This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 04/23/2021 at 06:17:03 (UTC).

Amy Anderson v. Warden, et al

Case Summary

On 02/22/2021 Amy Anderson filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Warden. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-10593

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Respondent / Appellees

WARDEN

ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF ALABAMA

Petitioner / Appellant

AMY BISHOP ANDERSON

Wetumpka, AL 36092

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent / Appellee Attorneys

Steven Marshall

Attorney at Alabama Attorney General's Office

501 Washington Ave, Po Box 300152

Montgomery, AL 36130

Kristi Oggs Wilkerson

Attorney at Alabama Attorney General's Office

501 Washington Ave, Po Box 300152

Montgomery, AL 36130

Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

Amy Bishop Anderson

Attorney at Tutwiler Prison for Women - Inmate Legal Mail

8966 Us Hwy 231 N

Wetumpka, AL 36092

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Kristi Oggs Wilkerson for Appellees Attorney General of the State of Alabama and Warden. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-10593] (ECF: Kristi Wilkerson) [Entered: 03/15/2021 11:42 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Kristi Wilkerson for Warden Steven Marshall for Attorney General of the State of Alabama and Warden. [21-10593] (ECF: Kristi Wilkerson) [Entered: 03/11/2021 03:47 PM]

Open Document

Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Amy Bishop Anderson. [Entered: 03/11/2021 05:50 PM]

Open Document

USDC order denying COA as to Appellant Amy Bishop Anderson was filed on 02/05/2021. Docket Entry 33. [Entered: 02/26/2021 08:28 AM]

Open Document #5

DKT-5 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #4

DKT-5 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #3

usdc Final Order 33

Open Document #2

usdc Memorandum 32

Open Document #1

Habeas Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Kristi Oggs Wilkerson for Warden and Attorney General of the State of Alabama. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP) via the Court's public web-page. Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 03/16/2021 10:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Kristi Oggs Wilkerson for Appellees Attorney General of the State of Alabama and Warden. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-10593] (ECF: Kristi Wilkerson) [Entered: 03/15/2021 11:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Kristi Wilkerson for Warden Steven Marshall for Attorney General of the State of Alabama and Warden. [21-10593] (ECF: Kristi Wilkerson) [Entered: 03/11/2021 03:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Amy Bishop Anderson. [Entered: 03/11/2021 05:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketRemoved from case: Attorney Attorney General, State of Alabama for Appellees Warden and Attorney General of the State of Alabama in 21-10593. [Entered: 03/03/2021 01:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUSDC order denying COA as to Appellant Amy Bishop Anderson was filed on 02/05/2021. Docket Entry 33. [Entered: 02/26/2021 08:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHABEAS APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Amy Bishop Anderson on 02/22/2021 USDC motion pending: Motion to Alter #35, Motion to Alter #36, Motion for IFP #39 and Motion to Appoint Counsel #40. filed on 02/22/2021. DE# 39. Fee Status: IFP Pending. No hearings to be transcribed. [Entered: 02/26/2021 08:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WARDEN is a litigant