This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/17/2022 at 06:06:42 (UTC).

Anastasia Wullschleger, et al v. Royal Canin U.S.A., Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 04/18/2022 Anastasia Wullschleger filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Royal Canin U S A , Inc . This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-1796

  • Filing Date:

    04/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

Anastasia Wullschleger, On behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated

Geraldine Brewer

Defendant / Appellees

Royal Canin U.S.A., Inc.

Nestle Purina Petcare Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

James P. Frickleton

Attorney at BARTIMUS & FRICKLETON

Suite 310, 4000 W. 114Th Street

Leawood, KS 66211

Michael Patrick Morrill

Attorney at POPE & MCGLAMRY

1200 Sixth Avenue, P.O. Box 2128

Columbus, GA 31902-2128

Daniel Rees Shulman

Attorney at SHULMAN & BUSKE

126 N. Third Street

Minneapolis, MN 55401

Luke Tompkins

Attorney at WARD & SMITH

127 Racine Drive

Wilmington, NC 28403

Edward Coyne III

Attorney at WARD & SMITH

127 Racine Drive

Wilmington, NC 28403

Lynwood P. Evans

Attorney at WARD & SMITH

P.O. Box 8088

Greenville, NC 27835-8088

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Joseph Bushur

Attorney at WILLIAMS & CONNOLLY

680 Maine Avenue, S.W.

Washington, DC 20024

Benjamin M. Greenblum

Attorney at WILLIAMS & CONNOLLY

680 Maine Avenue, S.W.

Washington, DC 20024

Jason M. Hans

Attorney at GM LAW, PC

20Th Floor, 1201 Walnut Street

Kansas City, MO 64106

Richmond T. Moore

Attorney at WILLIAMS & CONNOLLY

680 Maine Avenue, S.W.

Washington, DC 20024

Stephen Raber

Attorney at WILLIAMS & CONNOLLY

680 Maine Avenue, S.W.

Washington, DC 20024

Michael S. Hargens

Attorney at HUSCH & BLACKWELL

Suite 1000, 4801 Main Street

Kansas City, MO 64112

John E. Schmidtlein

Attorney at WILLIAMS & CONNOLLY

680 Maine Avenue, S.W.

Washington, DC 20024

Christopher M. Curran

Attorney at WHITE & CASE

701 13Th Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20005-0000

Jerry Frank Hogue

Attorney at WHITE & CASE

701 13Th Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20005-0000

Bryan A. Merryman

Attorney at WHITE & CASE

Suite 2700, 555 S. Flower Street

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2433

 

Court Documents

Open Document

ADDENDUM of APPELLANTS FILED by Appellants Ms. Geraldine Brewer and Anastasia Wullschleger w/service 05/31/2022. [5162686] [22-1796] (BNW) [Entered: 05/31/2022 11:56 AM]

Open Document

BRIEF FILED - APPELLANTS BRIEF filed by Ms. Geraldine Brewer and Anastasia Wullschleger w/service 05/31/2022. Length: 10,753 words. 10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS (WITHOUT THE APPELLATE PDF FOOTER) FROM Geraldine Brewer and Anastasia Wullschleger due 06/06/2022 WITH certificate of service for paper briefs. Brief of Nestle Purina Petcare Company and Royal Canin U.S.A. due on 06/30/2022. [5162683] [22-1796] (BNW) [Entered: 05/31/2022 11:54 AM]

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document

DESIGNATION of record filed by Appellee Nestle Purina Petcare Company. w/service 05/05/2022 [5154807] [22-1796] (CMC) [Entered: 05/05/2022 06:01 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of transcript filed by Appellants Ms. Geraldine Brewer and Anastasia Wullschleger. No Transcript[5150645] [22-1796] (JPF) [Entered: 04/26/2022 09:17 AM]

Open Document

METHOD of appendix preparation and DESIGNATION of the Record filed by Appellants Ms. Geraldine Brewer and Anastasia Wullschleger - Joint Appendix - w/service 04/26/2022 [5150643] [22-1796] --[Edited 04/26/2022 by BNW to corret docket text] (JPF) [Entered: 04/26/2022 09:15 AM]

Open Document

STATEMENT of issues filed by Appellants Anastasia Wullschleger and Ms. Geraldine Brewer - w/service 04/26/2022. [5150641] [22-1796] (JPF) [Entered: 04/26/2022 09:13 AM]

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Michael S. Hargens for Appellee Nestle Purina Petcare Company w/service 04/21/2022 [5149433] [22-1796] (MSH) [Entered: 04/21/2022 09:22 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Stephen D. Raber for Appellee Royal Canin U.S.A. w/service 04/20/2022 [5149299] [22-1796] (SR) [Entered: 04/20/2022 03:57 PM]

Open Document

CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee Nestle Purina Petcare Company. - FOR CAL [5149268] [22-1796] (CMC) [Entered: 04/20/2022 03:22 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by J. Frank Hogue for Appellee Nestle Purina Petcare Company w/service 04/20/2022 [5149266] [22-1796] (JFH) [Entered: 04/20/2022 03:19 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Bryan. A. Merryman for Appellee Nestle Purina Petcare Company w/service 04/20/2022 [5149259] [22-1796] (BAM) [Entered: 04/20/2022 03:16 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Christopher M. Curran for Appellee Nestle Purina Petcare Company w/service 04/20/2022 [5149257] [22-1796] (CMC) [Entered: 04/20/2022 03:12 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Dan Shulman for Appellants Ms. Geraldine Brewer and Anastasia Wullschleger w/service by USCA8-cm/ecf on 04/19/2022 [5148502] [22-1796] (DMW) [Entered: 04/19/2022 08:50 AM]

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketRECORD FILED - JOINT APPENDIX, 1 volumes. Comments: 1 volume, 3 copies. [5164251] [22-1796] (BNW) [Entered: 06/03/2022 12:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketPaper copies Appellants Brief, [ # 5162683-2 ] filed by Ms. Geraldine Brewer and Anastasia Wullschleger. 10 paper copies received w/Addendum attached. [5164249] [22-1796] (BNW) [Entered: 06/03/2022 12:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM of APPELLANTS FILED by Appellants Ms. Geraldine Brewer and Anastasia Wullschleger w/service 05/31/2022. [5162686] [22-1796] (BNW) [Entered: 05/31/2022 11:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEF FILED - APPELLANTS BRIEF filed by Ms. Geraldine Brewer and Anastasia Wullschleger w/service 05/31/2022. Length: 10,753 words. 10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS (WITHOUT THE APPELLATE PDF FOOTER) FROM Geraldine Brewer and Anastasia Wullschleger due 06/06/2022 WITH certificate of service for paper briefs. Brief of Nestle Purina Petcare Company and Royal Canin U.S.A. due on 06/30/2022. [5162683] [22-1796] (BNW) [Entered: 05/31/2022 11:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum of APPELLANT submitted for review by Ms. Geraldine Brewer and Anastasia Wullschleger. To open/view this addendum, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. [5162521] [22-1796] (JPF) [Entered: 05/31/2022 09:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPELLANT brief of Ms. Geraldine Brewer and Anastasia Wullschleger submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief (if any) does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. To open/view this brief, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. Only direct recipients on accounts can open this document. [5162519] [22-1796] (JPF) [Entered: 05/31/2022 09:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION of record filed by Appellee Nestle Purina Petcare Company. w/service 05/05/2022 [5154807] [22-1796] (CMC) [Entered: 05/05/2022 06:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of transcript filed by Appellants Ms. Geraldine Brewer and Anastasia Wullschleger. No Transcript[5150645] [22-1796] (JPF) [Entered: 04/26/2022 09:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMETHOD of appendix preparation and DESIGNATION of the Record filed by Appellants Ms. Geraldine Brewer and Anastasia Wullschleger - Joint Appendix - w/service 04/26/2022 [5150643] [22-1796] --[Edited 04/26/2022 by BNW to corret docket text] (JPF) [Entered: 04/26/2022 09:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT of issues filed by Appellants Anastasia Wullschleger and Ms. Geraldine Brewer - w/service 04/26/2022. [5150641] [22-1796] (JPF) [Entered: 04/26/2022 09:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Michael S. Hargens for Appellee Nestle Purina Petcare Company w/service 04/21/2022 [5149433] [22-1796] (MSH) [Entered: 04/21/2022 09:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Stephen D. Raber for Appellee Royal Canin U.S.A. w/service 04/20/2022 [5149299] [22-1796] (SR) [Entered: 04/20/2022 03:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee Nestle Purina Petcare Company. - FOR CAL [5149268] [22-1796] (CMC) [Entered: 04/20/2022 03:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by J. Frank Hogue for Appellee Nestle Purina Petcare Company w/service 04/20/2022 [5149266] [22-1796] (JFH) [Entered: 04/20/2022 03:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Bryan. A. Merryman for Appellee Nestle Purina Petcare Company w/service 04/20/2022 [5149259] [22-1796] (BAM) [Entered: 04/20/2022 03:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Christopher M. Curran for Appellee Nestle Purina Petcare Company w/service 04/20/2022 [5149257] [22-1796] (CMC) [Entered: 04/20/2022 03:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Dan Shulman for Appellants Ms. Geraldine Brewer and Anastasia Wullschleger w/service by USCA8-cm/ecf on 04/19/2022 [5148502] [22-1796] (DMW) [Entered: 04/19/2022 08:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Appendix due on 05/31/2022. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Geraldine Brewer and Anastasia Wullschleger due 05/31/2022. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [5148275] [22-1796] (AEV) [Entered: 04/18/2022 02:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, Order 3/22/22, Judgment 3/22/22, docket entries, [5148272] [22-1796] (AEV) [Entered: 04/18/2022 02:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case docketed. [5148266] [22-1796] (AEV) [Entered: 04/18/2022 02:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Royal Canin U.S.A., Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Nestle Purina Petcare Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael S. Hargens

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richmond T. Moore