This case was last updated from PACER on 03/19/2019 at 06:09:31 (UTC).

Anders v. Verizon Communications Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/18/2019 Anders filed a Government Benefit - Government Benefit Recovery lawsuit against Verizon Communications Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-191

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Government Benefit Recovery

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant

Does 1 through 9

Plaintiff / Appellants

Reggie Anders

Underdog Trucking, LLC

Defendant / Appellees

Verizon Communications Inc.

Reverend Al Sharpton

National Action Network

Cellco Partnership, DBA Verizon Wireless

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Japheth Matemu Esq.

Attorney at Matemu Law Office P.C

5640 Six Forks Road

Raleigh, NC 27609

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Raymond G. McGuire Esq.

Attorney at Kauff McGuire & Margolis, LLP

950 3Rd Avenue

New York, NY 10022

David A. Thompson Esq.

Attorney at Stecklow & Thompson

217 Centre Street

New York, NY 10013

 

Court Documents

#32

(#32) OPPOSITION TO MOTION, to reinstate appeal [ # 27 ], to reinstate appeal [20], to reinstate appeal [18], on behalf of Appellee Cellco Partnership and Verizon Communications Inc., FILED. Service date 03/11/2019 by CM/ECF. [2514862] [19-191] [Entered: 03/11/2019 02:01 PM]

29 #3

Supporting Document

29 #2

Supporting Document

29 #1

Form C FILED

#28

(#28) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Reggie Anders and Underdog Trucking, LLC, FILED. Service date 02/28/2019 by CM/ECF.[2507723] [19-191] [Entered: 02/28/2019 01:37 PM]

27 #2

Supporting Document

27 #1

Motion FILED

#25

(#25) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, [23], on behalf of Appellant Reggie Anders and Underdog Trucking, LLC, FILED.[2507026] [19-191] [Entered: 02/27/2019 04:38 PM]

#24

(#24) FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Reggie Anders and Underdog Trucking, LLC, FILED. Service date 02/27/2019 by CM/ECF.[2506835] [19-191] [Entered: 02/27/2019 03:20 PM]

#11

(#11) ORDER, dated 02/05/2019, dismissing appeal by 02/19/2019 uinless Appellants Reggie Anders and Underdog Trucking, LLC, submit Form C, FILED.[2489479] [19-191] [Entered: 02/05/2019 11:52 AM]

#10

(#10) ORDER, dated 02/05/2019, dismissing appeal by 02/19/2019, unless Appellants Reggie Anders and Underdog Trucking, LLC, submits an Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance Form, FILED.[2489457] [19-191] [Entered: 02/05/2019 11:42 AM]

#9

(#9) NOTICE, to Appellees Cellco Partnership and Verizon Communications Inc., for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[2489397] [19-191] [Entered: 02/05/2019 11:07 AM]

#8

(#8) NOTICE, to Appellees National Action Network and Al Sharpton, for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[2489391] [19-191] [Entered: 02/05/2019 11:03 AM]

4 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

4 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#2

(#2) DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 12/17/2018, RECEIVED.[2478189] [19-191] [Entered: 01/18/2019 11:47 AM]

1 #2

Case FILED

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) OPPOSITION TO MOTION, to reinstate appeal [ # 27 ], to reinstate appeal [20], to reinstate appeal [18], on behalf of Appellee Cellco Partnership and Verizon Communications Inc., FILED. Service date 03/11/2019 by CM/ECF. [2514862] [19-191] [Entered: 03/11/2019 02:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) CURED DEFECTIVE MOTION, to reinstate, form C and Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance Form [ # 29 ], [ # 28 ], [ # 27 ], on behalf of Appellant Reggie Anders, FILED.[2513211] [19-191] [Entered: 03/08/2019 08:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Reggie Anders and Underdog Trucking, LLC, FILED. Service date 02/28/2019 by CM/ECF.[2508128] [19-191] [Entered: 02/28/2019 05:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Reggie Anders and Underdog Trucking, LLC, FILED. Service date 02/28/2019 by CM/ECF.[2507723] [19-191] [Entered: 02/28/2019 01:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) MOTION, to reinstate appeal, on behalf of Appellant Reggie Anders and Underdog Trucking, LLC, FILED. Service date 02/28/2019 by CM/ECF. [2507236] [19-191] [Entered: 02/28/2019 09:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, [23], on behalf of Appellant Reggie Anders and Underdog Trucking, LLC, FILED.[2507026] [19-191] [Entered: 02/27/2019 04:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Reggie Anders and Underdog Trucking, LLC, FILED. Service date 02/27/2019 by CM/ECF.[2506835] [19-191] [Entered: 02/27/2019 03:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • (#23) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Underdog Trucking, LLC and Reggie Anders, FILED. Service date 02/27/2019 by CM/ECF.[2506828] [19-191] [Entered: 02/27/2019 03:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, MOTION, to reinstate appeal, FORM C, [20], [21], on behalf of Appellant Underdog Trucking, LLC, FILED.[2506709] [19-191] [Entered: 02/27/2019 02:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • (#21) FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Underdog Trucking, LLC, FILED. Service date 02/27/2019 by CM/ECF.[2506682] [19-191] [Entered: 02/27/2019 01:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Cellco Partnership and Verizon Communications Inc., FILED. Service date 02/05/2019 by CM/ECF.[2489639] [19-191] [Entered: 02/05/2019 01:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER, dated 02/05/2019, dismissing appeal by 02/19/2019, unless Appellants Reggie Anders and Underdog Trucking, LLC, submits Form D, FILED.[2489499] [19-191] [Entered: 02/05/2019 11:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER, dated 02/05/2019, dismissing appeal by 02/19/2019 uinless Appellants Reggie Anders and Underdog Trucking, LLC, submit Form C, FILED.[2489479] [19-191] [Entered: 02/05/2019 11:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER, dated 02/05/2019, dismissing appeal by 02/19/2019, unless Appellants Reggie Anders and Underdog Trucking, LLC, submits an Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance Form, FILED.[2489457] [19-191] [Entered: 02/05/2019 11:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE, to Appellees Cellco Partnership and Verizon Communications Inc., for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[2489397] [19-191] [Entered: 02/05/2019 11:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE, to Appellees National Action Network and Al Sharpton, for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[2489391] [19-191] [Entered: 02/05/2019 11:03 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • (#5) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellants Reggie Anders and Underdog Trucking, LLC, district court receipt # BNYSDC-16277395, FILED.[2487505] [19-191] [Entered: 02/01/2019 01:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2478193] [19-191] [Entered: 01/18/2019 11:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 12/17/2018, RECEIVED.[2478189] [19-191] [Entered: 01/18/2019 11:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellants Reggie Anders and Underdog Trucking, LLC, FILED. [2478180] [19-191] [Entered: 01/18/2019 11:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less