This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/02/2021 at 07:02:36 (UTC).

Andrea Schmitt, et al v. Kaiser Foundation Health Plan

Case Summary

On 10/12/2018 Andrea Schmitt filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Kaiser Foundation Health Plan. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    18-35846

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Amicus Curiae

DISABILITY RIGHTS EDUCATION AND DEFENSE FUND

HEARING LOSS ASSOCIATION, OREGON STATE ASSOCIATION

WASHINGTON STATE COMMUNICATION ACCESS PROJECT

HEARING LOSS ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA

CALIFORNIA COMMUNICATION ACCESS PROJECT

NORTHWEST HEALTH LAW ADVOCATES

NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF THE DEAF

BAZELON CENTER FOR MENTAL HEALTH LAW

OREGON COMMUNICATION ACCESS PROJECT

NATIONAL HEALTH LAW PROGRAM, INC.

ASSOCIATION OF CALIFORNIA LIFE AND HEALTH INSURANCE COMPANIES

CALIFORNIA ASSOCIATION OF HEALTH PLANS

Plaintiff / Appellants

ELIZABETH MOHUNDRO, on her own behalf, and on behalf of all similarly situated individuals

ANDREA SCHMITT, on her own behalf, and on behalf of all similarly situated individuals

Defendant / Appellees

KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN OF THE NORTHWEST

KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN, INC

KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN OF WASHINGTON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Amicus Curiae Attorneys

Carly Alexis Myers

Attorney at Disability Rights Education and Defense Fund

3075 Adeline Street, Suite 210

Berkeley, CA 94703

Sarah Somers

Attorney at National Health Law Program

200 N Greensboro Street, Suite D-13

Carrboro, NC 27510

Joseph Edward Laska Esquire III

Attorney at Manatt Phelps & Phillips, LLP

One Embarcadero Center, 30Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Richard E. Spoonemore

Attorney at Sirianni Youtz Spoonemore Hamburger PLLC

3101 Western Avenue, Suite 350

Seattle, WA 98121

Eleanor Hamburger

Attorney at Sirianni Youtz Spoonemore Hamburger PLLC

3101 Western Avenue, Suite 350

Seattle, WA 98121

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Mark A. Bailey Esquire

Attorney at Karr Tuttle Campbell

701 Fifth Avenue

Seattle, WA 98104

Medora A. Marisseau

Attorney at Karr Tuttle Campbell

701 Fifth Avenue

Seattle, WA 98104

 

Court Documents

#62

#61

#60

#59

#57

#56

#55

#54

16 #2

Motion - Referred

7 #1

ER Vol 1

#6

#5

#4

#3

2 #4

Docketing Letter

2 #3

MQ

#2

letter

2 #1

Main Document

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#62) MANDATE ISSUED.(RMG, JHN and GAP) [11813303] (JFF) [Entered: 09/04/2020 07:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#61) Filed order (RONALD M. GOULD, JACQUELINE H. NGUYEN and GREGORY A. PRESNELL) The panel has voted to deny the petition for rehearing en banc, and Judge Presnell has so recommended. The full court has been advised of the petition for rehearing en banc and no judge has requested a vote on whether to rehear the matter en banc. Fed. R. App. P. 35. The petition for rehearing en banc is denied. [11804603] (WL) [Entered: 08/27/2020 10:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) Filed (ECF) Appellants Elizabeth Mohundro and Andrea Schmitt response to Petition for Rehearing En Banc (ECF Filing), Petition for Rehearing En Banc (ECF Filing). Date of service: 08/20/2020. [11797148]. [18-35846] (Hamburger, Eleanor) [Entered: 08/20/2020 04:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [ # 57 ] submitted by Association of California Life and Health Insurance Companies and California Association of Health Plans is filed. No paper copies are required at this time. [11782950] (KT) [Entered: 08/10/2020 11:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • Docket(#58) Entered appearance of Amici Curiae Association of California Life and Health Insurance Companies and California Association of Health Plans. [11782934] (KT) [Entered: 08/10/2020 11:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by Association of California Life and Health Insurance Companies and California Association of Health Plans. Date of service: 08/07/2020. [11782035] [18-35846] (McCallum, Joanna) [Entered: 08/07/2020 05:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) Filed order (RONALD M. GOULD, JACQUELINE H. NGUYEN and GREGORY A. PRESNELL) Appellants are directed to file a response to the petition for rehearing en banc filed with this court on July 28, 2020. The response shall not exceed 15 pages or 4,200 words, and shall be filed within 21 days of the date of this order. Parties who are registered for Appellate ECF must file the response electronically without submission of paper copies. Parties who are not registered Appellate ECF filers must file the original response. [11772893] (WL) [Entered: 07/31/2020 10:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) Filed (ECF) Appellees Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of the Northwest, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Washington and Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc petition for rehearing en banc (from 07/14/2020 opinion). Date of service: 07/28/2020. [11770046] [18-35846] (Marisseau, Medora) [Entered: 07/28/2020 09:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) Filed (ECF) Appellees Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of the Northwest and Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Washington Correspondence : Exhibits to petition for rehearing en banc. Date of service: 07/28/2020. [11769944] [18-35846]--[COURT UPDATE: Updated docket text to reflect correct ECF filing type. 07/29/2020 by SLM] (Marisseau, Medora) [Entered: 07/28/2020 04:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [ # 16 ] submitted by Disability Rights Education and Defense Fund, et al. is filed. No paper copies are required at this time. [11753182] (KT) [Entered: 07/14/2020 05:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 01/24/2019
  • Docket(#10) Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Answering Brief by Appellees Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of the Northwest, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Washington and Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. New requested due date is 03/21/2019. [11165855] [18-35846] (Marisseau, Medora) [Entered: 01/24/2019 03:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Filed (ECF) Errata to Opening Brief ([ # 6 ] Brief Submitted for Review (ECF Filing)). Filed by Appellants Elizabeth Mohundro and Andrea Schmitt. Date of service: 01/24/2019. [11164722] [18-35846] (Hamburger, Eleanor) [Entered: 01/24/2019 10:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Filed clerk order: The opening brief [ # 6 ] submitted by Elizabeth Mohundro and Andrea Schmitt is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification (attached to the end of each copy of the brief) that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: blue. The Court has reviewed the excerpts of record [ # 7 ] submitted by Elizabeth Mohundro and Andrea Schmitt. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 4 copies of the excerpts in paper format securely bound on the left side, with white covers. The paper copies shall be submitted to the principal office of the Clerk. [11163637] (LA) [Entered: 01/23/2019 02:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Submitted (ECF) excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellants Elizabeth Mohundro and Andrea Schmitt. Date of service: 01/22/2019. [11162398] [18-35846] (Hamburger, Eleanor) [Entered: 01/22/2019 05:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Submitted (ECF) Opening Brief for review. Submitted by Appellants Elizabeth Mohundro and Andrea Schmitt. Date of service: 01/22/2019. [11162393] [18-35846] (Hamburger, Eleanor) [Entered: 01/22/2019 05:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant further settlement discussions. The briefing schedule previously established by the court remains in effect. [11075568] (LW) [Entered: 11/07/2018 03:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The Mediation Program of the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. By 11/02/2018, counsel for all parties intending to file briefs in this matter are requested to inform the Circuit Mediator by email of their clients' views on whether the issues on appeal or the underlying dispute might be amenable to settlement presently or in the foreseeable future. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested... This communication should not be filed with the court... The existing briefing schedule remains in effect... [11057032] (LW) [Entered: 10/23/2018 11:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filed (ECF) Appellants Elizabeth Mohundro and Andrea Schmitt Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 10/18/2018. [11052354] [18-35846] (Hamburger, Eleanor) [Entered: 10/18/2018 03:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 10/19/2018. Transcript ordered by 11/13/2018. Transcript due 12/10/2018. Appellants Elizabeth Mohundro and Andrea Schmitt opening brief due 01/22/2019. Appellees Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of Washington, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of the Northwest and Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc answering brief due 02/19/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11045245] (KM) [Entered: 10/12/2018 01:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • Docket(#1) Entered appearance of Appellees Kaiser Foundation Health Plan of the Northwest and Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. [11045234] (KM) [Entered: 10/12/2018 01:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where National Health Law Program is a litigant

Latest cases where NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF THE DEAF is a litigant

Latest cases where Northwest Health Law Advocates is a litigant

Latest cases where CALIFORNIA ASSOCIATION OF HEALTH PLANS is a litigant