This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 11/06/2022 at 06:07:37 (UTC).

ams Sensors USA Inc. v. Renesas Electronics America, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/07/2022 ams Sensors USA Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Renesas Electronics America, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-2185

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

 

Party Details

Cross Appellant

AMS SENSORS USA INC., fka Texas Advanced Optoelectronic Solutions, Inc.

Defendant / Appellant

RENESAS ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC., fka Intersil Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Appellant Attorneys

Michael A. McCabe

Chase Cobern

Robert D. McCutcheon

Jordan C. Strauss

Michael Craig Wilson Esq.

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Brian Robert Matsui

Seth W. Lloyd

Daniel P. Muino

 

Court Documents

#1

Notice of Docketing

1 #2

Civil Case Docketed

#3

(#3) Official caption revised to reflect the Cross-Appeal 22-2186. (see attached). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [870471] [MMA] [Entered: 09/07/2022 05:40 PM]

#4

(#4) Entry of appearance for Michael A. McCabe; Michael C. Wilson; Robert D. McCutcheon; Jordan C. Strauss; Chase A. Cobern as counsel for Cross-Appellant ams Sensors USA Inc.. Service: 09/21/2022 by email. [873192] [22-2185] [Michael McCabe] [Entered: 09/21/2022 04:04 PM]

#5

(#5) Certificate of Interest for Cross-Appellant ams Sensors USA Inc.. Service: 09/21/2022 by email. [873195] [22-2185] [Michael McCabe] [Entered: 09/21/2022 04:08 PM]

#6

(#6) Docketing Statement for the Cross-Appellant ams Sensors USA Inc.. Service: 09/21/2022 by email. [873197] [22-2185] [Michael McCabe] [Entered: 09/21/2022 04:09 PM]

#7

(#7) Entry of appearance for Brian R. Matsui; Daniel P. Muino; Seth W. Lloyd as counsel for Appellant Renesas Electronics America, Inc.. Service: 09/21/2022 by email. [873222] [22-2185] [Brian Matsui] [Entered: 09/21/2022 04:27 PM]

#8

(#8) Certificate of Interest for Appellant Renesas Electronics America, Inc.. Service: 09/21/2022 by email. [873229] [22-2185] [Brian Matsui] [Entered: 09/21/2022 04:31 PM]

#9

(#9) Docketing Statement for the Appellant Renesas Electronics America, Inc.. Service: 09/21/2022 by email. [873233] [22-2185] [Brian Matsui] [Entered: 09/21/2022 04:34 PM]

#10

(#10) MOTION of Appellant Renesas Electronics America, Inc. to extend the time to 01/06/2023 to file brief. Service: 10/19/2022 by email. [878817] [22-2185] [Brian Matsui] [Entered: 10/19/2022 09:27 AM]

 

Docket Entries

10/19/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) **TEXT ONLY** ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief [ # 10 ] filed by Appellant Renesas Electronics America, Inc. The opening brief is due 01/06/2023. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. This order has been issued without an attached document and is official and binding. [879048] [MMA] [Entered: 10/19/2022 04:52 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/19/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) MOTION of Appellant Renesas Electronics America, Inc. to extend the time to 01/06/2023 to file brief. Service: 10/19/2022 by email. [878817] [22-2185] [Brian Matsui] [Entered: 10/19/2022 09:27 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) Docketing Statement for the Appellant Renesas Electronics America, Inc.. Service: 09/21/2022 by email. [873233] [22-2185] [Brian Matsui] [Entered: 09/21/2022 04:34 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) Certificate of Interest for Appellant Renesas Electronics America, Inc.. Service: 09/21/2022 by email. [873229] [22-2185] [Brian Matsui] [Entered: 09/21/2022 04:31 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) Entry of appearance for Brian R. Matsui; Daniel P. Muino; Seth W. Lloyd as counsel for Appellant Renesas Electronics America, Inc.. Service: 09/21/2022 by email. [873222] [22-2185] [Brian Matsui] [Entered: 09/21/2022 04:27 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) Docketing Statement for the Cross-Appellant ams Sensors USA Inc.. Service: 09/21/2022 by email. [873197] [22-2185] [Michael McCabe] [Entered: 09/21/2022 04:09 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) Certificate of Interest for Cross-Appellant ams Sensors USA Inc.. Service: 09/21/2022 by email. [873195] [22-2185] [Michael McCabe] [Entered: 09/21/2022 04:08 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Entry of appearance for Michael A. McCabe; Michael C. Wilson; Robert D. McCutcheon; Jordan C. Strauss; Chase A. Cobern as counsel for Cross-Appellant ams Sensors USA Inc.. Service: 09/21/2022 by email. [873192] [22-2185] [Michael McCabe] [Entered: 09/21/2022 04:04 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Official caption revised to reflect the Cross-Appeal 22-2186. (see attached). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [870471] [MMA] [Entered: 09/07/2022 05:40 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2022

Docket(#2) Note to File: The following cases are consolidated: 22-2185 (Lead) with 22-2186 (Cross-Appeal). The parties must file all documents in the lead appeal only. [870469] [22-2185, 22-2186] [MMA] [Entered: 09/07/2022 05:38 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 08/30/2022. [870463] Entry of Appearance due 09/21/2022. Certificate of Interest is due on 09/21/2022. Docketing Statement due 09/21/2022. Appellant/Petitioner's brief is due 11/07/2022. [MMA] [Entered: 09/07/2022 05:14 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less