This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 10/16/2020 at 06:11:07 (UTC).

Andrade, et al v. Board of County Commissioners, et al

Case Summary

On 08/17/2020 Andrade filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Board of County Commissioners. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-2120

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

NAOMI GRIEGO

KIMBERLY SCHREPFER

CYNTHIA RAMONA CHAVEZ

DARLENE ANDRADE

MONICA RENEE CHAVEZ

CHRISTINA CANDELARIA

Defendant / Appellees

SERGEANT JAMES BRANDON, in his individual capacity

SERGEANT JASON ROLSTON, in his individual capacity

BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS OF THE COUNTY OF BERNALILLO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Shannon L. Kennedy

Attorney at Kennedy Kennedy & Ives

1000 2Nd Street Nw

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Adam C. Flores

Attorney at Kennedy Kennedy & Ives

1000 2Nd Street Nw

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Erin L. Chavez

Attorney at Kennedy Kennedy & Ives

1000 2Nd Street Nw

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Joseph P. Kennedy

Attorney at Kennedy Kennedy & Ives

1000 2Nd Street Nw

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Douglas Edward Gardner

Attorney at Robles, Rael & Anaya

500 Marquette Avenue, Nw, Suite 700

Albuquerque, NM 87102

 

Court Documents

Open Document

[10771681] On the court's own motion and pursuant to 10th Cir. R. 33.1, order filed by (CLK) extending time to file appellants' brief and appendix until 11/03/2020. Appellant/Petitioner's brief due on 11/03/2020 for Darlene Andrade, Christina Candelaria, Cynthia Ramona Chavez, Monica Renee Chavez, Naomi Griego, and Kimberly Schrepfer. --[Edited 09/21/2020 by SDS to correct a typographical error] [20-2120] [Entered: 09/18/2020 03:37 PM]

Open Document #2

Mediation Contact Form

Open Document #1

Mediation Conference Notice

Open Document

[10767148] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 09/01/2020. Appellants' brief and appendix due on 10/13/2020 for Darlene Andrade, Christina Candelaria, Cynthia Ramona Chavez, Monica Renee Chavez, Naomi Griego and Kimberly Schrepfer. [20-2120] [Entered: 09/01/2020 04:12 PM]

Open Document

[10767144] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Douglas Edward Gardner for Board of County Commissioners of the County of Bernalillo, Jason Rolston and James Brandon. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 09/01/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-2120] [Entered: 09/01/2020 04:05 PM]

Open Document

[10766843] Entry of appearance filed by Adam C. Flores and Mr. Joseph P. Kennedy for Darlene Andrade, Christina Candelaria, Cynthia Ramona Chavez, Monica Renee Chavez, Naomi Griego and Kimberly Schrepfer. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Interested party already in the appeal. Served on 08/31/2020. Manner of Service: email [20-2120] [Entered: 09/01/2020 08:00 AM]

Open Document

[10766809] Notice that a transcript is not necessary for this appeal filed by Darlene Andrade, Christina Candelaria, Cynthia Ramona Chavez, Monica Renee Chavez and Kimberly Schrepfer. Transcript ordered: Served on: 08/31/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-2120] --[Edited 09/01/2020 by AT to updated text and use correct event code.] JPK [Entered: 08/31/2020 06:07 PM]

Open Document

[10766807] Docketing statement filed by Darlene Andrade, Christina Candelaria, Cynthia Ramona Chavez, Monica Renee Chavez and Kimberly Schrepfer. Served on 08/31/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-2120] JPK [Entered: 08/31/2020 05:51 PM]

Open Document #2

General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil

Open Document #1

Main Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10771681] On the court's own motion and pursuant to 10th Cir. R. 33.1, order filed by (CLK) extending time to file appellants' brief and appendix until 11/03/2020. Appellant/Petitioner's brief due on 11/03/2020 for Darlene Andrade, Christina Candelaria, Cynthia Ramona Chavez, Monica Renee Chavez, Naomi Griego, and Kimberly Schrepfer. --[Edited 09/21/2020 by SDS to correct a typographical error] [20-2120] [Entered: 09/18/2020 03:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10771649] Notice of Mediation Conference filed by the Tenth Circuit Mediation Office. Telephone conference scheduled for 10/06/2020 at 9:00 am (MT). The mediation contact form must be completed and returned to the Mediation Office within four days of the date of this notice. [Please open the Notice for important information.] [20-2120] [Entered: 09/18/2020 02:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10767148] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 09/01/2020. Appellants' brief and appendix due on 10/13/2020 for Darlene Andrade, Christina Candelaria, Cynthia Ramona Chavez, Monica Renee Chavez, Naomi Griego and Kimberly Schrepfer. [20-2120] [Entered: 09/01/2020 04:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10767144] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Douglas Edward Gardner for Board of County Commissioners of the County of Bernalillo, Jason Rolston and James Brandon. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 09/01/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-2120] [Entered: 09/01/2020 04:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • Docket[10767134] Entry of appearance submitted by Douglas E. Gardner for Appellees Board of County Commissioners of the County of Bernalillo, Jason Rolston and James Brandon for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 09/01/2020. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 09/01/2020 by SDS to remove pdf from entry as the pleading has been filed] [20-2120] DEG [Entered: 09/01/2020 03:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • Docket[10766939] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 09/08/2020 for Mitchell R. Elfers, Clerk of Court (oclk). (Text Only - No Attachment) [20-2120] [Entered: 09/01/2020 10:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10766843] Entry of appearance filed by Adam C. Flores and Mr. Joseph P. Kennedy for Darlene Andrade, Christina Candelaria, Cynthia Ramona Chavez, Monica Renee Chavez, Naomi Griego and Kimberly Schrepfer. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Interested party already in the appeal. Served on 08/31/2020. Manner of Service: email [20-2120] [Entered: 09/01/2020 08:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10766809] Notice that a transcript is not necessary for this appeal filed by Darlene Andrade, Christina Candelaria, Cynthia Ramona Chavez, Monica Renee Chavez and Kimberly Schrepfer. Transcript ordered: Served on: 08/31/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-2120] --[Edited 09/01/2020 by AT to updated text and use correct event code.] JPK [Entered: 08/31/2020 06:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • Docket[10766808] Entry of appearance submitted by Joseph P. Kennedy ; Adam C. Flores for Appellants Darlene Andrade, Christina Candelaria, Cynthia Ramona Chavez, Monica Renee Chavez and Kimberly Schrepfer for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 08/31/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-2120]--[Edited 09/01/2020 by LG to remove PDF from entry, as pleading was filed on 9/1/2020] JPK [Entered: 08/31/2020 06:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10766807] Docketing statement filed by Darlene Andrade, Christina Candelaria, Cynthia Ramona Chavez, Monica Renee Chavez and Kimberly Schrepfer. Served on 08/31/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-2120] JPK [Entered: 08/31/2020 05:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10763463] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 08/17/2020 Docketing statement, notice of appearance, and transcript order form due 08/31/2020 for Darlene Andrade, Christina Candelaria, Cynthia Ramona Chavez, Monica Renee Chavez, Naomi Griego and Kimberly Schrepfer. Notice of appearance due on 08/31/2020 for Board of County Commissioners of the County of Bernalillo, James Brandon, and Jason Rolston [20-2120] [Entered: 08/17/2020 04:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Douglas E Gardner