This case was last updated from PACER on 05/02/2020 at 06:12:03 (UTC).

AmGuard Insurance Company v. SG Patel and Sons II LLC

Case Summary

On 03/03/2020 AmGuard Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against SG Patel and Sons II LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1246

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

MICHAEL A. EDWARDS

STEPHANIE RENEW, individually and as parent of Matthew Renew and as personal representative of the Estate of Matthew Renew

JOHN DOES LLC 1-50

BRIAN GIBSON

JOHN DOES INC 1 - 50

STEVEN RENEW, individually as parent of Matthew Renew and as personal representative of the Estate of Matthew Renew

BRITTIN RAY

LUKE PICKERING

JOHN DOES 1-50

SG PATEL AND SONS II LLC

Plaintiff / Appellant

AMGUARD INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Justin Tyler Bamberg

Attorney at BAMBERG LEGAL

2331 Main Highway

Bamberg, SC 29003

Herman Edward Smith

Attorney at BROWN, JEFFERIES & BOULWARE

P. O. Box 248

Barnwell, SC 29812-0000

James Martin Harvey Jr.

Attorney at HARVEY & KULMALA

116 Main Street, P. O. Box 705

Barnwell, SC 29812-0000

Charles Bradley Hutto

Attorney at WILLIAMS & WILLIAMS ATTORNEYS AT LAW

1281 Russell Street, P. O. Box 1084

Orangeburg, SC 29116-1084

Daniel Roy Settana Jr.

Attorney at MCKAY FIRM, P.A.

1303 Blanding Street

Columbia, SC 29201

Temus C. Miles Jr.

Attorney at MCKAY FIRM, P.A.

1303 Blanding Street

Columbia, SC 29201

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Steven George Janik

Attorney at JANIK, LLP

9200 South Hills Boulevard

Cleveland, OH 44147-3521

Crystal L. Maluchnik

Attorney at JANIK, LLP

9200 South Hills Boulevard

Cleveland, OH 44147-3521

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) ORDER filed granting motion to extend filing time [ # 13 ]. Number of days granted: 29. Opening brief and appendix due 05/26/2020. Response brief due 06/25/2020. FILING OF PAPER COPIES OF BRIEFS/APPENDICES IS SUSPENDED PENDING FURTHER NOTICE FROM THE COURT. Copies to all parties. [1000724411] [20-1246] TW [Entered: 04/20/2020 01:11 PM]

#13

(#13) MOTION by AmGuard Insurance Company to extend filing time for opening brief and appendix until May 26, 2020.. Date and method of service: 04/20/2020 ecf. [1000724358] [20-1246] Crystal Maluchnik [Entered: 04/20/2020 12:39 PM]

#12

(#12) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Stephanie Renew and Steven Renew. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000721090] [20-1246] James Harvey [Entered: 04/14/2020 05:09 PM]

#11

(#11) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by James Martin Harvey for Stephanie Renew and Steven Renew. [1000721066] [20-1246] James Harvey [Entered: 04/14/2020 04:59 PM]

#10

(#10) DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Michael A. Edwards, Brian Gibson, Luke Pickering, Brittin Ray, Stephanie Renew and Steven Renew re: filing of appearance form. Appearance form due on 04/13/2020 from Justin Tyler Bamberg, James Martin Harvey Jr., Charles Bradley Hutto and Herman Edward Smith, filing of disclosure form Disclosure statement due from Michael A. Edwards, Brian Gibson, Luke Pickering, Brittin Ray, Stephanie Renew and Steven Renew on 04/13/2020.. [20-1246] JHM [Entered: 04/10/2020 01:13 PM]

#9

(#9) BRIEFING ORDER filed.. FILING OF PAPER COPIES OF BRIEFS/APPENDICES IS SUSPENDED PENDING FURTHER NOTICE FROM THE COURT. Opening Brief and Appendix due 04/27/2020. Response Brief due 05/27/2020 [20-1246] JHM [Entered: 03/18/2020 10:10 AM]

#8

(#8) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Steven G. Janik for AmGuard Insurance Company. [1000703951] [20-1246] Steven Janik [Entered: 03/17/2020 03:34 PM]

#7

(#7) DOCKETING STATEMENT by AmGuard Insurance Company. [20-1246] Crystal Maluchnik [Entered: 03/17/2020 03:31 PM]

#6

(#6) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by AmGuard Insurance Company. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000703940] [20-1246] Crystal Maluchnik [Entered: 03/17/2020 03:30 PM]

#5

(#5) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Crystal L. Maluchnik for AmGuard Insurance Company. [1000703937] [20-1246] Crystal Maluchnik [Entered: 03/17/2020 03:29 PM]

#4

(#4) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by SG Patel and Sons II LLC. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000703041] [20-1246] Daniel Settana [Entered: 03/16/2020 04:42 PM]

#3

(#3) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Daniel R. Settana, Jr. for SG Patel and Sons II LLC. [1000703033] [20-1246] Daniel Settana [Entered: 03/16/2020 04:40 PM]

#2

(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case Originating case number: 5:19-cv-00635-JMC. [20-1246] JHM [Entered: 03/03/2020 03:15 PM]

#1

(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 5:19-cv-00635-JMC. Case manager: JMoore. [20-1246] JHM [Entered: 03/03/2020 03:11 PM]

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER filed granting motion to extend filing time [ # 13 ]. Number of days granted: 29. Opening brief and appendix due 05/26/2020. Response brief due 06/25/2020. FILING OF PAPER COPIES OF BRIEFS/APPENDICES IS SUSPENDED PENDING FURTHER NOTICE FROM THE COURT. Copies to all parties. [1000724411] [20-1246] TW [Entered: 04/20/2020 01:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION by AmGuard Insurance Company to extend filing time for opening brief and appendix until May 26, 2020.. Date and method of service: 04/20/2020 ecf. [1000724358] [20-1246] Crystal Maluchnik [Entered: 04/20/2020 12:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Stephanie Renew and Steven Renew. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000721090] [20-1246] James Harvey [Entered: 04/14/2020 05:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by James Martin Harvey for Stephanie Renew and Steven Renew. [1000721066] [20-1246] James Harvey [Entered: 04/14/2020 04:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Michael A. Edwards, Brian Gibson, Luke Pickering, Brittin Ray, Stephanie Renew and Steven Renew re: filing of appearance form. Appearance form due on 04/13/2020 from Justin Tyler Bamberg, James Martin Harvey Jr., Charles Bradley Hutto and Herman Edward Smith, filing of disclosure form Disclosure statement due from Michael A. Edwards, Brian Gibson, Luke Pickering, Brittin Ray, Stephanie Renew and Steven Renew on 04/13/2020.. [20-1246] JHM [Entered: 04/10/2020 01:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) BRIEFING ORDER filed.. FILING OF PAPER COPIES OF BRIEFS/APPENDICES IS SUSPENDED PENDING FURTHER NOTICE FROM THE COURT. Opening Brief and Appendix due 04/27/2020. Response Brief due 05/27/2020 [20-1246] JHM [Entered: 03/18/2020 10:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Steven G. Janik for AmGuard Insurance Company. [1000703951] [20-1246] Steven Janik [Entered: 03/17/2020 03:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DOCKETING STATEMENT by AmGuard Insurance Company. [20-1246] Crystal Maluchnik [Entered: 03/17/2020 03:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by AmGuard Insurance Company. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000703940] [20-1246] Crystal Maluchnik [Entered: 03/17/2020 03:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Crystal L. Maluchnik for AmGuard Insurance Company. [1000703937] [20-1246] Crystal Maluchnik [Entered: 03/17/2020 03:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by SG Patel and Sons II LLC. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000703041] [20-1246] Daniel Settana [Entered: 03/16/2020 04:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Daniel R. Settana, Jr. for SG Patel and Sons II LLC. [1000703033] [20-1246] Daniel Settana [Entered: 03/16/2020 04:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case Originating case number: 5:19-cv-00635-JMC. [20-1246] JHM [Entered: 03/03/2020 03:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 5:19-cv-00635-JMC. Case manager: JMoore. [20-1246] JHM [Entered: 03/03/2020 03:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMGUARD INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Crystal L. Maluchnik

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven G. Janik