This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2019 at 06:06:09 (UTC).

Andre Slaton v. Florida Department of Corr., et al

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 Andre Slaton filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Florida Department of Corr . This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-12729

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Respondent / Appellees

ATTORNEY GENERAL, STATE OF FLORIDA

FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS

Petitioner / Appellant

ANDRE SLATON

Miami, FL 33194

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent / Appellee Attorneys

Douglas James Glaid

Attorney at Attorney General's Office

1 Se 3Rd Ave Ste 900

Miami, FL 33131

Magaly Rodriguez

Attorney at Attorney General's Office

1 Se 3Rd Ave Ste 900

Miami, FL 33131

Ashley Moody

Attorney at Attorney General's Office

1 Se 3Rd Ave Ste 900

Miami, FL 33131

Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

Andre Slaton

Attorney at Everglades CI - Inmate Legal Mail

1599 Sw 187Th Ave

Miami, FL 33194

 

Court Documents

Open Document

This APPELLANT has been notified that upon expiration of fourteen (14) days from this date, this appeal will be dismissed by the clerk without further notice unless the required filing fee has been received or a motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis is filed in the District Court. The appellant is being served with this letter. [Entered: 08/08/2019 11:35 AM]

Open Document #2

Habeas Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #3

DC Order denying Motions Doc 66

Open Document #1

HAB-1 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Magaly Rodriguez for Attorney General, State of Florida and Florida Department of Corrections and Ashley Moody for Attorney General, State of Florida and Florida Department of Corrections. [19-12729] (ECF: Magaly Rodriguez) [Entered: 08/23/2019 08:35 AM]

Open Document

USDC order denying COA as to Appellant Andre Slaton was filed on 03/28/2019. Docket Entry 62. [Entered: 07/19/2019 05:24 PM]

Open Document #4

DC Order adopting R&R Doc 62

Open Document

ENTRY OF DISMISSAL: Pursuant to the 11th Cir.R.42-1(b), this appeal is DISMISSED for want of prosecution because the appellant Andre Slaton failed to pay the filing and docketing fees to the district court, or alternatively, file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis in the district court within the time fixed by the rules [Entered: 09/09/2019 03:03 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Andre Slaton. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 08/01/2019 11:51 AM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Magaly Rodriguez for Florida dep't of Corr. et al,. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-12729] (ECF: Magaly Rodriguez) [Entered: 08/27/2019 12:35 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ENTRY OF DISMISSAL: Pursuant to the 11th Cir.R.42-1(b), this appeal is DISMISSED for want of prosecution because the appellant Andre Slaton failed to pay the filing and docketing fees to the district court, or alternatively, file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis in the district court within the time fixed by the rules [Entered: 09/09/2019 03:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Magaly Rodriguez for Florida dep't of Corr. et al,. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-12729] (ECF: Magaly Rodriguez) [Entered: 08/27/2019 12:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Magaly Rodriguez for Attorney General, State of Florida and Florida Department of Corrections and Ashley Moody for Attorney General, State of Florida and Florida Department of Corrections. [19-12729] (ECF: Magaly Rodriguez) [Entered: 08/23/2019 08:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Douglas James Glaid for Florida Department of Corrections and Attorney General, State of Florida, Ashley Moody for Florida Department of Corrections and Attorney General, State of Florida and Magaly Rodriguez for Florida Department of Corrections and Attorney General, State of Florida. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol CIP via the court's public web-page and have not filed the CIP via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 08/20/2019 02:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • This APPELLANT has been notified that upon expiration of fourteen (14) days from this date, this appeal will be dismissed by the clerk without further notice unless the required filing fee has been received or a motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis is filed in the District Court. The appellant is being served with this letter. [Entered: 08/08/2019 11:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Andre Slaton. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 08/01/2019 11:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • USDC order denying COA as to Appellant Andre Slaton was filed on 03/28/2019. Docket Entry 62. [Entered: 07/19/2019 05:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HABEAS APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Andre Slaton on 07/15/2019. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. [Entered: 07/19/2019 05:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.