This case was last updated from PACER on 06/21/2019 at 06:10:34 (UTC).

American Guarantee & Liability v. Liberty Surplus Insurance Corp

Case Summary

On 04/22/2019 American Guarantee Liability filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Liberty Surplus Insurance Corp. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-11541

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellant

LIBERTY SURPLUS INSURANCE CORPORATION

Plaintiff / Appellee

AMERICAN GUARANTEE & LIABILITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Brian Scott Martin

Attorney at Thompson Coe Cousins & Irons, LLP

1 Riverway Ste 1400

Houston, TX 77056

Nicole C. Leet

Attorney at Gray Rust St. Amand Moffett & Brieske, LLP

950 E Paces Ferry Rd Ne Ste 1700

Atlanta, GA 30326

Kevin Frank Risley

Attorney at Thompson Coe Cousins & Irons, LLP

1 Riverway Ste 1400

Houston, TX 77056

Christopher H. Avery

Attorney at Thompson Coe Cousins & Irons, LLP

1 Riverway Ste 1400

Houston, TX 77056

Michael J. Rust

Attorney at Gray Rust St. Amand Moffett & Brieske, LLP

577 Mulberry St Ste 710, Pob 1975

Macon, GA 31201

Brian Scott Martin I

Attorney at Thompson Coe Cousins & Irons, LLP

1 Riverway Ste 1400

Houston, TX 77056

Kevin F. Risley

Attorney at Thompson Coe Cousins & Irons, LLP

1 Riverway Ste 1400

Houston, TX 77056

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Melissa Kaye Kahren

Attorney at Swift Currie McGhee & Hiers, LLP

1355 Peachtree St Ne Ste 300

Atlanta, GA 30309

Thomas Bradley Ward

Attorney at Swift Currie McGhee & Hiers, LLP

1355 Peachtree St Ne Ste 300

Atlanta, GA 30309

Stephen Michael Schatz

Attorney at Swift Currie McGhee & Hiers, LLP

1355 Peachtree St Ne Ste 300

Atlanta, GA 30309

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Briefing Notice issued to Appellant Liberty Surplus Insurance Corporation. The appellant's brief is due on or before 07/23/2019. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 06/18/2019 04:46 PM]

Open Document

ORDER: Motion for extension to file transcripts filed by David A. Ritchie is GRANTED by clerk. [ # 8785077-2 ] Transcript is due on or before 06/15/2019. Transcript Order: Court Reporter: David A. Ritchie, Discount Invoked: n. [Entered: 06/03/2019 04:30 PM]

Open Document

Motion for extension of time to file a transcript to 06/15/2019 filed by Court Reporter David A. Ritchie. [8785077-1] [Entered: 05/29/2019 12:21 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11541] (ECF: Stephen Schatz) [Entered: 05/22/2019 04:28 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Thomas Ward for American Guarantee & Liability Insurance Company Thomas Bradley Ward for American Guarantee & Liability Insurance Company. [19-11541] (ECF: Stephen Schatz) [Entered: 05/08/2019 02:41 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Stephen Schatz for American Guarantee & Liability Insurance Company Stephen Michael Schatz for American Guarantee & Liability Insurance Company. [19-11541] (ECF: Stephen Schatz) [Entered: 05/08/2019 02:40 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Melissa K. Kahren for American Guarantee & Liability Insurance Company Melissa Kaye Kahren for American Guarantee & Liability Insurance Company. [19-11541] (ECF: Stephen Schatz) [Entered: 05/08/2019 02:39 PM]

Open Document

Court Reporter Acknowledgment filed. Transcript Order: David A. Ritchie, 05/08/2019, Liberty Surplus Insurance Corporation, Trial 08/20/2018. [Entered: 05/08/2019 02:29 PM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM PROCESSED. Transcript Order: Filer: Liberty Surplus Insurance Corporation, Court Reporter: David A. Ritchie, Proceeding Type and Date: Trial 08/20/2018. [Entered: 05/08/2019 02:26 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Michael J. Rust for Appellant Liberty Surplus Insurance Corporation. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11541] (ECF: Michael Rust) [Entered: 05/03/2019 02:46 PM]

Open Document

Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Michael J. Rust for Appellant Liberty Surplus Insurance Corporation. [19-11541] (ECF: Michael Rust) [Entered: 05/03/2019 02:36 PM]

Open Document #2

Bar Application for Admission not filed

Open Document #1

ATTY-1 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Michael J. Rust for Appellant Liberty Surplus Insurance Corporation. Transcript(s) ordered. [19-11541] (ECF: Michael Rust) [Entered: 05/03/2019 12:46 PM]

Open Document #3

Leet Appearance

Open Document #2

Rust Appearance

Open Document #1

Appearance of Counsel Form Filed

Open Document

Appellate fee was paid on 04/22/2019 as to Appellant Liberty Surplus Insurance Corporation. [Entered: 04/24/2019 05:35 PM]

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Briefing Notice issued to Appellant Liberty Surplus Insurance Corporation. The appellant's brief is due on or before 07/23/2019. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 06/18/2019 04:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • TRANSCRIPTS FILED. Transcript Order: Court Reporter: David A. Ritchie, Filer: Liberty Surplus Insurance Corporation, Dt. all Trans. Filed: 06/13/2019, Proceeding Type and Date: Trial 08/20/2018. [Entered: 06/18/2019 04:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER: Motion for extension to file transcripts filed by David A. Ritchie is GRANTED by clerk. [ # 8785077-2 ] Transcript is due on or before 06/15/2019. Transcript Order: Court Reporter: David A. Ritchie, Discount Invoked: n. [Entered: 06/03/2019 04:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for extension of time to file a transcript to 06/15/2019 filed by Court Reporter David A. Ritchie. [8785077-1] [Entered: 05/29/2019 12:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11541] (ECF: Stephen Schatz) [Entered: 05/22/2019 04:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Thomas Ward for American Guarantee & Liability Insurance Company Thomas Bradley Ward for American Guarantee & Liability Insurance Company. [19-11541] (ECF: Stephen Schatz) [Entered: 05/08/2019 02:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Stephen Schatz for American Guarantee & Liability Insurance Company Stephen Michael Schatz for American Guarantee & Liability Insurance Company. [19-11541] (ECF: Stephen Schatz) [Entered: 05/08/2019 02:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Melissa K. Kahren for American Guarantee & Liability Insurance Company Melissa Kaye Kahren for American Guarantee & Liability Insurance Company. [19-11541] (ECF: Stephen Schatz) [Entered: 05/08/2019 02:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Court Reporter Acknowledgment filed. Transcript Order: David A. Ritchie, 05/08/2019, Liberty Surplus Insurance Corporation, Trial 08/20/2018. [Entered: 05/08/2019 02:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM PROCESSED. Transcript Order: Filer: Liberty Surplus Insurance Corporation, Court Reporter: David A. Ritchie, Proceeding Type and Date: Trial 08/20/2018. [Entered: 05/08/2019 02:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Michael J. Rust for Appellant Liberty Surplus Insurance Corporation. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11541] (ECF: Michael Rust) [Entered: 05/03/2019 02:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Michael J. Rust for Appellant Liberty Surplus Insurance Corporation. [19-11541] (ECF: Michael Rust) [Entered: 05/03/2019 02:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Appearance of Counsel Form returned to Attorney Brian Scott Martin for Appellant Liberty Surplus Insurance Corporation for failure to file application for admission. [Entered: 05/03/2019 02:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Michael J. Rust for Appellant Liberty Surplus Insurance Corporation. Transcript(s) ordered. [19-11541] (ECF: Michael Rust) [Entered: 05/03/2019 12:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Brian Scott Martin for Liberty Surplus Insurance Corporation, Nicole C. Leet for Liberty Surplus Insurance Corporation and Michael J. Rust for Liberty Surplus Insurance Corporation. [19-11541] (ECF: Michael Rust) [Entered: 05/03/2019 12:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Appellate fee was paid on 04/22/2019 as to Appellant Liberty Surplus Insurance Corporation. [Entered: 04/24/2019 05:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Liberty Surplus Insurance Corporation on 04/22/2019. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 05/06/2019 as to Appellant Liberty Surplus Insurance Corporation. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 05/20/2019 as to Appellee American Guarantee & Liability Insurance Company [Entered: 04/24/2019 05:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.