding pro se (representing themselves without the assistance of an attorney). This case is being included in the pilot project. The court has scheduled a dial-in telephone assessment conference at the date and time indicated above to explore settlement potential. Participants with an email address on the attached list will receive an email with dial-in information. If an email address is not listed or if there are any changes or additions to the list, please notify the Mediation Office at mediation@ca9.uscourts.gov. Participants may also leave a message at (415) 355-7900 to request dial-in information. Finally, please notify Circuit Mediator Kyungah Suk immediately by email (Kay_Suk@ca9.uscourts.gov) if a participant has an unavoidable scheduling conflict. Please copy all participants on any such communications. All emails should include the Ninth Circuit case name and number in the subject line. All written or spoken communication with the mediator, including the discussions during the scheduled conference, are strictly confidential mediation communications protected by Ninth Circuit Rule 33-1 and cannot be disclosed outside the mediation process. Additional information about confidentiality (including a copy of Ninth Circuit Rule 33-1), the assessment conference, and the Mediation Program are attached and can also be found at the Mediation Program website (www.ca9.uscourts.gov/mediation). The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. (Date: November 23, 2021 Time: 10:00 a.m. PACIFIC TIME) (SEE ORDER FOR FULL TEXT) [12276863] (AF) [Entered: 11/03/2021 10:27 AM]

#4

(#4) Filed order MEDIATION (KS): A dial-in telephone conference will be held on January 20, 2022, at 10:00 a.m. Pacific Time, with plaintiff-appellant Andrew David Bamforth only. Participant will receive an email with dial-in information. Please notify the Mediation Office at mediation@ca9.uscourts.gov if counsel does not receive an email or if additional participants should be added. [12301201] (AF) [Entered: 11/30/2021 11:54 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Filed order MEDIATION (KS): A dial-in telephone conference will be held on January 20, 2022, at 10:00 a.m. Pacific Time, with plaintiff-appellant Andrew David Bamforth only. Participant will receive an email with dial-in information. Please notify the Mediation Office at mediation@ca9.uscourts.gov if counsel does not receive an email or if additional participants should be added. [12301201] (AF) [Entered: 11/30/2021 11:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filed order MEDIATION (CL): The Mediation Program of the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. See Fed. R. App. P. 33 and Ninth Cir. R. 33-1. As part of a pilot project, the Mediation Program is exploring settlement potential in some cases in which one party is proceeding pro se (representing themselves without the assistance of an attorney). This case is being included in the pilot project. The court has scheduled a dial-in telephone assessment conference at the date and time indicated above to explore settlement potential. Participants with an email address on the attached list will receive an email with dial-in information. If an email address is not listed or if there are any changes or additions to the list, please notify the Mediation Office at mediation@ca9.uscourts.gov. Participants may also leave a message at (415) 355-7900 to request dial-in information. Finally, please notify Circuit Mediator Kyungah Suk immediately by email (Kay_Suk@ca9.uscourts.gov) if a participant has an unavoidable scheduling conflict. Please copy all participants on any such communications. All emails should include the Ninth Circuit case name and number in the subject line. All written or spoken communication with the mediator, including the discussions during the scheduled conference, are strictly confidential mediation communications protected by Ninth Circuit Rule 33-1 and cannot be disclosed outside the mediation process. Additional information about confidentiality (including a copy of Ninth Circuit Rule 33-1), the assessment conference, and the Mediation Program are attached and can also be found at the Mediation Program website (www.ca9.uscourts.gov/mediation). The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. (Date: November 23, 2021 Time: 10:00 a.m. PACIFIC TIME) (SEE ORDER FOR FULL TEXT) [12276863] (AF) [Entered: 11/03/2021 10:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Streamlined request by Appellant Andrew David Bamforth to extend time to file the brief is approved. Amended briefing schedule: Appellant Andrew David Bamforth opening brief due 02/17/2022. Appellees Facebook, Inc. and Mark Zuckerberg answering brief due 03/21/2022. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [12268234] (JN) [Entered: 10/25/2021 05:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Transcript ordered by 11/08/2021. Transcript due 12/07/2021. Appellant Andrew David Bamforth opening brief due 01/18/2022. Appellees Facebook, Inc. and Mark Zuckerberg answering brief due 02/17/2022. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12253681] (JBS) [Entered: 10/12/2021 11:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Facebook is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bobby A. Ghajar

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Angela Lucille Dunning