This case was last updated from PACER on 05/16/2021 at 06:10:06 (UTC).

American Federation of State, et al v. Board of County Commissioners, et al

Case Summary

On 03/17/2021 American Federation of State filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Board of County Commissioners. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-2023

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellees

ERIC ALLEN

AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE, COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES, NEW MEXICO COUNCIL 18, LOCAL 2499

AFL-CIO

STEPHEN PERKINS

PATRICK GARCIA

ALEXA CAVIS

Defendant / Appellants

GREG REES

BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS OF BERNALILLO COUNTY

RALPH FERNANDEZ

ERIN THOMAS, AKA Erin Riley

GREGORY RICHARDSON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Shane Youtz

Attorney at Youtz & Valdez

900 Gold Avenue, Sw

Albuquerque, NM 87102-0000

James Montalbano

Attorney at Youtz & Valdez

900 Gold Avenue, Sw

Albuquerque, NM 87102-0000

Stephen Curtice

Attorney at Youtz & Valdez

900 Gold Avenue, Sw

Albuquerque, NM 87102-0000

Defendant / Appellant Attorney

Jonlyn M. Martinez

Attorney at Law Firm of Jonlyn M. Martinez

P.O. Box 1805

Albuquerque, NM 87103-1805

 

Court Documents

Open Document

[10829097] Mandate issued. [21-2023] [Entered: 05/11/2021 04:29 PM]

Open Document

[10829095] Rule 33 case terminated. Frap 42; Procedural termination without judicial action. Clerk of Court [21-2023] [Entered: 05/11/2021 04:29 PM]

Open Document

[10829046] Stipulation to dismiss case filed by Board of County Commissioners of Bernalillo County, Ralph Fernandez, Greg Rees, Mr. Gregory Richardson and Erin Thomas. Served on 05/11/2021. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [21-2023] JMM [Entered: 05/11/2021 03:06 PM]

Open Document

[10819549] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 04/01/2021. Appellants' brief and appendix due on 05/11/2021 for Board of County Commissioners of Bernalillo County, Ralph Fernandez, Greg Rees, Gregory Richardson and Erin Thomas. [21-2023] [Entered: 04/02/2021 07:19 AM]

Open Document

[10819481] Notice that transcript is not necessary filed by Board of County Commissioners of Bernalillo County, Ralph Fernandez, Greg Rees, Mr. Gregory Richardson and Erin Thomas. Transcript ordered: Served on: 04/01/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-2023]--[Edited 04/01/2021 by AT - To use correct event code as transcirpts were not ordered. ] JMM [Entered: 04/01/2021 02:37 PM]

Open Document

[10819390] Deficiency notice issued. Type of deficiency: Transcirpt order form due and not filed with the court. Transcript order due 04/05/2021 for Board of County Commissioners of Bernalillo County, Ralph Fernandez, Greg Rees, Gregory Richardson, and Erin Thomas. [21-2023] [Entered: 04/01/2021 11:00 AM]

Open Document

[10819061] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Stephen Curtice and Mr. Shane Youtz for AFL-CIO, Stephen Perkins, American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees, New Mexico Council 18, Local 2499, Eric Allen, Patrick Garcia and Alexa Cavis. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 03/31/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-2023] [Entered: 03/31/2021 02:01 PM]

Open Document #2

Mediation Contact Form

Open Document #1

Mediation Conference Notice

Open Document

[10817629] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Jonlyn M. Martinez for Gregory Richardson, Board of County Commissioners of Bernalillo County, Ralph Fernandez, Greg Rees and Erin Thomas. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 03/24/2021. Manner of Service: email [21-2023] [Entered: 03/24/2021 04:46 PM]

Open Document

[10817623] Docketing statement filed by Board of County Commissioners of Bernalillo County, Ralph Fernandez, Greg Rees, Mr. Gregory Richardson and Erin Thomas. Served on 03/24/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-2023] JMM [Entered: 03/24/2021 04:35 PM]

Open Document #2

General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil

Open Document #1

Preliminary ROA

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10829097] Mandate issued. [21-2023] [Entered: 05/11/2021 04:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10829095] Rule 33 case terminated. Frap 42; Procedural termination without judicial action. Clerk of Court [21-2023] [Entered: 05/11/2021 04:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • Docket[10829092] Order filed by granting Attorney motion to dismiss case. As contained in the Court's final order. Text only entry - no attachment. [21-2023] [Entered: 05/11/2021 04:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10829046] Stipulation to dismiss case filed by Board of County Commissioners of Bernalillo County, Ralph Fernandez, Greg Rees, Mr. Gregory Richardson and Erin Thomas. Served on 05/11/2021. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [21-2023] JMM [Entered: 05/11/2021 03:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10819549] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 04/01/2021. Appellants' brief and appendix due on 05/11/2021 for Board of County Commissioners of Bernalillo County, Ralph Fernandez, Greg Rees, Gregory Richardson and Erin Thomas. [21-2023] [Entered: 04/02/2021 07:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • Docket[10819495] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 04/08/2021 for Mitchell R. Elfers, Clerk of Court (oclk). (Text Only - No Attachment) [21-2023] [Entered: 04/01/2021 03:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10819481] Notice that transcript is not necessary filed by Board of County Commissioners of Bernalillo County, Ralph Fernandez, Greg Rees, Mr. Gregory Richardson and Erin Thomas. Transcript ordered: Served on: 04/01/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-2023]--[Edited 04/01/2021 by AT - To use correct event code as transcirpts were not ordered. ] JMM [Entered: 04/01/2021 02:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10819390] Deficiency notice issued. Type of deficiency: Transcirpt order form due and not filed with the court. Transcript order due 04/05/2021 for Board of County Commissioners of Bernalillo County, Ralph Fernandez, Greg Rees, Gregory Richardson, and Erin Thomas. [21-2023] [Entered: 04/01/2021 11:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10819061] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Stephen Curtice and Mr. Shane Youtz for AFL-CIO, Stephen Perkins, American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees, New Mexico Council 18, Local 2499, Eric Allen, Patrick Garcia and Alexa Cavis. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 03/31/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-2023] [Entered: 03/31/2021 02:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • Docket[10819058] Entry of appearance submitted by Shane Youtz and Stephen Curtice for Appellees Eric Allen, American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees, New Mexico Council 18, Local 2499, Alexa Cavis, Patrick Garcia and Stephen Perkins for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 03/31/2021. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 03/31/2021 by SDS to remove pdf from entry as the pleading has been filed] [21-2023] SY [Entered: 03/31/2021 01:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10817684] Notice of Mediation Conference filed by the Tenth Circuit Mediation Office. Telephone conference scheduled for 04/06/2021 at 10:00 am (MT). The mediation contact form must be completed and returned to the Mediation Office within four days of the date of this notice. [Please open the Notice for important information.] [21-2023] [Entered: 03/25/2021 08:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10817629] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Jonlyn M. Martinez for Gregory Richardson, Board of County Commissioners of Bernalillo County, Ralph Fernandez, Greg Rees and Erin Thomas. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 03/24/2021. Manner of Service: email [21-2023] [Entered: 03/24/2021 04:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10817623] Docketing statement filed by Board of County Commissioners of Bernalillo County, Ralph Fernandez, Greg Rees, Mr. Gregory Richardson and Erin Thomas. Served on 03/24/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-2023] JMM [Entered: 03/24/2021 04:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • Docket[10817621] Entry of appearance submitted by Jonlyn M. Martinez for Appellants Board of County Commissioners of Bernalillo County, Ralph Fernandez, Greg Rees, Mr. Gregory Richardson and Erin Thomas for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 03/24/2021. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 03/24/2021 by JJH to remove pdf as pleading filed 03/23/2021][21-2023] JMM [Entered: 03/24/2021 04:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10815803] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 03/17/2021. Docketing statement, transcript order form and entry of appearance due 03/31/2021 for Board of County Commissioners of Bernalillo County, Ralph Fernandez, Greg Rees, Gregory Richardson and Erin Thomas. Notice of appearance due on 03/31/2021 for AFL-CIO, Eric Allen, American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees, New Mexico Council 18, Local 2499, Alexa Cavis, Patrick Garcia, Stephen Perkins. [21-2023] [Entered: 03/17/2021 11:25 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Board of County Commissioners for Bernalillo County is a litigant

Latest cases where AFL-CIO is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES LOCAL 619 DISTRICT COUNCIL 36 is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jonlyn M Martinez