This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/26/2020 at 06:00:19 (UTC).

Amesbury v. City of Pawtucket, et al

Case Summary

On 04/27/2020 Amesbury filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against City of Pawtucket. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1447

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

DONNA M. PINTO

PAWTUCKET, RI

MELISSA C., Zoning and Code Enforcement

MICHAEL POLACECK

PAWTUCKET POLICE DEPARTMENT

DONALD R. GREBIEN

Plaintiff / Appellant

MARK E. AMESBURY, d/b/a Polytechnic

Pawtucket, RI 02861

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Michael A. DeSisto

Attorney at DeSisto Law LLC

60 Ship St

Providence, RI 02903

Patrick Kevin Burns

Attorney at DeSisto Law LLC

60 Ship St

Providence, RI 02903

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Mark E. Amesbury

110 Tweed St

Pawtucket, RI 02861

 

Court Documents

Open Document

ORDER entered. The notice of default issued on June 12, 2020 is hereby vacated as it was issued in error. [20-1447] (GAK) [Entered: 06/16/2020 05:00 PM]

Open Document #2

Form 4

Open Document #1

Order

Open Document

ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief filed by Appellant Mark E. Amesbury. Brief due 07/10/2020 for appellant Mark E. Amesbury. [20-1447] (ALW) [Entered: 06/03/2020 09:17 PM]

Open Document

MOTION to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellant Mark E. Amesbury. Certificate of service dated 06/03/2020. [20-1447] (MEA) [Entered: 06/03/2020 04:27 PM]

Open Document

BRIEFING schedule set. Brief due 06/10/2020 for appellant Mark E. Amesbury. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. Please see the court's general order issued April 20, 2020, requiring the electronic filing of appendices. [20-1447] (ALW) [Entered: 05/01/2020 12:26 AM]

Open Document #3

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document #2

Case Opening Notice

Open Document #1

Abbreviated Record

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER entered. The notice of default issued on June 12, 2020 is hereby vacated as it was issued in error. [20-1447] (GAK) [Entered: 06/16/2020 05:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of default and intent to dismiss for failure to pay the filing fee. Fee due 06/26/2020. [20-1447] (GAK) [Entered: 06/12/2020 01:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief filed by Appellant Mark E. Amesbury. Brief due 07/10/2020 for appellant Mark E. Amesbury. [20-1447] (ALW) [Entered: 06/03/2020 09:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellant Mark E. Amesbury. Certificate of service dated 06/03/2020. [20-1447] (MEA) [Entered: 06/03/2020 04:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING schedule set. Brief due 06/10/2020 for appellant Mark E. Amesbury. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. Please see the court's general order issued April 20, 2020, requiring the electronic filing of appendices. [20-1447] (ALW) [Entered: 05/01/2020 12:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #15) filed by Appellant Mark E. Amesbury. Fee due 05/11/2020. [20-1447] (MNH) [Entered: 04/27/2020 08:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PAWTUCKET POLICE DEPARTMENT is a litigant