This case was last updated from PACER on 03/02/2020 at 06:01:54 (UTC).

Andre Juste v. Officer Lawrence

Case Summary

On 01/02/2020 Andre Juste filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Officer Lawrence. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1005

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

OFFICER LAWRENCE, City of Martinsburg Police Officer

CITY OF MARTINSBURG, WEST VIRGINIA

MARTINSBURG POLICE DEPARTMENT

Plaintiff / Appellant

ANDRE JUSTE

Washington, DC 20001

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Andre Juste

60 O Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20001

 

Court Documents

5 #1

Informal Briefing Order

7 #3

Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis

#8

(#8) MOTION by Andre Juste for leave to file electronically. [1000690484] [20-1005] EB [Entered: 02/25/2020 02:31 PM]

5 #2

Disclosure Form

7 #2

Informal Opening Brief and Directions

#9

(#9) ORDER filed granting Motion for leave to file electronically [ # 8 ] Copies to all parties.. [1000690553] [20-1005] MFT [Entered: 02/25/2020 03:02 PM]

10 #3

Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis

4 #2

Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis

10 #2

Informal Brief and Directions

7 #4

Disclosure Form

7 #1

Rule 45 Notice

#1

(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 3:19-cv-00098-GMG. Case manager: EBorneisen. [20-1005] EB [Entered: 01/02/2020 03:08 PM]

10 #1

Rule 45 Notice

10 #4

Disclosure Form

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SECOND RULE 45 NOTICE issued to Andre Juste re: failure to satisfy fee and informal briefing requirements. Case will be dismissed if default is not cured within 15 days. [20-1005] EB [Entered: 02/28/2020 09:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER filed granting Motion for leave to file electronically [ # 8 ] Copies to all parties.. [1000690553] [20-1005] MFT [Entered: 02/25/2020 03:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION by Andre Juste for leave to file electronically. [1000690484] [20-1005] EB [Entered: 02/25/2020 02:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RULE 45 NOTICE issued to Andre Juste re: failure to satisfy fee and informal briefing requirements. Case will be dismissed if default is not cured within 15 days. Mailed to: Andre Juste. [20-1005] EB [Entered: 02/10/2020 03:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Andre Juste. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [20-1005] EB [Entered: 01/02/2020 03:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) FEE NOTICE issued to Andre Juste - initial notice. Fee or application to proceed as indigent due 02/03/2020. Originating case number: 3:19-cv-00098-GMG. Mailed to: Andre Juste. [20-1005] EB [Entered: 01/02/2020 03:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • Docket(#2) ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 3:19-cv-00098-GMG. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. [20-1005] EB [Entered: 01/02/2020 03:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 3:19-cv-00098-GMG. Case manager: EBorneisen. [20-1005] EB [Entered: 01/02/2020 03:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.