This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 02/20/2021 at 05:42:59 (UTC).

American Academy of Pediatrics, et al v. EPA, et al

Case Summary

On 02/11/2021 American Academy of Pediatrics filed an Other lawsuit against EPA. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1060

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Natural Resources Council of Maine

American Academy of Pediatrics

American Public Health Association

Sierra Club

Appalachian Mountain Club

American Lung Association

Natural Resources Defense Council

Conservation Law Foundation

Environmental Law and Policy Center

Respondent

Environmental Protection Agency

Intervenors

American Wood Council

State of Mississippi

State of Montana

American Forest & Paper Association

American Chemistry Council

American Petroleum Institute

State of Arkansas

State of Missouri

State of Louisiana

Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America

7 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Ann Brewster Weeks Esquire

Attorney at Clean Air Task Force

114 State Street, 6Th Floor

Boston, MA 02109

Seth L. Johnson

Attorney at Earthjustice

1001 G Street, Nw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20001

Marvin C. Brown IV

Attorney at Earthjustice

1001 G Street, Nw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20001

John DuVal Walke Esquire

Attorney at Natural Resources Defense Council

1152 15Th Street, Nw, Suite 300

Washington, DC 20005

Emily Kingsbury Davis

Attorney at Natural Resources Defense Council

1152 15Th Street, Nw, Suite 300

Washington, DC 20005

Howard Learner

Attorney at Environmental Law & Policy Center

35 E. Wacker Drive, Suite 1600

Chicago, IL 60601

Ann Jaworski

Attorney at Environmental Law & Policy Center

35 E. Wacker Drive, Suite 1600

Chicago, IL 60601

Respondent Attorney

Benjamin Carlisle

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

Po Box 7611, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044-7611

Intervenor Attorneys

James Robert Bieke

Attorney at Sidley Austin LLP

1501 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Dylan L. Jacobs

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General, State of Arkansas

323 Center Street, Suite 200

Little Rock, AR 72201

Vincent M. Wagner

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General, State of Arkansas

323 Center Street, Suite 200

Little Rock, AR 72201

Nicholas Jacob Bronni

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General, State of Arkansas

323 Center Street, Suite 200

Little Rock, AR 72201

Dean John Sauer

Attorney at Office of the Missouri Attorney General

Po Box 899

Jefferson City, MO 65102

Elizabeth Baker Murrill Esquire

Attorney at Louisiana Attorney General

Po Box 94005

Baton Rouge, LA 70804

Michael Benjamin Schon

Attorney at U.S. Chamber Litigation Center

1615 H Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20062

Other Attorneys

Michael Landis

Attorney at U.S. PIRG

1543 Wazee Street, Suite 400

Denver, CO 80202

Peter Michel Zalzal Esquire

Attorney at Environmental Defense Fund

2060 Broadway, Suite 300

Boulder, CO 80302

Rachel E. Fullmer

Attorney at Environmental Defense Fund

1875 Connecticut Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20009

Jon Alan Mueller

Attorney at Chesapeake Bay Foundation

6 Herndon Avenue

Annapolis, MD 21403

Ariel E. Solaski

Attorney at Chesapeake Bay Foundation

6 Herndon Avenue

Annapolis, MD 21403

1 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #1

Motion Filed (Unopposed)

Open Document #2

Attachment 1

Open Document

Open Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION [1886099] for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Not Applicable to this Party] filed by States of Texas, Arkansas, Louisiana, Mississippi, Missouri and Montana [Service Date: 02/18/2021 ] [21-1028, 21-1060]--[Edited 02/19/2021 by SRJ] (Stone, Judd) [Entered: 02/18/2021 11:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION [1886030] for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Attached] filed by Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, the American Petroleum Institute, the American Forest & Paper Association, the American Wood Council, and the American Chemistry Council [Service Date: 02/18/2021 ] [21-1028, 21-1060]--[Edited 02/19/2021 by SRJ] (Bieke, James) [Entered: 02/18/2021 03:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNOPPOSED MOTION [1885865] to hold case in abeyance filed by Jane Nishida and EPA in 21-1028, 21-1060 [Service Date: 02/17/2021 ] Length Certification: 598 words. [21-1028, 21-1060] (Carlisle, Benjamin) [Entered: 02/17/2021 05:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1885845] filed by Benjamin Carlisle on behalf of Respondents EPA and Jane Nishida in 21-1028, 21-1060. [21-1028, 21-1060] (Carlisle, Benjamin) [Entered: 02/17/2021 05:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1885688] filed by Claiborne E. Walthall and co-counsel Michael J. Myers, Steven C. Wu on behalf of Petitioner State of New York in 21-1028. [21-1028, 21-1060] (Myers, Michael) [Entered: 02/17/2021 12:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S ORDER [1885376] filed consolidating cases 21-1060 (Consolidation started 02/16/2021) with 21-1028; directing party to file in 21-1060 initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 03/18/2021. PETITIONER statement of issues due 03/18/2021 [21-1028, 21-1060] [Entered: 02/16/2021 01:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY [1885369] of Petition for Review sent to respondent [ # 1885367-2 ] [21-1060] [Entered: 02/16/2021 12:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION FOR REVIEW [1885367] of a decision by federal agency filed by American Academy of Pediatrics, American Lung Association, American Public Health Association, Appalachian Mountain Club, Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Inc., Clean Air Council, Conservation Law Foundation, Environment America, Environmental Defense Fund, Environmental Law and Policy Center, National Parks Conservation Association, Natural Resources Council of Maine, Natural Resources Defense Council and Sierra Club [Service Date: 02/11/2021 ] Disclosure Statement: Attached. [21-1060] [Entered: 02/16/2021 12:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR REVIEW CASE docketed. [21-1060] [Entered: 02/16/2021 12:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Appalachian Mountain Club is a litigant

Latest cases where American Forest & Paper Association is a litigant

Latest cases where ENVIRONMENTAL LAW AND POLICY CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where American Chemistry Council is a litigant