This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/18/2022 at 06:22:22 (UTC).

Alton & Southern Railway Company, et al v. Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Divisi

Case Summary

On 04/19/2022 Alton Southern Railway Company filed a Labor - Railway Labor Act lawsuit against Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Divisi. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-7044

  • Filing Date:

    04/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Railway Labor Act

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellees

Alton & Southern Railway Company

Belt Railway Company of Chicago

Bessemer & Lake Erie Railroad Company

BNSF Railway Company

Central California Traction Company

Consolidated Rail Corporation

CSX Transportation, Inc.

Delaware & Hudson Railroad Company

Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company

Illinois Central Railroad Company

Indiana Harbor Belt Railroad Company

Kansas City Southern Railway Company

Los Angeles Junction Railway Company

Norfolk and Portsmouth Belt Line Railroad Company

Norfolk Southern Railway Company

Northeast Illinois Regional Commuter Railroad Corporation

Northern Indiana Commuter Transportation District

Portland Terminal Railroad Company

Port Terminal Railroad Association

Soo Line Railroad Company

7 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorney

Donald J. Munro

Attorney at Jones Day

51 Louisiana Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20001-2113

Other Attorneys

Richard Steven Edelman

Attorney at Mooney, Green, Saindon, Murphy & Welch, PC

1920 L Street, Nw, Suite 400

Washington, DC 20036

 

Court Documents

Open Document

NOTICE OF APPEAL [1943592] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:19-cv-03586-TFH filed by Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division/IBT. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 22-7044. [22-7044] [Entered: 04/19/2022 02:41 PM]

Open Document

CLERK'S ORDER [1943595] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 05/19/2022. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 05/19/2022. APPELLANT statement of issues due 05/19/2022. APPELLANT underlying decision due 05/19/2022. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 05/19/2022. APPELLANT entry of appearance due 05/19/2022. APPELLANT transcript status report due 05/19/2022. APPELLANT procedural motions due 05/19/2022. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 06/03/2022; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 05/19/2022. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 05/19/2022. APPELLEE procedural motions due 05/19/2022. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 06/03/2022 [22-7044] [Entered: 04/19/2022 02:43 PM]

Open Document

DOCKETING STATEMENT [1945940] filed by Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division/IBT [Service Date: 05/09/2022 ] [22-7044] (Edelman, Richard) [Entered: 05/09/2022 12:28 PM]

Open Document

CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1945942] filed by Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division/IBT [Service Date: 05/09/2022 ] [22-7044] (Edelman, Richard) [Entered: 05/09/2022 12:30 PM]

Open Document

STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1945944] filed by Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division/IBT [Service Date: 05/09/2022 ] [22-7044] (Edelman, Richard) [Entered: 05/09/2022 12:31 PM]

Open Document

UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1945946] submitted by Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division/IBT [Service Date: 05/09/2022 ] [22-7044] (Edelman, Richard) [Entered: 05/09/2022 12:32 PM]

Open Document

STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1945947] filed by Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division/IBT [Service Date: 05/09/2022 ] Intent: AppxNotDeferred [22-7044] (Edelman, Richard) [Entered: 05/09/2022 12:33 PM]

Open Document

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1945949] filed by Richard S. Edelman on behalf of Appellant Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division/IBT. [22-7044] (Edelman, Richard) [Entered: 05/09/2022 12:35 PM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1945950] filed by Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division/IBT [Service Date: 05/09/2022 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - No transcripts are needed for the appeal. [22-7044] (Edelman, Richard) [Entered: 05/09/2022 12:37 PM]

Open Document

STATEMENT [1946214] with Disclosure Listing filed by Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division/IBT [Service Date: 05/10/2022 ] [22-7044] (Edelman, Richard) [Entered: 05/10/2022 04:11 PM]

Open Document

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1947171] filed by Donald J. Munro on behalf of Appellees Alton & Southern Railway Company, Belt Railway Company of Chicago, Bessemer & Lake Erie Railroad Company, BNSF Railway Company, Central California Traction Company, Consolidated Rail Corporation, CSX Transportation, Inc., Delaware & Hudson Railroad Company, Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company, Illinois Central Railroad Company, Indiana Harbor Belt Railroad Company, Kansas City Southern Railway Company, Los Angeles Junction Railway Company, New Orleans Public Belt Railroad Corporation, Norfolk and Portsmouth Belt Line Railroad Company, Norfolk Southern Railway Company, Northeast Illinois Regional Commuter Railroad Corporation, Northern Indiana Commuter Transportation District, Port Terminal Railroad Association, Portland Terminal Railroad Company, Soo Line Railroad Company, Terminal Railroad Association of St. Louis, Union Pacific Railroad Company, Wichita Terminal Association, Winston Salem Southbound Railway Company and Wisconsin Central Ltd.. [22-7044] (Munro, Donald) [Entered: 05/18/2022 03:47 PM]

Open Document

CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1947174] filed by Alton & Southern Railway Company, Belt Railway Company of Chicago, Bessemer & Lake Erie Railroad Company, BNSF Railway Company, Central California Traction Company, Consolidated Rail Corporation, CSX Transportation, Inc., Delaware & Hudson Railroad Company, Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company, Illinois Central Railroad Company, Indiana Harbor Belt Railroad Company, Kansas City Southern Railway Company, Los Angeles Junction Railway Company, New Orleans Public Belt Railroad Corporation, Norfolk and Portsmouth Belt Line Railroad Company, Norfolk Southern Railway Company, Northeast Illinois Regional Commuter Railroad Corporation, Northern Indiana Commuter Transportation District, Port Terminal Railroad Association, Portland Terminal Railroad Company, Soo Line Railroad Company, Terminal Railroad Association of St. Louis, Union Pacific Railroad Company, Wichita Terminal Association, Winston Salem Southbound Railway Company and Wisconsin Central Ltd. [Service Date: 05/18/2022 ] [22-7044] (Munro, Donald) [Entered: 05/18/2022 03:57 PM]

Open Document

STATEMENT [1947176] with Disclosure Listing filed by Alton & Southern Railway Company, Belt Railway Company of Chicago, Bessemer & Lake Erie Railroad Company, BNSF Railway Company, Central California Traction Company, Consolidated Rail Corporation, CSX Transportation, Inc., Delaware & Hudson Railroad Company, Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company, Illinois Central Railroad Company, Indiana Harbor Belt Railroad Company, Kansas City Southern Railway Company, Los Angeles Junction Railway Company, New Orleans Public Belt Railroad Corporation, Norfolk and Portsmouth Belt Line Railroad Company, Norfolk Southern Railway Company, Northeast Illinois Regional Commuter Railroad Corporation, Northern Indiana Commuter Transportation District, Port Terminal Railroad Association, Portland Terminal Railroad Company, Soo Line Railroad Company, Terminal Railroad Association of St. Louis, Union Pacific Railroad Company, Wichita Terminal Association, Winston Salem Southbound Railway Company and Wisconsin Central Ltd. [Service Date: 05/18/2022 ] [22-7044] (Munro, Donald) [Entered: 05/18/2022 04:01 PM]

Open Document #1

Order Sent

Open Document #2

form(s) sent

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S ORDER [1949988] filed setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 07/19/2022. APPENDIX due 07/19/2022. APPELLEE Brief due on 08/18/2022. APPELLANT Reply Brief due 09/08/2022 [22-7044] [Entered: 06/09/2022 03:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT [1947176] with Disclosure Listing filed by Alton & Southern Railway Company, Belt Railway Company of Chicago, Bessemer & Lake Erie Railroad Company, BNSF Railway Company, Central California Traction Company, Consolidated Rail Corporation, CSX Transportation, Inc., Delaware & Hudson Railroad Company, Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company, Illinois Central Railroad Company, Indiana Harbor Belt Railroad Company, Kansas City Southern Railway Company, Los Angeles Junction Railway Company, New Orleans Public Belt Railroad Corporation, Norfolk and Portsmouth Belt Line Railroad Company, Norfolk Southern Railway Company, Northeast Illinois Regional Commuter Railroad Corporation, Northern Indiana Commuter Transportation District, Port Terminal Railroad Association, Portland Terminal Railroad Company, Soo Line Railroad Company, Terminal Railroad Association of St. Louis, Union Pacific Railroad Company, Wichita Terminal Association, Winston Salem Southbound Railway Company and Wisconsin Central Ltd. [Service Date: 05/18/2022 ] [22-7044] (Munro, Donald) [Entered: 05/18/2022 04:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1947174] filed by Alton & Southern Railway Company, Belt Railway Company of Chicago, Bessemer & Lake Erie Railroad Company, BNSF Railway Company, Central California Traction Company, Consolidated Rail Corporation, CSX Transportation, Inc., Delaware & Hudson Railroad Company, Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company, Illinois Central Railroad Company, Indiana Harbor Belt Railroad Company, Kansas City Southern Railway Company, Los Angeles Junction Railway Company, New Orleans Public Belt Railroad Corporation, Norfolk and Portsmouth Belt Line Railroad Company, Norfolk Southern Railway Company, Northeast Illinois Regional Commuter Railroad Corporation, Northern Indiana Commuter Transportation District, Port Terminal Railroad Association, Portland Terminal Railroad Company, Soo Line Railroad Company, Terminal Railroad Association of St. Louis, Union Pacific Railroad Company, Wichita Terminal Association, Winston Salem Southbound Railway Company and Wisconsin Central Ltd. [Service Date: 05/18/2022 ] [22-7044] (Munro, Donald) [Entered: 05/18/2022 03:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1947171] filed by Donald J. Munro on behalf of Appellees Alton & Southern Railway Company, Belt Railway Company of Chicago, Bessemer & Lake Erie Railroad Company, BNSF Railway Company, Central California Traction Company, Consolidated Rail Corporation, CSX Transportation, Inc., Delaware & Hudson Railroad Company, Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company, Illinois Central Railroad Company, Indiana Harbor Belt Railroad Company, Kansas City Southern Railway Company, Los Angeles Junction Railway Company, New Orleans Public Belt Railroad Corporation, Norfolk and Portsmouth Belt Line Railroad Company, Norfolk Southern Railway Company, Northeast Illinois Regional Commuter Railroad Corporation, Northern Indiana Commuter Transportation District, Port Terminal Railroad Association, Portland Terminal Railroad Company, Soo Line Railroad Company, Terminal Railroad Association of St. Louis, Union Pacific Railroad Company, Wichita Terminal Association, Winston Salem Southbound Railway Company and Wisconsin Central Ltd.. [22-7044] (Munro, Donald) [Entered: 05/18/2022 03:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT [1946214] with Disclosure Listing filed by Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division/IBT [Service Date: 05/10/2022 ] [22-7044] (Edelman, Richard) [Entered: 05/10/2022 04:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1945950] filed by Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division/IBT [Service Date: 05/09/2022 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - No transcripts are needed for the appeal. [22-7044] (Edelman, Richard) [Entered: 05/09/2022 12:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1945949] filed by Richard S. Edelman on behalf of Appellant Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division/IBT. [22-7044] (Edelman, Richard) [Entered: 05/09/2022 12:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1945947] filed by Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division/IBT [Service Date: 05/09/2022 ] Intent: AppxNotDeferred [22-7044] (Edelman, Richard) [Entered: 05/09/2022 12:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1945946] submitted by Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division/IBT [Service Date: 05/09/2022 ] [22-7044] (Edelman, Richard) [Entered: 05/09/2022 12:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF ISSUES [1945944] filed by Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division/IBT [Service Date: 05/09/2022 ] [22-7044] (Edelman, Richard) [Entered: 05/09/2022 12:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1945942] filed by Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division/IBT [Service Date: 05/09/2022 ] [22-7044] (Edelman, Richard) [Entered: 05/09/2022 12:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCKETING STATEMENT [1945940] filed by Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division/IBT [Service Date: 05/09/2022 ] [22-7044] (Edelman, Richard) [Entered: 05/09/2022 12:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S ORDER [1943595] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 05/19/2022. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 05/19/2022. APPELLANT statement of issues due 05/19/2022. APPELLANT underlying decision due 05/19/2022. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 05/19/2022. APPELLANT entry of appearance due 05/19/2022. APPELLANT transcript status report due 05/19/2022. APPELLANT procedural motions due 05/19/2022. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 06/03/2022; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 05/19/2022. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 05/19/2022. APPELLEE procedural motions due 05/19/2022. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 06/03/2022 [22-7044] [Entered: 04/19/2022 02:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEAL [1943592] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:19-cv-03586-TFH filed by Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division/IBT. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 22-7044. [22-7044] [Entered: 04/19/2022 02:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketPRIVATE CIVIL CASE docketed. [22-7044] [Entered: 04/19/2022 02:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORT TERMINAL RAILROAD ASSOCIATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Indiana Harbor Belt Railroad Company is a litigant

Latest cases where LOS ANGELES JUNCTION RAILWAY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Northeast Illinois Regional Commuter Railroad Corporation d/b/a Metra is a litigant