This case was last updated from PACER on 09/13/2019 at 06:00:08 (UTC).

American Hospital Association, et al v. Alex Azar, II, et al

Case Summary

On 07/15/2019 American Hospital Association filed a Government Benefit - Medicare lawsuit against Alex Azar, II. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-5198

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Medicare

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellees

American Hospital Association

Fletcher Hospital, Inc., doing business as Park Ridge Health

Northern Light Health

Henry Ford Health System

Association of American Medical Colleges

America's Essential Hospitals

Defendant / Appellants

Alex Michael Azar, II, in his official capacity as the Secretary of Health and Human Services

United States Department of Health and Human Services

Amicus Curiae

Federation of American Hospitals

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

William Barnett Schultz Esquire

Attorney at Zuckerman Spaeder LLP

1800 M Street, Nw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20036-5802

Margaret Dotzel

Attorney at Zuckerman Spaeder LLP

1800 M Street, Nw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20036-5802

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

DOJ Appellate Counsel

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Alisa B. Klein

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Susan Maxson Lyons Esquire

Attorney at U.S. Department of Health & Human Services

330 Independence Avenue, Sw

Washington, DC 20201

Janice L. Hoffman

Attorney at U.S. Department of Health & Human Services

330 Independence Avenue, Sw

Washington, DC 20201

Mark B. Stern

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Laura Myron

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Robert Walter Balderston

Attorney at U.S. Department of Health & Human Services

330 Independence Avenue, Sw

Washington, DC 20201

Amicus Curiae Attorneys

Thomas Richard Barker

Attorney at Foley Hoag LLP

1717 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Andrew Matthew London

Attorney at Foley Hoag LLP

155 Seaport Boulevard

Boston, MA 02210

 

Court Documents

Open Document

CLERK'S ORDER [1806025] filed scheduling oral argument on Friday, 11/08/2019. [19-5048, 19-5198] [Entered: 09/11/2019 12:38 PM]

Open Document

AMICUS FOR APPELLANT BRIEF [1805870] filed by Federation of American Hospitals in 19-5198, 19-5048 [Service Date: 09/10/2019 ] Length of Brief: 3,568 Words. [19-5198, 19-5048]--[Edited 09/11/2019 by JAD--MODIFIED PARTY FILER] (London, Andrew) [Entered: 09/10/2019 01:54 PM]

Open Document

JOINT APPENDIX [1804790] filed by Mr. Alex Michael Azar, II and HHS in 19-5198, 19-5048. [Volumes: 1] [Service Date: 09/03/2019 ] [19-5198, 19-5048] (Myron, Laura) [Entered: 09/03/2019 08:22 PM]

Open Document

APPELLANT BRIEF [1804789] filed by Mr. Alex Michael Azar, II and HHS in 19-5198, 19-5048 [Service Date: 09/03/2019 ] Length of Brief: 8,774 words. [19-5198, 19-5048] (Myron, Laura) [Entered: 09/03/2019 08:05 PM]

Open Document #2

form(s) sent

Open Document #1

Order Sent

Open Document

CLERK'S ORDER [1799765] filed removing case 19-5048 from abeyance. [19-5048, 19-5198] [Entered: 07/30/2019 02:24 PM]

Open Document

UNOPPOSED MOTION [1799178] to consolidate cases filed by Mr. Alex Michael Azar, II and HHS [Service Date: 07/25/2019 ] Length Certification: 78 words. [19-5198] (Myron, Laura) [Entered: 07/25/2019 06:35 PM]

Open Document

MOTION [1798888] to expedite case, to establish briefing schedule filed by America's Essential Hospitals, American Hospital Association, Association of American Medical Colleges, Fletcher Hospital, Inc., Henry Ford Health System and Northern Light Health (Service Date: 07/24/2019 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 2,410 words. [19-5198] (Schultz, William) [Entered: 07/24/2019 05:09 PM]

Open Document

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1798882] filed by William B. Schultz and co-counsel Margaret M. Dotzel, Ezra B. Marcus on behalf of Appellees America's Essential Hospitals, American Hospital Association, Association of American Medical Colleges, Fletcher Hospital, Inc., Henry Ford Health System and Northern Light Health. [19-5198] (Schultz, William) [Entered: 07/24/2019 05:00 PM]

Open Document

STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1798573] filed by Mr. Alex Michael Azar, II and HHS [Service Date: 07/23/2019 ] [19-5198] (Myron, Laura) [Entered: 07/23/2019 02:52 PM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1798571] filed by Mr. Alex Michael Azar, II and HHS [Service Date: 07/23/2019 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - No transcripts are needed for the appeal. [19-5198] (Myron, Laura) [Entered: 07/23/2019 02:50 PM]

Open Document

DOCKETING STATEMENT [1798569] filed by Mr. Alex Michael Azar, II and HHS [Service Date: 07/23/2019 ] [19-5198] (Myron, Laura) [Entered: 07/23/2019 02:48 PM]

Open Document

CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1797834] filed by Mr. Alex Michael Azar, II and HHS [Service Date: 07/18/2019 ] [19-5198] (Myron, Laura) [Entered: 07/18/2019 10:56 AM]

Open Document

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1797833] filed by Laura E. Myron and co-counsel Alisa B. Klein; Mark B. Stern on behalf of Appellants Mr. Alex Michael Azar, II and HHS. [19-5198] (Myron, Laura) [Entered: 07/18/2019 10:54 AM]

Open Document

CLERK'S ORDER [1797189] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 08/14/2019. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 08/14/2019. APPELLANT statement of issues due 08/14/2019. APPELLANT underlying decision due 08/14/2019. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 08/14/2019. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 08/14/2019. APPELLANT transcript status report due 08/14/2019. APPELLANT procedural motions due 08/14/2019. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 08/29/2019; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 08/14/2019. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 08/14/2019. APPELLEE procedural motions due 08/14/2019. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 08/29/2019 [19-5198] [Entered: 07/15/2019 03:00 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE OF APPEAL [1797187] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:18-cv-02084-RC filed by Mr. Alex Michael Azar, II and HHS. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-5198. [19-5198] [Entered: 07/15/2019 02:59 PM]

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CORRECTED AMICUS FOR APPELLANT BRIEF [1806058] filed by Federation of American Hospitals in 19-5198, 19-5048 [Service Date: 09/11/2019 ] Length of Brief: 3,568 Words. [19-5198, 19-5048] (London, Andrew) [Entered: 09/11/2019 02:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S ORDER [1806025] filed scheduling oral argument on Friday, 11/08/2019. [19-5048, 19-5198] [Entered: 09/11/2019 12:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AMICUS FOR APPELLANT BRIEF [1805870] filed by Federation of American Hospitals in 19-5198, 19-5048 [Service Date: 09/10/2019 ] Length of Brief: 3,568 Words. [19-5198, 19-5048]--[Edited 09/11/2019 by JAD--MODIFIED PARTY FILER] (London, Andrew) [Entered: 09/10/2019 01:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • JOINT APPENDIX [1804790] filed by Mr. Alex Michael Azar, II and HHS in 19-5198, 19-5048. [Volumes: 1] [Service Date: 09/03/2019 ] [19-5198, 19-5048] (Myron, Laura) [Entered: 09/03/2019 08:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPELLANT BRIEF [1804789] filed by Mr. Alex Michael Azar, II and HHS in 19-5198, 19-5048 [Service Date: 09/03/2019 ] Length of Brief: 8,774 words. [19-5198, 19-5048] (Myron, Laura) [Entered: 09/03/2019 08:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PER CURIAM ORDER [1799771] filed granting motions to consolidate [ # 1799177-2 ] 19-5198 (Consolidation started 07/30/2019) with 19-5048, setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 09/03/2019. APPENDIX due 09/03/2019. APPELLEE Brief due on 09/24/2019. APPELLANT Reply Brief due 10/11/2019. Extensions of these deadlines will not be granted absent exceptional circumstances. See order for additional details. Before Judges: Griffith, Wilkins and Katsas. [19-5048, 19-5198] [Entered: 07/30/2019 02:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S ORDER [1799765] filed removing case 19-5048 from abeyance. [19-5048, 19-5198] [Entered: 07/30/2019 02:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • UNOPPOSED MOTION [1799178] to consolidate cases filed by Mr. Alex Michael Azar, II and HHS [Service Date: 07/25/2019 ] Length Certification: 78 words. [19-5198] (Myron, Laura) [Entered: 07/25/2019 06:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION [1798888] to expedite case, to establish briefing schedule filed by America's Essential Hospitals, American Hospital Association, Association of American Medical Colleges, Fletcher Hospital, Inc., Henry Ford Health System and Northern Light Health (Service Date: 07/24/2019 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 2,410 words. [19-5198] (Schultz, William) [Entered: 07/24/2019 05:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1798882] filed by William B. Schultz and co-counsel Margaret M. Dotzel, Ezra B. Marcus on behalf of Appellees America's Essential Hospitals, American Hospital Association, Association of American Medical Colleges, Fletcher Hospital, Inc., Henry Ford Health System and Northern Light Health. [19-5198] (Schultz, William) [Entered: 07/24/2019 05:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1798573] filed by Mr. Alex Michael Azar, II and HHS [Service Date: 07/23/2019 ] [19-5198] (Myron, Laura) [Entered: 07/23/2019 02:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1798571] filed by Mr. Alex Michael Azar, II and HHS [Service Date: 07/23/2019 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - No transcripts are needed for the appeal. [19-5198] (Myron, Laura) [Entered: 07/23/2019 02:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DOCKETING STATEMENT [1798569] filed by Mr. Alex Michael Azar, II and HHS [Service Date: 07/23/2019 ] [19-5198] (Myron, Laura) [Entered: 07/23/2019 02:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1797834] filed by Mr. Alex Michael Azar, II and HHS [Service Date: 07/18/2019 ] [19-5198] (Myron, Laura) [Entered: 07/18/2019 10:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1797833] filed by Laura E. Myron and co-counsel Alisa B. Klein; Mark B. Stern on behalf of Appellants Mr. Alex Michael Azar, II and HHS. [19-5198] (Myron, Laura) [Entered: 07/18/2019 10:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S ORDER [1797189] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 08/14/2019. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 08/14/2019. APPELLANT statement of issues due 08/14/2019. APPELLANT underlying decision due 08/14/2019. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 08/14/2019. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 08/14/2019. APPELLANT transcript status report due 08/14/2019. APPELLANT procedural motions due 08/14/2019. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 08/29/2019; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 08/14/2019. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 08/14/2019. APPELLEE procedural motions due 08/14/2019. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 08/29/2019 [19-5198] [Entered: 07/15/2019 03:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEAL [1797187] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:18-cv-02084-RC filed by Mr. Alex Michael Azar, II and HHS. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-5198. [19-5198] [Entered: 07/15/2019 02:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • US CIVIL CASE docketed. [19-5198] [Entered: 07/15/2019 02:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.