This case was last updated from PACER on 09/13/2019 at 06:02:22 (UTC).

Alterik Baker v. Mr. Beale

Case Summary

On 07/15/2019 Alterik Baker filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Mr Beale. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-7024

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioner / Appellant

ALTERIK JAMES BAKER

Lawrenceville, VA 23868-0000

Respondent / Appellee

MR. BEALE, Warden

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

Alterik James Baker

Attorney at LAWRENCEVILLE CORRECTIONAL CENTER

1607 Planters Road

Lawrenceville, VA 23868-0000

Respondent / Appellee Attorney

Leah A. Darron Esq.

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF VIRGINIA

202 North 9Th Street

Richmond, VA 23219-0000

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) INFORMAL PRELIMINARY BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Alterik James Baker. Informal Opening Brief due 08/08/2019. [19-7024] EB [Entered: 07/15/2019 11:19 AM]

#1

(#1) Habeas corpus appeal docketed. Originating case number: 3:17-cv-00657-HEH-RCY. Date notice of appeal filed: 07/11/2019. Case manager: EBorneisen. Did district court rule on COA? Yes. [19-7024] EB [Entered: 07/15/2019 11:17 AM]

#8

(#8) Letter re: case by Alterik James Baker . [1000572995] [19-7024] EB [Entered: 08/23/2019 08:44 AM]

#6

(#6) MOTION by Alterik James Baker to extend filing time for informal opening brief. [1000551709] [19-7024] EB [Entered: 07/22/2019 03:49 PM]

#4

(#4) SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD requested from Clerk of Court Due: 07/29/2019 [19-7024] EB [Entered: 07/15/2019 11:21 AM]

#7

(#7) ORDER filed [1000551712] granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 6 ]. Number of days granted: 30. Informal Opening Brief due 09/09/2019. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Alterik James Baker. [19-7024] EB [Entered: 07/22/2019 03:50 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Letter re: case by Alterik James Baker . [1000572995] [19-7024] EB [Entered: 08/23/2019 08:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER filed [1000551712] granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 6 ]. Number of days granted: 30. Informal Opening Brief due 09/09/2019. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Alterik James Baker. [19-7024] EB [Entered: 07/22/2019 03:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION by Alterik James Baker to extend filing time for informal opening brief. [1000551709] [19-7024] EB [Entered: 07/22/2019 03:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • (#5) SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD filed (paper form): Record Part: State Court Records, Volumes Location: Volume I-STATE COURT RECORDS: Received from Court of Appeals of VA in Record #0442-15-2: One manila folder, Petition for Appeal, Commonwealth's Brief in Opposition to Appellant's Petition for Appeal (placed in brw exp); Record Part: State Court Records, Volumes Location: Volume II- #2-STATE COURT RECORDS: Received from Supreme Court of VA in Record #151726 - Loose documents (placed in brw exp) ; Record Part: State Court Records, Volumes Location: Volume III-STATE COURT RECORDS received from Circuit Court for Prince Edward County: Loose records in Case #CR14000143, Case #CR14000144, and CL16000265 (placed in brw exp); Record Part: State Court Records, Volumes Location: Volume IV-STATE COURT RECORDS Received from Circuit Court for Prince Edward County: Second set of loose records in Case #CR14000143, Case #CR14000144, and CL16000265 (placed in brw exp). [19-7024] EB [Entered: 07/17/2019 02:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD requested from Clerk of Court Due: 07/29/2019 [19-7024] EB [Entered: 07/15/2019 11:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • (#3) ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 3:17-cv-00657-HEH-RCY. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. State court paper record requested in 2254 case? Yes. [19-7024] EB [Entered: 07/15/2019 11:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) INFORMAL PRELIMINARY BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Alterik James Baker. Informal Opening Brief due 08/08/2019. [19-7024] EB [Entered: 07/15/2019 11:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Habeas corpus appeal docketed. Originating case number: 3:17-cv-00657-HEH-RCY. Date notice of appeal filed: 07/11/2019. Case manager: EBorneisen. Did district court rule on COA? Yes. [19-7024] EB [Entered: 07/15/2019 11:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.