Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 03/27/2021 at 06:26:06 (UTC).

Altair Global Credit v. US

Case Summary

On 01/26/2021 Altair Global Credit filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against US. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1577

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

MASON CAPITAL MASTER FUND LP

PWCM MASTER FUND LTD.

OCEANA MASTER FUND LTD.

NOKOTA CAPITAL MASTER FUND, L.P.

OAKTREE OPPORTUNITIES FUND IX (PARALLEL 2), L.P.

OAKTREE OPPORTUNITIES FUND IX, L.P.

ANDALUSIAN GLOBAL DESIGNATED ACTIVITY COMPANY

ALTAIR GLOBAL CREDIT OPPORTUNITIES FUND (A), LLC

GLENDON OPPORTUNITIES FUND, L.P.

OAKTREE VALUE OPPORTUNITIES FUND, L.P.

CROWN MANAGED ACCOUNTS FOR AND ON BEHALF OF CROWN/PW SP

OCHER ROSE, L.L.C.

LMA SPC FOR AND ON BEHALF OF MAP 98 SEGREGATED PORTFOLIO

PENTWATER MERGER ARBITRAGE MASTER FUND LTD.

OAKTREE-FORREST MULTI-STRATEGY, LLC (SERIES B)

SV CREDIT, L.P.

Defendant / Appellee

UNITED STATES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

David Robert Fox

Attorney at Jones Day - Boston

100 High Street, Floor 21, 02110

Boston, MA 02110

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Director, Commercial Litigation Branch, Civil Division, U.S. Department of Justice

Attorney at Department of Justice

Po Box 480, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

Michael S. Raab Esq.

Attorney at Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Christopher James Carney

Attorney at Department of Justice

Po Box 480, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

Mark R. Freeman

Attorney at Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Laura Myron

Attorney at Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Michael Shih

Attorney at Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20530

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) Docketing Statement for the Appellee US. Service: 03/18/2021 by email. [763381] [21-1577] [Christopher Carney] [Entered: 03/18/2021 10:50 PM]

#9

(#9) ORDER staying the briefing schedule pending the court's consideration of the motion. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [762929] [LMS] [Entered: 03/17/2021 11:33 AM]

#8

(#8) MOTION of Appellants Altair Global Credit Opportunities Fund (A), LLC, Andalusian Global Designated Activity Company, Crown Managed Accounts for and on Behalf of Crown/PW SP, Glendon Opportunities Fund, L.P., LMA SPC for and On Behalf of Map 98 Segregated Portfolio, Mason Capital Master Fund LP, Nokota Capital Master Fund, L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX (Parallel 2), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX, L.P., Oaktree Value Opportunities Fund, L.P., Oaktree-Forrest Multi-Strategy, LLC (Series B), Oceana Master Fund Ltd., Ocher Rose, L.L.C., Pentwater Merger Arbitrage Master Fund Ltd., PWCM Master Fund Ltd. and SV Credit, L.P. to stay appeal. Service: 03/12/2021 by email. [761937] [21-1577] [David Fox] [Entered: 03/12/2021 02:37 PM]

6 #2

Declaration of Counsel

6 #1

Motion

#5

(#5) Docketing Statement for the Appellants Altair Global Credit Opportunities Fund (A), LLC, Andalusian Global Designated Activity Company, Crown Managed Accounts for and on Behalf of Crown/PW SP, Glendon Opportunities Fund, L.P., LMA SPC for and On Behalf of Map 98 Segregated Portfolio, Mason Capital Master Fund LP, Nokota Capital Master Fund, L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX (Parallel 2), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX, L.P., Oaktree Value Opportunities Fund, L.P., Oaktree-Forrest Multi-Strategy, LLC (Series B), Oceana Master Fund Ltd., Ocher Rose, L.L.C., Pentwater Merger Arbitrage Master Fund Ltd., PWCM Master Fund Ltd. and SV Credit, L.P.. Service: 02/25/2021 by email. [758662] [21-1577] [David Fox] [Entered: 02/25/2021 01:49 PM]

#4

(#4) Certificate of Interest for Appellants Altair Global Credit Opportunities Fund (A), LLC, Andalusian Global Designated Activity Company, Crown Managed Accounts for and on Behalf of Crown/PW SP, Glendon Opportunities Fund, L.P., LMA SPC for and On Behalf of Map 98 Segregated Portfolio, Mason Capital Master Fund LP, Nokota Capital Master Fund, L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX (Parallel 2), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX, L.P., Oaktree Value Opportunities Fund, L.P., Oaktree-Forrest Multi-Strategy, LLC (Series B), Oceana Master Fund Ltd., Ocher Rose, L.L.C., Pentwater Merger Arbitrage Master Fund Ltd., PWCM Master Fund Ltd. and SV Credit, L.P.. Service: 02/09/2021 by email. [754768] [21-1577] [David Fox] [Entered: 02/09/2021 12:10 PM]

#3

(#3) Entry of appearance for David R. Fox as counsel for Appellants Altair Global Credit Opportunities Fund (A), LLC, Andalusian Global Designated Activity Company, Crown Managed Accounts for and on Behalf of Crown/PW SP, Glendon Opportunities Fund, L.P., LMA SPC for and On Behalf of Map 98 Segregated Portfolio, Mason Capital Master Fund LP, Nokota Capital Master Fund, L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX (Parallel 2), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX, L.P., Oaktree Value Opportunities Fund, L.P., Oaktree-Forrest Multi-Strategy, LLC (Series B), Oceana Master Fund Ltd., Ocher Rose, L.L.C., Pentwater Merger Arbitrage Master Fund Ltd., PWCM Master Fund Ltd. and SV Credit, L.P.. Service: 02/09/2021 by email. [754767] [21-1577] [David Fox] [Entered: 02/09/2021 12:08 PM]

#2

(#2) Entry of appearance for Laura Myron; Michael Shih; Mark R. Freeman; Michael S. Raab; Chris Carney as counsel for Appellee US. Service: 01/27/2021 by email. [752060] [21-1577] [Laura Myron] [Entered: 01/27/2021 12:23 PM]

1 #2

Civil Case Docketed

#1

Notice of Docketing

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Docketing Statement for the Appellee US. Service: 03/18/2021 by email. [763381] [21-1577] [Christopher Carney] [Entered: 03/18/2021 10:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • Docket(#10) Notice to Appellee US: The record of this case indicates that no Docketing Statement under FCR 33.1(a) has been filed. Failure to file required documents may result in dismissal or other action as deemed appropriate by the court. See FCR 25(h). Please file promptly . Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [763339] [MMA] [Entered: 03/18/2021 04:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER staying the briefing schedule pending the court's consideration of the motion. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [762929] [LMS] [Entered: 03/17/2021 11:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION of Appellants Altair Global Credit Opportunities Fund (A), LLC, Andalusian Global Designated Activity Company, Crown Managed Accounts for and on Behalf of Crown/PW SP, Glendon Opportunities Fund, L.P., LMA SPC for and On Behalf of Map 98 Segregated Portfolio, Mason Capital Master Fund LP, Nokota Capital Master Fund, L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX (Parallel 2), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX, L.P., Oaktree Value Opportunities Fund, L.P., Oaktree-Forrest Multi-Strategy, LLC (Series B), Oceana Master Fund Ltd., Ocher Rose, L.L.C., Pentwater Merger Arbitrage Master Fund Ltd., PWCM Master Fund Ltd. and SV Credit, L.P. to stay appeal. Service: 03/12/2021 by email. [761937] [21-1577] [David Fox] [Entered: 03/12/2021 02:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) **TEXT ONLY** ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief [ # 6 ] filed by Appellants Altair Global Credit Opportunities Fund (A), LLC, Andalusian Global Designated Activity Company, Crown Managed Accounts for and on Behalf of Crown/PW SP, Glendon Opportunities Fund, L.P., LMA SPC for and On Behalf of Map 98 Segregated Portfolio, Mason Capital Master Fund LP, Nokota Capital Master Fund, L.P., Oaktree-Forrest Multi-Strategy, LLC (Series B), Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX, L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX (Parallel 2), L.P., Oaktree Value Opportunities Fund, L.P., Oceana Master Fund Ltd., Ocher Rose, L.L.C., Pentwater Merger Arbitrage Master Fund Ltd., PWCM Master Fund Ltd., and SV Credit, L.P. The opening brief is due 05/28/2021. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. This order has been issued without an attached document and is official and binding. [758849] [EKD] [Entered: 02/26/2021 09:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION of Appellants Altair Global Credit Opportunities Fund (A), LLC, Andalusian Global Designated Activity Company, Crown Managed Accounts for and on Behalf of Crown/PW SP, Glendon Opportunities Fund, L.P., LMA SPC for and On Behalf of Map 98 Segregated Portfolio, Mason Capital Master Fund LP, Nokota Capital Master Fund, L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX (Parallel 2), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX, L.P., Oaktree Value Opportunities Fund, L.P., Oaktree-Forrest Multi-Strategy, LLC (Series B), Oceana Master Fund Ltd., Ocher Rose, L.L.C., Pentwater Merger Arbitrage Master Fund Ltd., PWCM Master Fund Ltd. and SV Credit, L.P. to extend the time to 05/28/2021 to file brief. Service: 02/25/2021 by email. [758666] [21-1577] [David Fox] [Entered: 02/25/2021 01:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docketing Statement for the Appellants Altair Global Credit Opportunities Fund (A), LLC, Andalusian Global Designated Activity Company, Crown Managed Accounts for and on Behalf of Crown/PW SP, Glendon Opportunities Fund, L.P., LMA SPC for and On Behalf of Map 98 Segregated Portfolio, Mason Capital Master Fund LP, Nokota Capital Master Fund, L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX (Parallel 2), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX, L.P., Oaktree Value Opportunities Fund, L.P., Oaktree-Forrest Multi-Strategy, LLC (Series B), Oceana Master Fund Ltd., Ocher Rose, L.L.C., Pentwater Merger Arbitrage Master Fund Ltd., PWCM Master Fund Ltd. and SV Credit, L.P.. Service: 02/25/2021 by email. [758662] [21-1577] [David Fox] [Entered: 02/25/2021 01:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certificate of Interest for Appellants Altair Global Credit Opportunities Fund (A), LLC, Andalusian Global Designated Activity Company, Crown Managed Accounts for and on Behalf of Crown/PW SP, Glendon Opportunities Fund, L.P., LMA SPC for and On Behalf of Map 98 Segregated Portfolio, Mason Capital Master Fund LP, Nokota Capital Master Fund, L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX (Parallel 2), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX, L.P., Oaktree Value Opportunities Fund, L.P., Oaktree-Forrest Multi-Strategy, LLC (Series B), Oceana Master Fund Ltd., Ocher Rose, L.L.C., Pentwater Merger Arbitrage Master Fund Ltd., PWCM Master Fund Ltd. and SV Credit, L.P.. Service: 02/09/2021 by email. [754768] [21-1577] [David Fox] [Entered: 02/09/2021 12:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Entry of appearance for David R. Fox as counsel for Appellants Altair Global Credit Opportunities Fund (A), LLC, Andalusian Global Designated Activity Company, Crown Managed Accounts for and on Behalf of Crown/PW SP, Glendon Opportunities Fund, L.P., LMA SPC for and On Behalf of Map 98 Segregated Portfolio, Mason Capital Master Fund LP, Nokota Capital Master Fund, L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX (Parallel 2), L.P., Oaktree Opportunities Fund IX, L.P., Oaktree Value Opportunities Fund, L.P., Oaktree-Forrest Multi-Strategy, LLC (Series B), Oceana Master Fund Ltd., Ocher Rose, L.L.C., Pentwater Merger Arbitrage Master Fund Ltd., PWCM Master Fund Ltd. and SV Credit, L.P.. Service: 02/09/2021 by email. [754767] [21-1577] [David Fox] [Entered: 02/09/2021 12:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Entry of appearance for Laura Myron; Michael Shih; Mark R. Freeman; Michael S. Raab; Chris Carney as counsel for Appellee US. Service: 01/27/2021 by email. [752060] [21-1577] [Laura Myron] [Entered: 01/27/2021 12:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 01/22/2021. [751807] Entry of Appearance due 02/09/2021. Certificate of Interest is due on 02/09/2021. Docketing Statement due 02/25/2021. Appellants' brief is due 03/29/2021. [MMA] [Entered: 01/26/2021 01:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OAKTREE-FORREST MULTI-STRATEGY, L.L.C. (SERIES B) is a litigant