This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/14/2022 at 06:10:23 (UTC).

Ameranth, Inc. v. Seamless North America, LLC

Case Summary

On 04/15/2022 Ameranth, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Seamless North America, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-1660

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

AMERANTH, INC.

Defendant / Appellees

SEAMLESS NORTH AMERICA, LLC

GRUBHUB, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

William Caldarelli

3398 Carmel Mountain Road, Suite 250

San Diego, CA 92121

Richard Charles Weinblatt

Attorney at Stamoulis & Weinblatt LLC

800 N West Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Eliot Damon Williams

Attorney at Baker Botts, LLP

1001 Page Mill Road, Building One

Palo Alto, CA 94304

Robert C. Scheinfeld Esq.

Attorney at Baker Botts, LLP

30 Rockefeller Plaza

New York, NY 10112

Eric J. Faragi

Attorney at Baker Botts, LLP

30 Rockefeller Plaza

New York, NY 10112

Michael Edward Knierim

30 Rockefeller Plaza

New York, NY 10112

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) Amended Notice of Appeal for Ameranth, Inc.. Service: 05/20/2022 by email. [851570] [ALK] [Entered: 05/24/2022 02:03 PM]

#16

(#16) Corrected Docketing Statement for the Appellees Grubhub, Inc. and Seamless North America, LLC. Service: 05/03/2022 by email. [847361] [22-1660] [Robert Scheinfeld] [Entered: 05/03/2022 11:23 PM]

#15

(#15) Corrected Certificate of Interest for Appellees Grubhub, Inc. and Seamless North America, LLC. Service: 05/03/2022 by email. [847360] [22-1660] [Robert Scheinfeld] [Entered: 05/03/2022 11:21 PM]

#14

(#14) Corrected Entry of appearance for Robert C. Scheinfeld, Eliot D. Williams, Eric J. Faragi as counsel for Appellees Grubhub, Inc. and Seamless North America, LLC. Service: 05/03/2022 by email. [847359] [22-1660] [Robert Scheinfeld] [Entered: 05/03/2022 11:20 PM]

#13

(#13) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submissions of Appellees Grubhub, Inc. and Seamless North America, LLC, Entries of Appearance [ # 7 ] [ # 10 ], Certificates of Interest [ # 8 ] [ # 11 ], and Docketing Statements [ # 9 ] [ # 12 ], are not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant documents due on 05/10/2022. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [847195] [ALK] [Entered: 05/03/2022 01:58 PM]

#12

(#12) Docketing Statement for the Appellee Grubhub, Inc.. Service: 04/29/2022 by email. [846581] [22-1660] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 13 ]. [Robert Scheinfeld] [Entered: 04/29/2022 09:30 PM]

#11

(#11) Certificate of Interest for Appellee Grubhub, Inc.. Service: 04/29/2022 by email. [846580] [22-1660] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 13 ]. [Robert Scheinfeld] [Entered: 04/29/2022 09:29 PM]

#10

(#10) Entry of appearance for Robert C. Scheinfeld; Eliot D. Williams; Eric J. Faragi as counsel for Appellee Grubhub, Inc.. Service: 04/29/2022 by email. [846579] [22-1660] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 13 ]. [Robert Scheinfeld] [Entered: 04/29/2022 09:28 PM]

#9

(#9) Docketing Statement for the Appellee Seamless North America, LLC. Service: 04/29/2022 by email. [846560] [22-1660] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 13 ]. [Robert Scheinfeld] [Entered: 04/29/2022 05:36 PM]

#8

(#8) Certificate of Interest for Appellee Seamless North America, LLC. Service: 04/29/2022 by email. [846558] [22-1660] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 13 ]. [Robert Scheinfeld] [Entered: 04/29/2022 05:35 PM]

#7

(#7) Entry of appearance for Robert C. Scheinfeld; Eliot D. Williams; Eric J. Faragi as counsel for Appellee Seamless North America, LLC. Service: 04/29/2022 by email. [846556] [22-1660] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 13 ]. [Robert Scheinfeld] [Entered: 04/29/2022 05:33 PM]

#6

(#6) MOTION of Appellant Ameranth, Inc. to consolidate appeals (22-1655, 22-1657, 22-1660, 22-1661, 22-1662, 22-1663, 22-1666, 22-1667, 22-1668, 22-1669, 22-1671, 22-1672, 22-1673, 22-1674, 22-1675, 22-1676, 22-1677,22-1678, 22-1679, 22-1680, 22-1681, 22-1682,22-1683,22-1684,22-1686, 22-1687, 22-1689, 22-1690, 22-1692). Service: 04/29/2022 by email. [846476] [22-1660] [Richard Weinblatt] [Entered: 04/29/2022 03:42 PM]

#5

(#5) Transcript Purchase Order Form for the Appellant Ameranth, Inc. indicating that a transcript is not needed for the appeal. Service: 04/29/2022 by email. [846246] [22-1660] [Richard Weinblatt] [Entered: 04/29/2022 11:03 AM]

#4

(#4) Entry of appearance for Richard C. Weinblatt as counsel for Appellant Ameranth, Inc.. Service: 04/29/2022 by email. [846245] [22-1660] [Richard Weinblatt] [Entered: 04/29/2022 11:02 AM]

#11

(#17) ORDER granting motion to consolidate appeals [ # 846474-2 ] [ # 846475-2 ] [ # 6 ] [ # 846478-2 ] [ # 846482-2 ] [ # 846484-2 ] [ # 846485-2 ] [ # 846486-2 ] [ # 846487-2 ] [ # 846490-2 ] [ # 846491-2 ] [ # 846495-2 ] [ # 846496-2 ] [ # 846499-2 ] [ # 846500-2 ] [ # 846501-2 ] [ # 846504-2 ] [ # 846506-2 ] [ # 846507-2 ] [ # 846508-2 ] [ # 846509-2 ] [ # 846510-2 ] [ # 846511-2 ] [ # 846512-2 ] [ # 846513-2 ] [ # 846514-2 ] [ # 846516-2 ] [ # 846519-2 ] [ # 846521-2 ] filed by Appellant Ameranth, Inc. The appeals are consolidated, and thus one set of briefs should be filed for all of the appeals. The revised official caption is reflected above. Appellant's opening brief is due no later than June 17, 2022. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [847428] [22-1655, 22-1657, 22-1660, 22-1661, 22-1662, 22-1663, 22-1666, 22-1667, 22-1668, 22-1669, 22-1671, 22-1672, 22-1673, 22-1674, 22-1675, 22-1676, 22-1677, 22-1678, 22-1679, 22-1680, 22-1681, 22-1682, 22-1683, 22-1684, 22-1686, 22-1687, 22-1689, 22-1690, 22-1692] [LMS] [Entered: 05/04/2022 11:06 AM]

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Amended Notice of Appeal for Ameranth, Inc.. Service: 05/20/2022 by email. [851570] [ALK] [Entered: 05/24/2022 02:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • Docket(#18) Note to File: The following cases are consolidated: 22-1655 Lead with 22-1657, 22-1660, 22-1661, 22-1662, 22-1663, 22-1666, 22-1667, 22-1668, 22-1669, 22-1671, 22-1672, 22-1673, 22-1674, 22-1675, 22-1676, 22-1677, 22-1678, 22-1679, 22-1680, 22-1681, 22-1682, 22-1683, 22-1684, 22-1686, 22-1687, 22-1689, 22-1690, and 22-1692 Member cases. The parties must file all documents in the lead appeal only. [847531] [22-1655, 22-1657, 22-1660, 22-1661, 22-1662, 22-1663, 22-1666, 22-1667, 22-1668, 22-1669, 22-1671, 22-1672, 22-1673, 22-1674, 22-1675, 22-1676, 22-1677, 22-1678, 22-1679, 22-1680, 22-1681, 22-1682, 22-1683, 22-1684, 22-1686, 22-1687, 22-1689, 22-1690, 22-1692] [CAB] [Entered: 05/04/2022 01:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER granting motion to consolidate appeals [ # 846474-2 ] [ # 846475-2 ] [ # 6 ] [ # 846478-2 ] [ # 846482-2 ] [ # 846484-2 ] [ # 846485-2 ] [ # 846486-2 ] [ # 846487-2 ] [ # 846490-2 ] [ # 846491-2 ] [ # 846495-2 ] [ # 846496-2 ] [ # 846499-2 ] [ # 846500-2 ] [ # 846501-2 ] [ # 846504-2 ] [ # 846506-2 ] [ # 846507-2 ] [ # 846508-2 ] [ # 846509-2 ] [ # 846510-2 ] [ # 846511-2 ] [ # 846512-2 ] [ # 846513-2 ] [ # 846514-2 ] [ # 846516-2 ] [ # 846519-2 ] [ # 846521-2 ] filed by Appellant Ameranth, Inc. The appeals are consolidated, and thus one set of briefs should be filed for all of the appeals. The revised official caption is reflected above. Appellant's opening brief is due no later than June 17, 2022. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [847428] [22-1655, 22-1657, 22-1660, 22-1661, 22-1662, 22-1663, 22-1666, 22-1667, 22-1668, 22-1669, 22-1671, 22-1672, 22-1673, 22-1674, 22-1675, 22-1676, 22-1677, 22-1678, 22-1679, 22-1680, 22-1681, 22-1682, 22-1683, 22-1684, 22-1686, 22-1687, 22-1689, 22-1690, 22-1692] [LMS] [Entered: 05/04/2022 11:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Corrected Docketing Statement for the Appellees Grubhub, Inc. and Seamless North America, LLC. Service: 05/03/2022 by email. [847361] [22-1660] [Robert Scheinfeld] [Entered: 05/03/2022 11:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Corrected Certificate of Interest for Appellees Grubhub, Inc. and Seamless North America, LLC. Service: 05/03/2022 by email. [847360] [22-1660] [Robert Scheinfeld] [Entered: 05/03/2022 11:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Corrected Entry of appearance for Robert C. Scheinfeld, Eliot D. Williams, Eric J. Faragi as counsel for Appellees Grubhub, Inc. and Seamless North America, LLC. Service: 05/03/2022 by email. [847359] [22-1660] [Robert Scheinfeld] [Entered: 05/03/2022 11:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submissions of Appellees Grubhub, Inc. and Seamless North America, LLC, Entries of Appearance [ # 7 ] [ # 10 ], Certificates of Interest [ # 8 ] [ # 11 ], and Docketing Statements [ # 9 ] [ # 12 ], are not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant documents due on 05/10/2022. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [847195] [ALK] [Entered: 05/03/2022 01:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Docketing Statement for the Appellee Grubhub, Inc.. Service: 04/29/2022 by email. [846581] [22-1660] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 13 ]. [Robert Scheinfeld] [Entered: 04/29/2022 09:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Certificate of Interest for Appellee Grubhub, Inc.. Service: 04/29/2022 by email. [846580] [22-1660] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 13 ]. [Robert Scheinfeld] [Entered: 04/29/2022 09:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Entry of appearance for Robert C. Scheinfeld; Eliot D. Williams; Eric J. Faragi as counsel for Appellee Grubhub, Inc.. Service: 04/29/2022 by email. [846579] [22-1660] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 13 ]. [Robert Scheinfeld] [Entered: 04/29/2022 09:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docketing Statement for the Appellee Seamless North America, LLC. Service: 04/29/2022 by email. [846560] [22-1660] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 13 ]. [Robert Scheinfeld] [Entered: 04/29/2022 05:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Certificate of Interest for Appellee Seamless North America, LLC. Service: 04/29/2022 by email. [846558] [22-1660] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 13 ]. [Robert Scheinfeld] [Entered: 04/29/2022 05:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Entry of appearance for Robert C. Scheinfeld; Eliot D. Williams; Eric J. Faragi as counsel for Appellee Seamless North America, LLC. Service: 04/29/2022 by email. [846556] [22-1660] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 13 ]. [Robert Scheinfeld] [Entered: 04/29/2022 05:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION of Appellant Ameranth, Inc. to consolidate appeals (22-1655, 22-1657, 22-1660, 22-1661, 22-1662, 22-1663, 22-1666, 22-1667, 22-1668, 22-1669, 22-1671, 22-1672, 22-1673, 22-1674, 22-1675, 22-1676, 22-1677,22-1678, 22-1679, 22-1680, 22-1681, 22-1682,22-1683,22-1684,22-1686, 22-1687, 22-1689, 22-1690, 22-1692). Service: 04/29/2022 by email. [846476] [22-1660] [Richard Weinblatt] [Entered: 04/29/2022 03:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Transcript Purchase Order Form for the Appellant Ameranth, Inc. indicating that a transcript is not needed for the appeal. Service: 04/29/2022 by email. [846246] [22-1660] [Richard Weinblatt] [Entered: 04/29/2022 11:03 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Entry of appearance for Richard C. Weinblatt as counsel for Appellant Ameranth, Inc.. Service: 04/29/2022 by email. [846245] [22-1660] [Richard Weinblatt] [Entered: 04/29/2022 11:02 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docketing Statement for the Appellant Ameranth, Inc.. Service: 04/29/2022 by email. [846244] [22-1660] [Richard Weinblatt] [Entered: 04/29/2022 11:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Certificate of Interest for Appellant Ameranth, Inc.. Service: 04/29/2022 by email. [846243] [22-1660] [Richard Weinblatt] [Entered: 04/29/2022 11:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 04/14/2022. [843568] Entry of Appearance is due on 04/29/2022. Certificate of Interest is due on 04/29/2022. Docketing Statement is due on 04/29/2022. Appellant's brief is due on 06/14/2022. [ALK] [Entered: 04/15/2022 02:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ameranth Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where GRUBHUB INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Eliot D. Williams

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert Craig Scheinfeld