This case was last updated from PACER on 04/03/2020 at 06:01:52 (UTC).

Anas Elhady v. Charles Kable

Case Summary

On 02/03/2020 Anas Elhady filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Charles Kable. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1119

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellees

SAMIR ANWAR

WAEL HAKMEH

MURAT FRLJUCKIE

ZUHAIR EL-SHWEHDI

ANAS ELHADY

DONALD THOMAS

OSAMA HUSSEIN AHMED

SHAHIR ANWAR

AHMAD IBRAHIM AL HALABI

MICHAEL EDMUND COLEMAN

JOHN DOE, No. 4

HASSAN FARES

HASSAN SHIBLY

MUHAMMAD YAHYA KHAN

JOHN DOE, No. 3

Defendant / Appellants

KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, Acting Commissioner of United States Customs and Border Protection in his official capacity

CHARLES H. KABLE, IV, Director of the Terrorist Screening Center, in his official capacity

NICHOLAS J. RASMUSSEN, Director of the National Counterterrorism Center in his official capacity

KELLI ANN BURRIESCI, Principal Deputy Director of the Terrorist Screening Center in her official capacity

TIMOTHY P. GROH, Deputy Director for Operations at the Terrorist Screening Center in his official capacity

11 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Gadeir Ibrahim Abbas

Attorney at COUNCIL ON AMERICAN ISLAMIC RELATIONS

453 New Jersey Avenue, Se

Washington, DC 20003

Lena Fatina Masri

Attorney at COUNCIL ON AMERICAN ISLAMIC RELATIONS

453 New Jersey Avenue, Se

Washington, DC 20003

Justin Mark Sadowsky

Attorney at COUNCIL ON AMERICAN ISLAMIC RELATIONS

453 New Jersey Avenue, Se

Washington, DC 20003

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Lauren Anne Wetzler

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY

2100 Jamieson Avenue

Alexandria, VA 22314-5194

Joshua Paul Waldman

Attorney at U. S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Sharon Swingle

Attorney at U. S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

 

Court Documents

#22

(#22) ORDER filed rescinding briefing order issued 02/13/2020 Copies to all parties.. [1000703700] [20-1119] MR [Entered: 03/17/2020 12:17 PM]

#21

(#21) REPLY by Kelli Ann Burriesci, Timothy P. Groh, Charles H. Kable, IV, Kevin K. McAleenan, Deborah Moore, David P. Pekoske, Nicholas J. Rasmussen and Mr. Christopher Asher Wray to response [ # 19 ], Motion [ # 10 ].. [20-1119] Joshua Waldman [Entered: 03/10/2020 02:34 PM]

#20

(#20) NOTICE by Kelli Ann Burriesci, Timothy P. Groh, Charles H. Kable, IV, Kevin K. McAleenan, Deborah Moore, David P. Pekoske, Nicholas J. Rasmussen and Mr. Christopher Asher Wray that a reply will be filed. [1000695156].. [20-1119] Joshua Waldman [Entered: 03/03/2020 04:49 PM]

19 #2

Exhibit A

19 #1

Opposition to Motion to Stay

#18

(#18) ORDER filed denying Motion to consolidate case [ # 17 ] in 20-1119, denying Motion to consolidate case [ # 1000691972-2 ] in 20-154; denying Motion to expedite decision [ # 17 ] in 20-1119, denying Motion to expedite decision [ # 1000691972-3 ] in 20-154 Copies to all parties.. [1000693202] [20-1119, 20-154] MR [Entered: 02/28/2020 03:51 PM]

#17

(#17) MOTION by Osama Hussein Ahmed, Ahmad Ibrahim Al Halabi, Saleem Ali, Mark Amri, Samir Anwar, Shahir Anwar, Ibrahim Awad, Michael Edmund Coleman, Baby Doe, John Doe, Zuhair El-Shwehdi, Anas Elhady, Ausama Elhuzayel, Hassan Fares, Murat Frljuckie, Wael Hakmeh, Yaseen Kadura, Muhammad Yahya Khan, Adnan Khalil Shaout, Hassan Shibly and Donald Thomas to consolidate case 20-154 with 20-1119 , to expedite decision. Date and method of service: 02/27/2020 ecf. [1000691978] [20-1119] Lena Masri [Entered: 02/27/2020 11:17 AM]

#9

(#9) DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Osama Hussein Ahmed, Ahmad Ibrahim Al Halabi, Saleem Ali, Mark Amri, Samir Anwar, Shahir Anwar, Ibrahim Awad, Michael Edmund Coleman, Baby Doe, John Doe, John Doe, John Doe, Zuhair El-Shwehdi, Anas Elhady, Ausama Elhuzayel, Hassan Fares, Murat Frljuckie, Wael Hakmeh, Yaseen Kadura, Muhammad Yahya Khan, Adnan Khalil Shaout, Hassan Shibly and Donald Thomas re: filing of disclosure form Disclosure statement due from Osama Hussein Ahmed, Ahmad Ibrahim Al Halabi, Saleem Ali, Mark Amri, Samir Anwar, Shahir Anwar, Ibrahim Awad, Michael Edmund Coleman, Baby Doe, John Doe, John Doe, Zuhair El-Shwehdi, Anas Elhady, Ausama Elhuzayel, Hassan Fares, Murat Frljuckie, Wael Hakmeh, Yaseen Kadura, Muhammad Yahya Khan, Adnan Khalil Shaout, Hassan Shibly and Donald Thomas on 02/27/2020.. [20-1119] MR [Entered: 02/24/2020 03:44 PM]

#8

(#8) BRIEFING ORDER filed.. Opening Brief and Appendix due 03/24/2020. Response Brief due 04/23/2020 [20-1119] MR [Entered: 02/13/2020 01:14 PM]

#7

(#7) DOCKETING STATEMENT by Kelli Ann Burriesci, Timothy P. Groh, Charles H. Kable, IV, Kevin K. McAleenan, Deborah Moore, David P. Pekoske, Nicholas J. Rasmussen and Mr. Christopher Asher Wray. [20-1119] Joshua Waldman [Entered: 02/13/2020 12:48 PM]

#6

(#6) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Sharon Swingle for Kelli Ann Burriesci, Timothy P. Groh, Charles H. Kable, IV, Kevin K. McAleenan, Deborah Moore, David P. Pekoske, Nicholas J. Rasmussen and Mr. Christopher Asher Wray. [1000682668] [20-1119] Sharon Swingle [Entered: 02/13/2020 11:11 AM]

#5

(#5) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Joshua Waldman for Kelli Ann Burriesci, Timothy P. Groh, Charles H. Kable, IV, Kevin K. McAleenan, Deborah Moore, David P. Pekoske, Nicholas J. Rasmussen and Mr. Christopher Asher Wray. [1000682238] [20-1119] Joshua Waldman [Entered: 02/12/2020 03:51 PM]

#4

(#4) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Justin Sadowsky for Osama Hussein Ahmed, Ahmad Ibrahim Al Halabi, Saleem Ali, Mark Amri, Samir Anwar, Shahir Anwar, Ibrahim Awad, Michael Edmund Coleman, Baby Doe, John Doe, Zuhair El-Shwehdi, Anas Elhady, Ausama Elhuzayel, Hassan Fares, Murat Frljuckie, Wael Hakmeh, Yaseen Kadura, Muhammad Yahya Khan, Adnan Khalil Shaout, Hassan Shibly and Donald Thomas. [1000677978] [20-1119] Justin Sadowsky [Entered: 02/06/2020 11:02 AM]

#4

(#24) BRIEFING ORDER filed.. Opening Brief and Appendix due 04/27/2020. Response Brief due 05/26/2020 [20-1119, 20-1311] MR [Entered: 03/17/2020 12:26 PM]

#3

(#23) ORDER filed consolidating case 20-1311 with 20-1119. Cross-appeal appellant: Charles H. Kable, IV, et al.. Copies to all parties.. [1000703711] [20-1119, 20-1311] MR [Entered: 03/17/2020 12:23 PM]

#3

(#3) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Lena F. Masri for Osama Hussein Ahmed, Ahmad Ibrahim Al Halabi, Saleem Ali, Mark Amri, Samir Anwar, Shahir Anwar, Ibrahim Awad, Michael Edmund Coleman, Baby Doe, John Doe, Zuhair El-Shwehdi, Anas Elhady, Ausama Elhuzayel, Hassan Fares, Murat Frljuckie, Wael Hakmeh, Yaseen Kadura, Muhammad Yahya Khan, Adnan Khalil Shaout, Hassan Shibly and Donald Thomas. [1000675128] [20-1119] Lena Masri [Entered: 02/03/2020 01:39 PM]

#2

(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case Originating case number: 1:16-cv-00375-AJT-JFA.. [20-1119] MR [Entered: 02/03/2020 12:05 PM]

#1

(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case Originating case number: 1:16-cv-00375-AJT-JFA.. [20-1119] MR [Entered: 02/03/2020 12:05 PM]

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) BRIEFING ORDER filed.. Opening Brief and Appendix due 04/27/2020. Response Brief due 05/26/2020 [20-1119, 20-1311] MR [Entered: 03/17/2020 12:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER filed consolidating case 20-1311 with 20-1119. Cross-appeal appellant: Charles H. Kable, IV, et al.. Copies to all parties.. [1000703711] [20-1119, 20-1311] MR [Entered: 03/17/2020 12:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ORDER filed rescinding briefing order issued 02/13/2020 Copies to all parties.. [1000703700] [20-1119] MR [Entered: 03/17/2020 12:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) REPLY by Kelli Ann Burriesci, Timothy P. Groh, Charles H. Kable, IV, Kevin K. McAleenan, Deborah Moore, David P. Pekoske, Nicholas J. Rasmussen and Mr. Christopher Asher Wray to response [ # 19 ], Motion [ # 10 ].. [20-1119] Joshua Waldman [Entered: 03/10/2020 02:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE by Kelli Ann Burriesci, Timothy P. Groh, Charles H. Kable, IV, Kevin K. McAleenan, Deborah Moore, David P. Pekoske, Nicholas J. Rasmussen and Mr. Christopher Asher Wray that a reply will be filed. [1000695156].. [20-1119] Joshua Waldman [Entered: 03/03/2020 04:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) RESPONSE/ANSWER by Osama Hussein Ahmed, Ahmad Ibrahim Al Halabi, Saleem Ali, Mark Amri, Samir Anwar, Shahir Anwar, Ibrahim Awad, Michael Edmund Coleman, Baby Doe, John Doe, Zuhair El-Shwehdi, Anas Elhady, Ausama Elhuzayel, Hassan Fares, Murat Frljuckie, Wael Hakmeh, Yaseen Kadura, Muhammad Yahya Khan, Adnan Khalil Shaout, Hassan Shibly and Donald Thomas to Motion for stay pending appeal [ # 10 ]. Nature of response: in opposition. [20-1119] Lena Masri [Entered: 03/03/2020 12:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER filed denying Motion to consolidate case [ # 17 ] in 20-1119, denying Motion to consolidate case [ # 1000691972-2 ] in 20-154; denying Motion to expedite decision [ # 17 ] in 20-1119, denying Motion to expedite decision [ # 1000691972-3 ] in 20-154 Copies to all parties.. [1000693202] [20-1119, 20-154] MR [Entered: 02/28/2020 03:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION by Osama Hussein Ahmed, Ahmad Ibrahim Al Halabi, Saleem Ali, Mark Amri, Samir Anwar, Shahir Anwar, Ibrahim Awad, Michael Edmund Coleman, Baby Doe, John Doe, Zuhair El-Shwehdi, Anas Elhady, Ausama Elhuzayel, Hassan Fares, Murat Frljuckie, Wael Hakmeh, Yaseen Kadura, Muhammad Yahya Khan, Adnan Khalil Shaout, Hassan Shibly and Donald Thomas to consolidate case 20-154 with 20-1119 , to expedite decision. Date and method of service: 02/27/2020 ecf. [1000691978] [20-1119] Lena Masri [Entered: 02/27/2020 11:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) (ENTRY RESTRICTED) - MOTION by Osama Hussein Ahmed, Ahmad Ibrahim Al Halabi, Saleem Ali, Mark Amri, Samir Anwar, Shahir Anwar, Ibrahim Awad, Michael Edmund Coleman, Baby Doe, John Doe, Zuhair El-Shwehdi, Anas Elhady, Ausama Elhuzayel, Hassan Fares, Murat Frljuckie, Wael Hakmeh, Yaseen Kadura, Muhammad Yahya Khan, Adnan Khalil Shaout, Hassan Shibly and Donald Thomas to consolidate case 20-154 with 20-1119 , to expedite decision. Date and method of service: 02/27/2020 ecf. [1000691921] [20-1119] --[Edited 02/27/2020 by MR] Lena Masri [Entered: 02/27/2020 10:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER filed granting motion to extend filing time [ # 14 ]; administratively terminating motion for abeyance [ # 14 ]. Number of days granted: 30. Opening brief and appendix due 04/23/2020. Response brief due 05/26/2020. Copies to all parties.. [1000691768] [20-1119] MR [Entered: 02/27/2020 09:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION by Kelli Ann Burriesci, Timothy P. Groh, Charles H. Kable, IV, Kevin K. McAleenan, Deborah Moore, David P. Pekoske, Nicholas J. Rasmussen and Mr. Christopher Asher Wray for stay pending appeal.. Date and method of service: 02/24/2020 ecf. [1000689391] [20-1119] Joshua Waldman [Entered: 02/24/2020 04:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Osama Hussein Ahmed, Ahmad Ibrahim Al Halabi, Saleem Ali, Mark Amri, Samir Anwar, Shahir Anwar, Ibrahim Awad, Michael Edmund Coleman, Baby Doe, John Doe, John Doe, John Doe, Zuhair El-Shwehdi, Anas Elhady, Ausama Elhuzayel, Hassan Fares, Murat Frljuckie, Wael Hakmeh, Yaseen Kadura, Muhammad Yahya Khan, Adnan Khalil Shaout, Hassan Shibly and Donald Thomas re: filing of disclosure form Disclosure statement due from Osama Hussein Ahmed, Ahmad Ibrahim Al Halabi, Saleem Ali, Mark Amri, Samir Anwar, Shahir Anwar, Ibrahim Awad, Michael Edmund Coleman, Baby Doe, John Doe, John Doe, Zuhair El-Shwehdi, Anas Elhady, Ausama Elhuzayel, Hassan Fares, Murat Frljuckie, Wael Hakmeh, Yaseen Kadura, Muhammad Yahya Khan, Adnan Khalil Shaout, Hassan Shibly and Donald Thomas on 02/27/2020.. [20-1119] MR [Entered: 02/24/2020 03:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) BRIEFING ORDER filed.. Opening Brief and Appendix due 03/24/2020. Response Brief due 04/23/2020 [20-1119] MR [Entered: 02/13/2020 01:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DOCKETING STATEMENT by Kelli Ann Burriesci, Timothy P. Groh, Charles H. Kable, IV, Kevin K. McAleenan, Deborah Moore, David P. Pekoske, Nicholas J. Rasmussen and Mr. Christopher Asher Wray. [20-1119] Joshua Waldman [Entered: 02/13/2020 12:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Sharon Swingle for Kelli Ann Burriesci, Timothy P. Groh, Charles H. Kable, IV, Kevin K. McAleenan, Deborah Moore, David P. Pekoske, Nicholas J. Rasmussen and Mr. Christopher Asher Wray. [1000682668] [20-1119] Sharon Swingle [Entered: 02/13/2020 11:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Joshua Waldman for Kelli Ann Burriesci, Timothy P. Groh, Charles H. Kable, IV, Kevin K. McAleenan, Deborah Moore, David P. Pekoske, Nicholas J. Rasmussen and Mr. Christopher Asher Wray. [1000682238] [20-1119] Joshua Waldman [Entered: 02/12/2020 03:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Justin Sadowsky for Osama Hussein Ahmed, Ahmad Ibrahim Al Halabi, Saleem Ali, Mark Amri, Samir Anwar, Shahir Anwar, Ibrahim Awad, Michael Edmund Coleman, Baby Doe, John Doe, Zuhair El-Shwehdi, Anas Elhady, Ausama Elhuzayel, Hassan Fares, Murat Frljuckie, Wael Hakmeh, Yaseen Kadura, Muhammad Yahya Khan, Adnan Khalil Shaout, Hassan Shibly and Donald Thomas. [1000677978] [20-1119] Justin Sadowsky [Entered: 02/06/2020 11:02 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Lena F. Masri for Osama Hussein Ahmed, Ahmad Ibrahim Al Halabi, Saleem Ali, Mark Amri, Samir Anwar, Shahir Anwar, Ibrahim Awad, Michael Edmund Coleman, Baby Doe, John Doe, Zuhair El-Shwehdi, Anas Elhady, Ausama Elhuzayel, Hassan Fares, Murat Frljuckie, Wael Hakmeh, Yaseen Kadura, Muhammad Yahya Khan, Adnan Khalil Shaout, Hassan Shibly and Donald Thomas. [1000675128] [20-1119] Lena Masri [Entered: 02/03/2020 01:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case Originating case number: 1:16-cv-00375-AJT-JFA.. [20-1119] MR [Entered: 02/03/2020 12:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:16-cv-00375-AJT-JFA. Case manager: MRadday. [20-1119] MR [Entered: 02/03/2020 12:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lauren A. Wetzler