This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/17/2022 at 06:07:55 (UTC).

Ameranth, Inc. v. Travelocity.com LP

Case Summary

On 04/18/2022 Ameranth, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Travelocity com LP. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-1678

  • Filing Date:

    04/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

AMERANTH, INC.

Defendant / Appellee

TRAVELOCITY.COM LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Richard Charles Weinblatt

Attorney at Stamoulis & Weinblatt LLC

800 N West Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

William Caldarelli

3398 Carmel Mountain Road, Suite 250

San Diego, CA 92121

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Richard Stephen Zembek

Attorney at Norton Rose Fulbright US LLP

1301 Mckinney Street

Houston, TX 77010

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) Amended Notice of Appeal for Ameranth, Inc.. Service: 05/20/2022 by email. [851588] [ALK] [Entered: 05/24/2022 02:20 PM]

#10

(#10) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submissions of Appellee Travelocity.com LP, Entry of Appearance, Certificate of Interest, and Docketing Statement [ # 7 ], [ # 8 ], [ # 9 ], are not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant documents are due on 05/10/2022. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [847113] [EKD] [Entered: 05/03/2022 11:33 AM]

#9

(#9) Docketing Statement for the Appellee Travelocity.com LP. Service: 05/02/2022 by email. [846875] [22-1678] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 10 ] [Stephanie DeBrow] [Entered: 05/02/2022 03:03 PM]

#8

(#8) Certificate of Interest for Appellee Travelocity.com LP. Service: 05/02/2022 by email. [846874] [22-1678] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 10 ] [Stephanie DeBrow] [Entered: 05/02/2022 03:02 PM]

#7

(#7) Entry of appearance for Jonathan S. Franklin; Richard S. Zembek; Stephanie N. DeBrow as counsel for Appellee Travelocity.com LP ; Travelscape LLC (formerly Travelocity.com LP). Service: 05/02/2022 by email. [846751] [22-1678] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 10 ] [Jonathan Franklin] [Entered: 05/02/2022 12:32 PM]

#6

(#6) MOTION of Appellant Ameranth, Inc. to consolidate appeals (22-1655, 22-1657, 22-1660, 22-1661, 22-1662, 22-1663, 22-1666, 22-1667, 22-1668, 22-1669, 22-1671, 22-1672, 22-1673, 22-1674, 22-1675, 22-1676, 22-1677,22-1678, 22-1679, 22-1680, 22-1681, 22-1682,22-1683,22-1684,22-1686, 22-1687, 22-1689, 22-1690, 22-1692). Service: 04/29/2022 by email. [846506] [22-1678] [Richard Weinblatt] [Entered: 04/29/2022 04:03 PM]

#11

(#11) ORDER granting motion to consolidate appeals [ # 846474-2 ] [ # 846475-2 ] [ # 846476-2 ] [ # 846478-2 ] [ # 846482-2 ] [ # 846484-2 ] [ # 846485-2 ] [ # 846486-2 ] [ # 846487-2 ] [ # 846490-2 ] [ # 846491-2 ] [ # 846495-2 ] [ # 846496-2 ] [ # 846499-2 ] [ # 846500-2 ] [ # 846501-2 ] [ # 846504-2 ] [ # 6 ] [ # 846507-2 ] [ # 846508-2 ] [ # 846509-2 ] [ # 846510-2 ] [ # 846511-2 ] [ # 846512-2 ] [ # 846513-2 ] [ # 846514-2 ] [ # 846516-2 ] [ # 846519-2 ] [ # 846521-2 ] filed by Appellant Ameranth, Inc. The appeals are consolidated, and thus one set of briefs should be filed for all of the appeals. The revised official caption is reflected above. Appellant's opening brief is due no later than June 17, 2022. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [847428] [22-1655, 22-1657, 22-1660, 22-1661, 22-1662, 22-1663, 22-1666, 22-1667, 22-1668, 22-1669, 22-1671, 22-1672, 22-1673, 22-1674, 22-1675, 22-1676, 22-1677, 22-1678, 22-1679, 22-1680, 22-1681, 22-1682, 22-1683, 22-1684, 22-1686, 22-1687, 22-1689, 22-1690, 22-1692] [LMS] [Entered: 05/04/2022 11:06 AM]

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Amended Notice of Appeal for Ameranth, Inc.. Service: 05/20/2022 by email. [851588] [ALK] [Entered: 05/24/2022 02:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • Docket(#12) Note to File: The following cases are consolidated: 22-1655 Lead with 22-1657, 22-1660, 22-1661, 22-1662, 22-1663, 22-1666, 22-1667, 22-1668, 22-1669, 22-1671, 22-1672, 22-1673, 22-1674, 22-1675, 22-1676, 22-1677, 22-1678, 22-1679, 22-1680, 22-1681, 22-1682, 22-1683, 22-1684, 22-1686, 22-1687, 22-1689, 22-1690, and 22-1692 Member cases. The parties must file all documents in the lead appeal only. [847531] [22-1655, 22-1657, 22-1660, 22-1661, 22-1662, 22-1663, 22-1666, 22-1667, 22-1668, 22-1669, 22-1671, 22-1672, 22-1673, 22-1674, 22-1675, 22-1676, 22-1677, 22-1678, 22-1679, 22-1680, 22-1681, 22-1682, 22-1683, 22-1684, 22-1686, 22-1687, 22-1689, 22-1690, 22-1692] [CAB] [Entered: 05/04/2022 01:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER granting motion to consolidate appeals [ # 846474-2 ] [ # 846475-2 ] [ # 846476-2 ] [ # 846478-2 ] [ # 846482-2 ] [ # 846484-2 ] [ # 846485-2 ] [ # 846486-2 ] [ # 846487-2 ] [ # 846490-2 ] [ # 846491-2 ] [ # 846495-2 ] [ # 846496-2 ] [ # 846499-2 ] [ # 846500-2 ] [ # 846501-2 ] [ # 846504-2 ] [ # 6 ] [ # 846507-2 ] [ # 846508-2 ] [ # 846509-2 ] [ # 846510-2 ] [ # 846511-2 ] [ # 846512-2 ] [ # 846513-2 ] [ # 846514-2 ] [ # 846516-2 ] [ # 846519-2 ] [ # 846521-2 ] filed by Appellant Ameranth, Inc. The appeals are consolidated, and thus one set of briefs should be filed for all of the appeals. The revised official caption is reflected above. Appellant's opening brief is due no later than June 17, 2022. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [847428] [22-1655, 22-1657, 22-1660, 22-1661, 22-1662, 22-1663, 22-1666, 22-1667, 22-1668, 22-1669, 22-1671, 22-1672, 22-1673, 22-1674, 22-1675, 22-1676, 22-1677, 22-1678, 22-1679, 22-1680, 22-1681, 22-1682, 22-1683, 22-1684, 22-1686, 22-1687, 22-1689, 22-1690, 22-1692] [LMS] [Entered: 05/04/2022 11:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submissions of Appellee Travelocity.com LP, Entry of Appearance, Certificate of Interest, and Docketing Statement [ # 7 ], [ # 8 ], [ # 9 ], are not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant documents are due on 05/10/2022. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [847113] [EKD] [Entered: 05/03/2022 11:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docketing Statement for the Appellee Travelocity.com LP. Service: 05/02/2022 by email. [846875] [22-1678] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 10 ] [Stephanie DeBrow] [Entered: 05/02/2022 03:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Certificate of Interest for Appellee Travelocity.com LP. Service: 05/02/2022 by email. [846874] [22-1678] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 10 ] [Stephanie DeBrow] [Entered: 05/02/2022 03:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Entry of appearance for Jonathan S. Franklin; Richard S. Zembek; Stephanie N. DeBrow as counsel for Appellee Travelocity.com LP ; Travelscape LLC (formerly Travelocity.com LP). Service: 05/02/2022 by email. [846751] [22-1678] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 10 ] [Jonathan Franklin] [Entered: 05/02/2022 12:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION of Appellant Ameranth, Inc. to consolidate appeals (22-1655, 22-1657, 22-1660, 22-1661, 22-1662, 22-1663, 22-1666, 22-1667, 22-1668, 22-1669, 22-1671, 22-1672, 22-1673, 22-1674, 22-1675, 22-1676, 22-1677,22-1678, 22-1679, 22-1680, 22-1681, 22-1682,22-1683,22-1684,22-1686, 22-1687, 22-1689, 22-1690, 22-1692). Service: 04/29/2022 by email. [846506] [22-1678] [Richard Weinblatt] [Entered: 04/29/2022 04:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Transcript Purchase Order Form for the Appellant Ameranth, Inc. indicating that a transcript is not needed for the appeal. Service: 04/29/2022 by email. [846316] [22-1678] [Richard Weinblatt] [Entered: 04/29/2022 11:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Entry of appearance for Richard C. Weinblatt as counsel for Appellant Ameranth, Inc.. Service: 04/29/2022 by email. [846315] [22-1678] [Richard Weinblatt] [Entered: 04/29/2022 11:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docketing Statement for the Appellant Ameranth, Inc.. Service: 04/29/2022 by email. [846313] [22-1678] [Richard Weinblatt] [Entered: 04/29/2022 11:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Certificate of Interest for Appellant Ameranth, Inc.. Service: 04/29/2022 by email. [846311] [22-1678] [Richard Weinblatt] [Entered: 04/29/2022 11:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 04/14/2022. [843743] Entry of Appearance is due on 05/02/2022. Certificate of Interest is due on 05/02/2022. Docketing Statement is due on 05/02/2022. Appellant's brief is due on 06/17/2022. [JCW] [Entered: 04/18/2022 09:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ameranth Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Travelocity is a litigant