This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/14/2022 at 06:09:48 (UTC).

Ameranth, Inc. v. Papa John's USA, Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/15/2022 Ameranth, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Papa John's USA, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-1655

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

AMERANTH, INC.

Defendant / Appellees

PAPA JOHN'S USA, INC.

OPENTABLE, INC.

SEAMLESS NORTH AMERICA, LLC

GRUBHUB, INC.

AGILYSYS, INC.

HYATT CORPORATION

STARWOOD HOTELS & RESORTS WORLDWIDE INC.

BEST WESTERN INTERNATIONAL, INC.

MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC.

RITZ-CARLTON HOTEL COMPANY, L.L.C.

MARRIOTT HOTEL SERVICES, INC.

RENAISSANCE HOTEL OPERATING COMPANY

HOTEL TONIGHT, INC.

HOTELS.COM, L.P.

HILTON RESORTS CORPORATION

HILTON WORLDWIDE, INC.

HILTON INTERNATIONAL CO.

KAYAK SOFTWARE CORPORATION

MOBO SYSTEMS, INC.

16 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

William Caldarelli

3398 Carmel Mountain Road, Suite 250

San Diego, CA 92121

Richard Charles Weinblatt

Attorney at Stamoulis & Weinblatt LLC

800 N West Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Richard Stephen Zembek

Attorney at Norton Rose Fulbright US LLP

1301 Mckinney Street

Houston, TX 77010

Jonathan S. Franklin

Attorney at Norton Rose Fulbright US LLP

799 9Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20001-4501

Stephanie DeBrow

Attorney at Norton Rose Fulbright US LLP

98 San Jacinto Boulevard

Austin, TX 78701

Robert C. Scheinfeld Esq.

Attorney at Baker Botts, LLP

30 Rockefeller Plaza

New York, NY 10112

Eric J. Faragi

Attorney at Baker Botts, LLP

30 Rockefeller Plaza

New York, NY 10112

Eliot Damon Williams

Attorney at Baker Botts, LLP

1001 Page Mill Road, Building One

Palo Alto, CA 94304

Thomas Arthur Rammer II

Attorney at Ice Miller LLP

200 W. Madison Street

Chicago, IL 60606

Ralph Joseph Gabric

Attorney at Haynes and Boone, LLP

180 North Lasalle Street

Chicago, IL 60601

Stanley Joseph Panikowski III

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP (US)

401 B Street

San Diego, CA 92101

Erin Gibson

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP (US)

401 B Street

San Diego, CA 92101

John Guaragna

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP (US)

303 Colorado Street

Austin, TX 78701-3799

Robert Chen Williams

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP (US)

401 B Street

San Diego, CA 92101

Joseph Roger Rick Tache

Attorney at Buchalter, A Professional Corporation

18400 Von Karman Avenue

Irvine, CA 92612

Robert M. Dato

Attorney at Buchalter, A Professional Corporation

18400 Von Karman Avenue

Irvine, CA 92612

Nick G. Saros

Attorney at Jenner & Block LLP

515 South Flower Street

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Heidi Lyn Keefe

Attorney at Cooley LLP

3175 Hanover Street

Palo Alto, CA 94304

Lowell D. Mead

Attorney at Cooley LLP

3175 Hanover Street

Palo Alto, CA 94304

Other Attorneys

Andrew Peter Zappia

Attorney at Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP

70 Linden Oaks

Rochester, NY 14625

6 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#50

(#50) ORDER filed The above-captioned appeals shall be considered companion cases and assigned to the same merits panel. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [853516] [22-1200, 22-1655] [LMS] [Entered: 06/03/2022 03:47 PM]

#49

(#49) Notice from Appellee Hyatt Corporation of Withdrawal of Non-Principal Counsel. Service: 05/27/2022 by email. [852335] [22-1655] [Ralph Gabric] [Entered: 05/27/2022 09:34 AM]

#48

(#48) Amended Notice of Appeal for Ameranth, Inc.. Service: 05/20/2022 by email. [851519] [ALK] [Entered: 05/24/2022 11:36 AM]

#47

(#47) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submissions of Appellee ATX Innovation, Inc., Entry of Appearance [ # 43 ] and Certificate of Interest [ # 44 ], are not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant documents due on 06/01/2022. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [851496] [ALK] [Entered: 05/24/2022 10:56 AM]

#46

(#46) Entry of appearance for Jonas Q. Wang as counsel for Appellee Oracle Corporation. Service: 05/19/2022 by email. [850732] [22-1655] [Jonas Wang] [Entered: 05/19/2022 01:41 PM]

#45

(#45) Docketing Statement for the Appellee ATX Innovation, Inc.. Service: 05/17/2022 by email. [850355] [22-1655] [John Shumaker] [Entered: 05/17/2022 06:13 PM]

#44

(#44) Certificate of Interest for Appellee ATX Innovation, Inc.. Service: 05/17/2022 by email. [850354] [22-1655] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 47 ]. [John Shumaker] [Entered: 05/17/2022 06:10 PM]

#43

(#43) Entry of appearance for John M. Shumaker as counsel for Appellee ATX Innovation, Inc.. Service: 05/17/2022 by email. [850353] [22-1655] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 47 ]. [John Shumaker] [Entered: 05/17/2022 06:07 PM]

#42

(#42) Entry of appearance for Tara L. Kurtis as counsel for Appellee Starbucks Corporation. Service: 05/17/2022 by email. [850243] [22-1655] [Tara Kurtis] [Entered: 05/17/2022 11:45 AM]

#8

(#8) Certificate of Interest for Appellee Papa John's USA, Inc.. Service: 04/29/2022 by email. [846549] [22-1655] [Stephanie DeBrow] [Entered: 04/29/2022 04:55 PM]

#7

(#7) MOTION of Appellant Ameranth, Inc. to consolidate appeals (22-1655, 22-1657, 22-1660, 22-1661, 22-1662, 22-1663, 22-1666, 22-1667, 22-1668, 22-1669, 22-1671, 22-1672, 22-1673, 22-1674, 22-1675, 22-1676, 22-1677,22-1678, 22-1679, 22-1680, 22-1681, 22-1682,22-1683,22-1684,22-1686, 22-1687, 22-1689, 22-1690, 22-1692). Service: 04/29/2022 by email. [846474] [22-1655] [Richard Weinblatt] [Entered: 04/29/2022 03:39 PM]

#6

(#6) Transcript Purchase Order Form for the Appellant Ameranth, Inc. indicating that a transcript is not needed for the appeal. Service: 04/29/2022 by email. [846237] [22-1655] [Richard Weinblatt] [Entered: 04/29/2022 10:49 AM]

#5

(#5) Entry of appearance for Richard C. Weinblatt as counsel for Appellant Ameranth, Inc.. Service: 04/29/2022 by email. [846236] [22-1655] [Richard Weinblatt] [Entered: 04/29/2022 10:48 AM]

#4

(#4) Docketing Statement for the Appellant Ameranth, Inc.. Service: 04/29/2022 by email. [846235] [22-1655] [Richard Weinblatt] [Entered: 04/29/2022 10:47 AM]

#3

(#3) Certificate of Interest for Appellant Ameranth, Inc.. Service: 04/29/2022 by email. [846234] [22-1655] [Richard Weinblatt] [Entered: 04/29/2022 10:46 AM]

#2

(#2) Entry of appearance for Jonathan S. Franklin; Richard S. Zembek; Stephanie N. DeBrow as counsel for Appellee Papa John's USA, Inc.. Service: 04/28/2022 by email. [846226] [22-1655] [Jonathan Franklin] [Entered: 04/29/2022 10:16 AM]

1 #2

Civil Case Docketed

#1

Notice of Docketing

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2022
  • Docket(#51) Notice to Appellee ATX Innovation, Inc.: The record of this case indicates that no Corrected Entry of Appearance under FCR 47.3(b) and Corrected Certificate of Interest under FCR 47.4 have been filed. Failure to file required documents may result in dismissal or other action as deemed appropriate by the court. See FCR 25(h). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [854123] [ALK] [Entered: 06/07/2022 04:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) ORDER filed The above-captioned appeals shall be considered companion cases and assigned to the same merits panel. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [853516] [22-1200, 22-1655] [LMS] [Entered: 06/03/2022 03:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) Notice from Appellee Hyatt Corporation of Withdrawal of Non-Principal Counsel. Service: 05/27/2022 by email. [852335] [22-1655] [Ralph Gabric] [Entered: 05/27/2022 09:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) Amended Notice of Appeal for Ameranth, Inc.. Service: 05/20/2022 by email. [851519] [ALK] [Entered: 05/24/2022 11:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submissions of Appellee ATX Innovation, Inc., Entry of Appearance [ # 43 ] and Certificate of Interest [ # 44 ], are not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant documents due on 06/01/2022. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [851496] [ALK] [Entered: 05/24/2022 10:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) Entry of appearance for Jonas Q. Wang as counsel for Appellee Oracle Corporation. Service: 05/19/2022 by email. [850732] [22-1655] [Jonas Wang] [Entered: 05/19/2022 01:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) Docketing Statement for the Appellee ATX Innovation, Inc.. Service: 05/17/2022 by email. [850355] [22-1655] [John Shumaker] [Entered: 05/17/2022 06:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) Certificate of Interest for Appellee ATX Innovation, Inc.. Service: 05/17/2022 by email. [850354] [22-1655] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 47 ]. [John Shumaker] [Entered: 05/17/2022 06:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) Entry of appearance for John M. Shumaker as counsel for Appellee ATX Innovation, Inc.. Service: 05/17/2022 by email. [850353] [22-1655] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 47 ]. [John Shumaker] [Entered: 05/17/2022 06:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) Entry of appearance for Tara L. Kurtis as counsel for Appellee Starbucks Corporation. Service: 05/17/2022 by email. [850243] [22-1655] [Tara Kurtis] [Entered: 05/17/2022 11:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE: re: Doc No. [ # 9 ], ERROR: Appellee's docketing statement includes an incorrect originating case number. CORRECTION: As needed, please include the correct originating case number, 3:12-cv-00729, on future filings. THIS MESSAGE IS FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY. [846762] [ALK] [Entered: 05/02/2022 12:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docketing Statement for the Appellee Papa John's USA, Inc.. Service: 04/29/2022 by email. [846550] [22-1655] [Stephanie DeBrow] [Entered: 04/29/2022 04:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Certificate of Interest for Appellee Papa John's USA, Inc.. Service: 04/29/2022 by email. [846549] [22-1655] [Stephanie DeBrow] [Entered: 04/29/2022 04:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION of Appellant Ameranth, Inc. to consolidate appeals (22-1655, 22-1657, 22-1660, 22-1661, 22-1662, 22-1663, 22-1666, 22-1667, 22-1668, 22-1669, 22-1671, 22-1672, 22-1673, 22-1674, 22-1675, 22-1676, 22-1677,22-1678, 22-1679, 22-1680, 22-1681, 22-1682,22-1683,22-1684,22-1686, 22-1687, 22-1689, 22-1690, 22-1692). Service: 04/29/2022 by email. [846474] [22-1655] [Richard Weinblatt] [Entered: 04/29/2022 03:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Transcript Purchase Order Form for the Appellant Ameranth, Inc. indicating that a transcript is not needed for the appeal. Service: 04/29/2022 by email. [846237] [22-1655] [Richard Weinblatt] [Entered: 04/29/2022 10:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Entry of appearance for Richard C. Weinblatt as counsel for Appellant Ameranth, Inc.. Service: 04/29/2022 by email. [846236] [22-1655] [Richard Weinblatt] [Entered: 04/29/2022 10:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docketing Statement for the Appellant Ameranth, Inc.. Service: 04/29/2022 by email. [846235] [22-1655] [Richard Weinblatt] [Entered: 04/29/2022 10:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Interest for Appellant Ameranth, Inc.. Service: 04/29/2022 by email. [846234] [22-1655] [Richard Weinblatt] [Entered: 04/29/2022 10:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Entry of appearance for Jonathan S. Franklin; Richard S. Zembek; Stephanie N. DeBrow as counsel for Appellee Papa John's USA, Inc.. Service: 04/28/2022 by email. [846226] [22-1655] [Jonathan Franklin] [Entered: 04/29/2022 10:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 04/14/2022. [843551] Entry of Appearance is due on 04/29/2022. Certificate of Interest is due on 04/29/2022. Docketing Statement is due on 04/29/2022. Appellant's brief is due on 06/14/2022. [ALK] [Entered: 04/15/2022 01:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HOTEL TONIGHT INC. DBA HOTELTONIGHT.COM DBA HOTEL TONIGHT DBA HOTELTONIGHT is a litigant

Latest cases where Ameranth Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where OPENTABLE, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where HILTON INTERNATIONAL CO. is a litigant