This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 11/06/2022 at 06:04:33 (UTC).

Andre Dennison v. Charles Ryan, et al

Case Summary

On 09/07/2022 Andre Dennison filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Charles Ryan,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-16338

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

ANDRE ALMOND DENNISON

Florence, AZ 85132

Defendant / Appellees

CHARLES L. RYAN, Director of ADOC

SERGEANT MASTERSON, First name unknown

SERGEANT STEBER, First name unknown

SERGEANT DARRAS, First name unknown

CO II KREIBEL, First name unknown

CO II LOPEZ, First name unknown

CO III WOOD, First name unknown

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Andre Almond Dennison

Attorney at ASPCE - ARIZONA STATE PRISON COMPLEX (EYMAN)

P.O. Box 3200

Florence, AZ 85132

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Kathleen L. Wieneke

Attorney at Wieneke Law Group

1225 W Washington Street, Suite 313

Tempe, AZ 85288

Laura Anne Van Buren

Attorney at Wieneke Law Group

1225 W Washington Street, Suite 313

Tempe, AZ 85288

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to all Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Case Opening Packet

#2

(#2) CLERK ORDER FILED (Deputy Clerk CKP) Prisoner fee authorization form sent to prisoner. [12534883] (CKP) [Entered: 09/07/2022 11:34 AM]

#3

(#3) Received PLRA authorization response from appellant. Dated 09/26/2022. [12550282] (HH) [Entered: 09/27/2022 09:58 AM]

4 #1

Main Document

4 #2

Prisoner Fee Authorization

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CLERK ORDER FILED (Deputy Clerk CKP) Prisoner completed authorization fee order. [12550521] (CKP) [Entered: 09/27/2022 11:42 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Received PLRA authorization response from appellant. Dated 09/26/2022. [12550282] (HH) [Entered: 09/27/2022 09:58 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CLERK ORDER FILED (Deputy Clerk CKP) Prisoner fee authorization form sent to prisoner. [12534883] (CKP) [Entered: 09/07/2022 11:34 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Andre Almond Dennison opening brief due 11/07/2022. Appellees Darras, Kreibel, Lopez, Masterson, Charles L. Ryan, Steber and Wood answering brief due 12/05/2022. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12534778] (JMR) [Entered: 09/07/2022 10:37 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CHARLES RYAN, Director of ADOC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kathleen L Wieneke