This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 01/30/2021 at 06:00:01 (UTC).

American Lung Association, et al v. EPA, et al

Case Summary

On 01/19/2021 American Lung Association filed an Other lawsuit against EPA. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1027

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Petitioners

American Lung Association

Natural Resources Defense Council

National Parks Conservation Association

Environment America

Conservation Law Foundation

Sierra Club

Environmental Defense Fund

Union of Concerned Scientists

Citizens for Pennsylvania's Future

Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Inc.

Natural Resources Council of Maine

Respondents

Environmental Protection Agency

Andrew Wheeler, Administrator, U.S. Environmental Protection Agency

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Seth L. Johnson

Attorney at Earthjustice

1001 G Street, Nw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20001

Sean Michael Helle

Attorney at Earthjustice

1001 G Street, Nw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20001

John DuVal Walke Esquire

Attorney at Natural Resources Defense Council

1152 15Th Street, Nw, Suite 300

Washington, DC 20005

Emily Kingsbury Davis

Attorney at Natural Resources Defense Council

1152 15Th Street, Nw, Suite 300

Washington, DC 20005

Michael Landis

Attorney at U.S. PIRG

1543 Wazee Street, Suite 400

Denver, CO 80202

Hayden Wong Hashimoto

Attorney at Clean Air Task Force

114 State Street, 6Th Floor

Boston, MA 02109

Ann Brewster Weeks Esquire

Attorney at Clean Air Task Force

114 State Street, 6Th Floor

Boston, MA 02109

Peter Michel Zalzal Esquire

Attorney at Environmental Defense Fund

2060 Broadway, Suite 300

Boulder, CO 80302

Rachel E. Fullmer

Attorney at Environmental Defense Fund

1875 Connecticut Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20009

Ariel E. Solaski

Attorney at Chesapeake Bay Foundation

6 Herndon Avenue

Annapolis, MD 21403

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1881736] filed by Simi Bhat on behalf of Respondent EPA in 21-1014, 21-1027. [21-1014, 21-1027] (Bhat, Simi) [Entered: 01/25/2021 05:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S ORDER [1881414] filed consolidating cases 21-1027 (Consolidation started 01/22/2021) with 21-1014; directing party to file in 21-1027 initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 02/22/2021. PETITIONER statement of issues due 02/22/2021 [21-1014, 21-1027] [Entered: 01/22/2021 04:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY [1881405] of Petition for Review sent to respondent [ # 1881400-2 ] [21-1027] [Entered: 01/22/2021 04:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION FOR REVIEW [1881400] of a decision by federal agency filed by American Lung Association, Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Inc., Citizens for Pennsylvania's Future, Conservation Law Foundation, Environment America, Environmental Defense Fund, National Parks Conservation Association, Natural Resources Council of Maine, Natural Resources Defense Council, Sierra Club and Union of Concerned Scientists [Service Date: 01/19/2021 ] Disclosure Statement: Attached. [21-1027] [Entered: 01/22/2021 04:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR REVIEW CASE docketed. [21-1027] [Entered: 01/22/2021 04:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Union of Concerned Scientists is a litigant

Latest cases where Environment America is a litigant

Latest cases where National Parks Conservation Association is a litigant