This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 11/06/2022 at 06:07:37 (UTC).

ams Sensors USA Inc. v. Renesas Electronics America, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/07/2022 ams Sensors USA Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Renesas Electronics America, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-2185

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

 

Party Details

Cross Appellant

AMS SENSORS USA INC., fka Texas Advanced Optoelectronic Solutions, Inc.

Defendant / Appellant

RENESAS ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC., fka Intersil Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Appellant Attorneys

Michael A. McCabe

Attorney at Munck Wilson Mandala, LLP

600 Banner Place Tower, 12770 Coit Road

Dallas, TX 75251

Chase Cobern

Attorney at Munck Wilson Mandala, LLP

12770 Coit Road

Dallas, TX 75251

Robert D. McCutcheon

Attorney at Munck Wilson Mandala, LLP

12770 Coit Road

Dallas, TX 75251

Jordan C. Strauss

Attorney at Munck Wilson Mandala, LLP

12770 Coit Road

Dallas, TX 75251

Michael Craig Wilson Esq.

Attorney at Munck Wilson Mandala, LLP

12770 Coit Road

Dallas, TX 75251

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Brian Robert Matsui

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

2100 L Street Nw

Washington, DC 20037

Seth W. Lloyd

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

2100 L Street Nw

Washington, DC 20037

Daniel P. Muino

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

2100 L Street Nw

Washington, DC 20037

 

Court Documents

#1

Notice of Docketing

1 #2

Civil Case Docketed

#3

(#3) Official caption revised to reflect the Cross-Appeal 22-2186. (see attached). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [870471] [MMA] [Entered: 09/07/2022 05:40 PM]

#4

(#4) Entry of appearance for Michael A. McCabe; Michael C. Wilson; Robert D. McCutcheon; Jordan C. Strauss; Chase A. Cobern as counsel for Cross-Appellant ams Sensors USA Inc.. Service: 09/21/2022 by email. [873192] [22-2185] [Michael McCabe] [Entered: 09/21/2022 04:04 PM]

#5

(#5) Certificate of Interest for Cross-Appellant ams Sensors USA Inc.. Service: 09/21/2022 by email. [873195] [22-2185] [Michael McCabe] [Entered: 09/21/2022 04:08 PM]

#6

(#6) Docketing Statement for the Cross-Appellant ams Sensors USA Inc.. Service: 09/21/2022 by email. [873197] [22-2185] [Michael McCabe] [Entered: 09/21/2022 04:09 PM]

#7

(#7) Entry of appearance for Brian R. Matsui; Daniel P. Muino; Seth W. Lloyd as counsel for Appellant Renesas Electronics America, Inc.. Service: 09/21/2022 by email. [873222] [22-2185] [Brian Matsui] [Entered: 09/21/2022 04:27 PM]

#8

(#8) Certificate of Interest for Appellant Renesas Electronics America, Inc.. Service: 09/21/2022 by email. [873229] [22-2185] [Brian Matsui] [Entered: 09/21/2022 04:31 PM]

#9

(#9) Docketing Statement for the Appellant Renesas Electronics America, Inc.. Service: 09/21/2022 by email. [873233] [22-2185] [Brian Matsui] [Entered: 09/21/2022 04:34 PM]

#10

(#10) MOTION of Appellant Renesas Electronics America, Inc. to extend the time to 01/06/2023 to file brief. Service: 10/19/2022 by email. [878817] [22-2185] [Brian Matsui] [Entered: 10/19/2022 09:27 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) **TEXT ONLY** ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief [ # 10 ] filed by Appellant Renesas Electronics America, Inc. The opening brief is due 01/06/2023. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. This order has been issued without an attached document and is official and binding. [879048] [MMA] [Entered: 10/19/2022 04:52 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION of Appellant Renesas Electronics America, Inc. to extend the time to 01/06/2023 to file brief. Service: 10/19/2022 by email. [878817] [22-2185] [Brian Matsui] [Entered: 10/19/2022 09:27 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docketing Statement for the Appellant Renesas Electronics America, Inc.. Service: 09/21/2022 by email. [873233] [22-2185] [Brian Matsui] [Entered: 09/21/2022 04:34 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Certificate of Interest for Appellant Renesas Electronics America, Inc.. Service: 09/21/2022 by email. [873229] [22-2185] [Brian Matsui] [Entered: 09/21/2022 04:31 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Entry of appearance for Brian R. Matsui; Daniel P. Muino; Seth W. Lloyd as counsel for Appellant Renesas Electronics America, Inc.. Service: 09/21/2022 by email. [873222] [22-2185] [Brian Matsui] [Entered: 09/21/2022 04:27 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docketing Statement for the Cross-Appellant ams Sensors USA Inc.. Service: 09/21/2022 by email. [873197] [22-2185] [Michael McCabe] [Entered: 09/21/2022 04:09 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Certificate of Interest for Cross-Appellant ams Sensors USA Inc.. Service: 09/21/2022 by email. [873195] [22-2185] [Michael McCabe] [Entered: 09/21/2022 04:08 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Entry of appearance for Michael A. McCabe; Michael C. Wilson; Robert D. McCutcheon; Jordan C. Strauss; Chase A. Cobern as counsel for Cross-Appellant ams Sensors USA Inc.. Service: 09/21/2022 by email. [873192] [22-2185] [Michael McCabe] [Entered: 09/21/2022 04:04 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Official caption revised to reflect the Cross-Appeal 22-2186. (see attached). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [870471] [MMA] [Entered: 09/07/2022 05:40 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • Docket(#2) Note to File: The following cases are consolidated: 22-2185 (Lead) with 22-2186 (Cross-Appeal). The parties must file all documents in the lead appeal only. [870469] [22-2185, 22-2186] [MMA] [Entered: 09/07/2022 05:38 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 08/30/2022. [870463] Entry of Appearance due 09/21/2022. Certificate of Interest is due on 09/21/2022. Docketing Statement due 09/21/2022. Appellant/Petitioner's brief is due 11/07/2022. [MMA] [Entered: 09/07/2022 05:14 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less