This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 07/04/2022 at 06:01:20 (UTC).

American Southwest Mortgage Corp., et al v. Continental Casualty Company

Case Summary

On 05/05/2022 American Southwest Mortgage Corp filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Continental Casualty Company. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-6075

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

AMERICAN SOUTHWEST MORTGAGE FUNDING CORP.

AMERICAN SOUTHWEST MORTGAGE CORP.

Defendant / Appellee

CONTINENTAL CASUALTY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Troy J. McPherson

Attorney at Latham Steele Lehman Keele Ratcliff Freije & Carter

1515 East 71St Street, Suite 200

Tulsa, OK 74136

Marcus N. Ratcliff

1515 Eeast 71St Street, Suite 200

Tulsa, OK 74136

George S. Freedman

Attorney at Spencer Fane

9400 North Broadway Extension Suite 600

Oklahoma City, OK 73114-7423

Sarah S. Clutts

9400 North Broadway Extension Suite 600

Oklahoma City, OK 73114-7423

Andrew W. Lester

Attorney at Spencer Fane

9400 North Broadway Extension Suite 600

Oklahoma City, OK 73114-7423

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Roger N. Butler Jr.

Attorney at Secrest Hill Butler & Secrest

7134 South Yale Avenue, Suite 900

Tulsa, OK 74136

Pamela Signorello

Attorney at Wiley Rein

2050 M Street Nw

Washington, DC 20036

Richard A. Simpson

Attorney at Wiley Rein

2050 M Street Nw

Washington, DC 20036

 

Court Documents

Open Document #1

Preliminary Record

Open Document #2

General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil

Open Document

[10911531] Order filed by Clerk of the Court vacating the deadline for Continental Casualty Companys opening brief and appendix in no. 22-6071. These appeals will proceed on a cross-appeal briefing. The clerk will set forth a cross-appeal briefing schedule after the district court notifies the court that the record is complete for no. 22-6075 (see order for additional information). Served on 05/06/2022. [22-6071, 22-6075] [Entered: 05/06/2022 11:12 AM]

Open Document

[10914389] Docketing statement filed by American Southwest Mortgage Corp. and American Southwest Mortgage Funding Corp. in 22-6075. Served on 05/19/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-6075, 22-6071] GSF [Entered: 05/19/2022 12:01 PM]

Open Document

[10914626] Cross-appeal schedule set. Issued on 05/20/2022. First brief on cross-appeal and appendix due 06/29/2022 for Continental Casualty Company. [22-6071, 22-6075] [Entered: 05/20/2022 10:03 AM]

Open Document

[10912838] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Pamela Signorello and Mr. Richard A. Simpson for Continental Casualty Company. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y (already listed in the appeal). Served on 05/12/2022. Manner of Service: email [22-6075] [Entered: 05/12/2022 01:47 PM]

Open Document

[10913739] Entry of appearance filed by Troy J. McPherson for American Southwest Mortgage Funding Corp. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 05/17/2022. Manner of Service: email [22-6075] [Entered: 05/17/2022 10:13 AM]

Open Document

[10913881] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Roger N. Butler, Jr. for Continental Casualty Company. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 05/17/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-6075] [Entered: 05/17/2022 01:48 PM]

Open Document

[10914387] Notice received from American Southwest Mortgage Corp. and American Southwest Mortgage Funding Corp. in 22-6075 that a transcript is not necessary for this appeal. Served on: 05/19/2022. Manner of Service: email [22-6075, 22-6071] GSF [Entered: 05/19/2022 12:00 PM]

Open Document

[10914512] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. George S. Freedman and Mr. Andrew W. Lester for American Southwest Mortgage Corp. and American Southwest Mortgage Funding Corp. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 05/19/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-6075] [Entered: 05/19/2022 03:13 PM]

Open Document

[10914624] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 05/20/2022. [22-6075] [Entered: 05/20/2022 10:00 AM]

Open Document

[10923223] First brief on cross-appeal filed by Continental Casualty Company in 22-6071, 22-6075. Served on: 06/29/2022. Manner of service: email. Oral argument requested? Yes. Word/page count: 8111. This pleading complies with all required privacy and virus certifications: Yes. [22-6071, 22-6075] RAS [Entered: 06/29/2022 05:28 PM]

Open Document #1

Volume I

Open Document #2

Volume II

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2022
  • Docket[10923277] Minute order filed - the brief (and appendix) submitted by appellant/cross-appellee is accepted for filing. Paper copies shall now be filed with the court within 5 business days of this order. All copies must be exact replicas of the electronic filing(s), including all attachments and number of volumes filed (for appendices). Paper copies of first brief on cross-appeal and appendix due 07/08/2022 by Continental Casualty Company. Second cross-appeal brief now due 07/29/2022 by American Southwest Mortgage Funding Corp. and American Southwest Mortgage Corp. (Text Only - No Attachment) [22-6071, 22-6075] [Entered: 06/30/2022 08:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10923224] Appellant's appendix filed by Continental Casualty Company in 22-6071. Total number of volumes filed: 2. Served on 06/29/2022. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required privacy and virus certifications: Yes. [22-6071, 22-6075] RAS [Entered: 06/29/2022 05:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10923223] First brief on cross-appeal filed by Continental Casualty Company in 22-6071, 22-6075. Served on: 06/29/2022. Manner of service: email. Oral argument requested? Yes. Word/page count: 8111. This pleading complies with all required privacy and virus certifications: Yes. [22-6071, 22-6075] RAS [Entered: 06/29/2022 05:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10914626] Cross-appeal schedule set. Issued on 05/20/2022. First brief on cross-appeal and appendix due 06/29/2022 for Continental Casualty Company. [22-6071, 22-6075] [Entered: 05/20/2022 10:03 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10914624] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 05/20/2022. [22-6075] [Entered: 05/20/2022 10:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10914512] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. George S. Freedman and Mr. Andrew W. Lester for American Southwest Mortgage Corp. and American Southwest Mortgage Funding Corp. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 05/19/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-6075] [Entered: 05/19/2022 03:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • Docket[10914397] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 05/26/2022 for Carmelita Reeder Shinn. (Text Only - No Attachment) [22-6075] [Entered: 05/19/2022 12:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10914389] Docketing statement filed by American Southwest Mortgage Corp. and American Southwest Mortgage Funding Corp. in 22-6075. Served on 05/19/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-6075, 22-6071] GSF [Entered: 05/19/2022 12:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10914387] Notice received from American Southwest Mortgage Corp. and American Southwest Mortgage Funding Corp. in 22-6075 that a transcript is not necessary for this appeal. Served on: 05/19/2022. Manner of Service: email [22-6075, 22-6071] GSF [Entered: 05/19/2022 12:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • Docket[10914383] Entry of appearance submitted by Andrew W. Lester; George S. Freedman for Appellant American Southwest Mortgage Corp. in 22-6075 for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 05/19/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-6075,--[Edited 05/19/2022 by JM] 22-6071 PDF removed filed in 22-6075 only. ] GSF [Entered: 05/19/2022 11:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10913881] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Roger N. Butler, Jr. for Continental Casualty Company. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 05/17/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-6075] [Entered: 05/17/2022 01:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • Docket[10913871] Entry of appearance submitted by Roger N. Butler, Jr. for Appellee Continental Casualty Company for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 05/17/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-6075] --[Edited 05/17/2022 by SLS to remove PDF from docket entry as the document has been filed.] RNB [Entered: 05/17/2022 01:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10913739] Entry of appearance filed by Troy J. McPherson for American Southwest Mortgage Funding Corp. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 05/17/2022. Manner of Service: email [22-6075] [Entered: 05/17/2022 10:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • Docket[10913733] Entry of appearance submitted by Troy J. McPherson for Appellant American Southwest Mortgage Funding Corp. in 22-6075 for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 05/17/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-6075]--[Edited 05/17/2022 by DJD. Removed PDF as pleading filed 5/17/22 TJM [Entered: 05/17/2022 10:08 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10912838] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Pamela Signorello and Mr. Richard A. Simpson for Continental Casualty Company. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y (already listed in the appeal). Served on 05/12/2022. Manner of Service: email [22-6075] [Entered: 05/12/2022 01:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • Docket[10912822] Entry of appearance submitted by Richard A. Simpson and Pamela L. Signorello for Appellee Continental Casualty Company in 22-6075 for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 05/12/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-6075]--[Edited 05/12/2022 by KLP to delete the filing from 22-6071 and to delete the attachment; entry filed.] PS [Entered: 05/12/2022 01:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10911531] Order filed by Clerk of the Court vacating the deadline for Continental Casualty Companys opening brief and appendix in no. 22-6071. These appeals will proceed on a cross-appeal briefing. The clerk will set forth a cross-appeal briefing schedule after the district court notifies the court that the record is complete for no. 22-6075 (see order for additional information). Served on 05/06/2022. [22-6071, 22-6075] [Entered: 05/06/2022 11:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10911226] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 05/04/2022 Docketing statement, transcript order form and notice of appearance due 05/19/2022 for American Southwest Mortgage Corp. and American Southwest Mortgage Funding Corp. Notice of appearance due on 05/19/2022 for Continental Casualty Company [22-6075] [Entered: 05/05/2022 11:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Southwest Mortgage Funding Corp is a litigant

Latest cases where Continental Casualty Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Pamela L. Signorello

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Roger N Butler, Jr