Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 01/19/2021 at 06:07:10 (UTC).

ALPS Property & Casualty Ins. v. Legacy Steel Building, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 11/20/2020 ALPS Property Casualty Ins filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Legacy Steel Building, Inc . This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-3432

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendants

Bredahl & Associates, P.C.

Jeff A. Bredahl

Plaintiff / Appellee

ALPS Property & Casualty Insurance Company

Defendant / Appellants

Legacy Steel Building, Inc.

Bruce Engkjer

Wane Engkjer

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

John Crisman Palmer

Attorney at GUNDERSON & PALMER

506 Sixth Street, P.O. Box 8045

Rapid City, SD 57709-8045

Kevin Hartzell

Attorney at KUTAK & ROCK

The Omaha Building, 1650 Farnam Street

Omaha, NE 68102-0000

Brooke McCarthy

Attorney at KUTAK & ROCK

The Omaha Building, 1650 Farnam Street

Omaha, NE 68102-0000

Defendant / Appellant Attorney

Paul Allan Sortland

Attorney at SORTLAND LAW OFFICE

Suite 2440, 431 S. Seventh Street

Minneapolis, MN 55415

 

Court Documents

Open Document

BRIEF FILED - APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Bruce Engkjer, Wane Engkjer and Legacy Steel Building, Inc.. w/service 12/30/2020 , Length: 7075 words 10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS (WITHOUT THE APPELLATE PDF FOOTER) FROM Bruce Engkjer, Wane Engkjer and Legacy Steel Building, Inc. due 01/04/2021 WITH certificate of service for paper briefs. Brief of ALPS Property & Casualty Insurance Company due on 01/29/2021 [4989733] [20-3432] (LMT) [Entered: 12/30/2020 12:57 PM]

Open Document

ADDENDUM of APPELLANT FILED by Appellants Bruce Engkjer, Wane Engkjer and Legacy Steel Building, Inc. , w/service 12/30/2020 [4989728] [20-3432] (LMT) [Entered: 12/30/2020 12:51 PM]

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document

Addendum deficiency notice sent to counsel, Attorney Mr. Paul Allan Sortland for Appellants Wane Engkjer, Legacy Steel Building, Inc. and Bruce Engkjer. New electronic copy of addendum due on 01/04/2021 [4989663] [20-3432] (LMT) [Entered: 12/30/2020 11:24 AM]

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document

METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellants Bruce Engkjer, Wane Engkjer and Legacy Steel Building, Inc. - Separate Appendix - w/service 12/04/2020 [4981961] [20-3432] (PAS) [Entered: 12/04/2020 11:19 AM]

Open Document

CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellant Legacy Steel Building, Inc.. - FOR CAL [4979539] [20-3432] (PAS) [Entered: 11/25/2020 03:34 PM]

Open Document

CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee ALPS Property & Casualty Insurance Company. - FOR CAL [4978861] [20-3432] (KH) [Entered: 11/24/2020 11:09 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Kevin D. Hartzell for Appellee ALPS Property & Casualty Insurance Company w/service 11/24/2020 [4978857] [20-3432] (KH) [Entered: 11/24/2020 11:05 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Paul A. Sortland for Appellants Bruce Engkjer, Wane Engkjer and Legacy Steel Building, Inc. w/service 11/20/2020 [4977910] [20-3432] (PAS) [Entered: 11/20/2020 01:21 PM]

Open Document

BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Appendix due on 12/30/2020. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Bruce Engkjer, Wane Engkjer and Legacy Steel Building, Inc. due 12/30/2020. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [4977877] [20-3432] (MMH) [Entered: 11/20/2020 12:39 PM]

Open Document

Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Order granting motion for summary judgment 10/23/20, and Judgment 10/23/20 [4977874] [20-3432] (MMH) [Entered: 11/20/2020 12:38 PM]

Open Document

Civil case docketed. [4977869] [20-3432] (MMH) [Entered: 11/20/2020 12:30 PM]

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketPaper copies Appellant/Petitioner Brief, [ # 4989733-2 ] filed by Bruce Engkjer, Wane Engkjer and Legacy Steel Building, Inc. 10 paper copies received. w/Addendum attached [4991577] [20-3432] (NDW) [Entered: 01/06/2021 12:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketRECORD FILED - APLNT/PET APPENDIX, 1 volumes, Comments: 3 Copies [4990509] [20-3432] (AMT) [Entered: 01/04/2021 01:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEF FILED - APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Bruce Engkjer, Wane Engkjer and Legacy Steel Building, Inc.. w/service 12/30/2020 , Length: 7075 words 10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS (WITHOUT THE APPELLATE PDF FOOTER) FROM Bruce Engkjer, Wane Engkjer and Legacy Steel Building, Inc. due 01/04/2021 WITH certificate of service for paper briefs. Brief of ALPS Property & Casualty Insurance Company due on 01/29/2021 [4989733] [20-3432] (LMT) [Entered: 12/30/2020 12:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM of APPELLANT FILED by Appellants Bruce Engkjer, Wane Engkjer and Legacy Steel Building, Inc. , w/service 12/30/2020 [4989728] [20-3432] (LMT) [Entered: 12/30/2020 12:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum of APPELLANT submitted for review by Legacy Steel Building, Inc., Wane Engkjer and Bruce Engkjer. To open/view this addendum, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. [4989715] [20-3432] (PAS) [Entered: 12/30/2020 12:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum deficiency notice sent to counsel, Attorney Mr. Paul Allan Sortland for Appellants Wane Engkjer, Legacy Steel Building, Inc. and Bruce Engkjer. New electronic copy of addendum due on 01/04/2021 [4989663] [20-3432] (LMT) [Entered: 12/30/2020 11:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPELLANT brief of Bruce Engkjer, Wane Engkjer and Legacy Steel Building, Inc. submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief (if any) does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. To open/view this brief, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. Only direct recipients on accounts can open this document. [4989605] [20-3432] (PAS) [Entered: 12/30/2020 10:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum of APPELLANT submitted for review by Bruce Engkjer, Wane Engkjer and Legacy Steel Building, Inc.. To open/view this addendum, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. [4989601] [20-3432] (PAS) [Entered: 12/30/2020 10:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMETHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellants Bruce Engkjer, Wane Engkjer and Legacy Steel Building, Inc. - Separate Appendix - w/service 12/04/2020 [4981961] [20-3432] (PAS) [Entered: 12/04/2020 11:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellant Legacy Steel Building, Inc.. - FOR CAL [4979539] [20-3432] (PAS) [Entered: 11/25/2020 03:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee ALPS Property & Casualty Insurance Company. - FOR CAL [4978861] [20-3432] (KH) [Entered: 11/24/2020 11:09 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Kevin D. Hartzell for Appellee ALPS Property & Casualty Insurance Company w/service 11/24/2020 [4978857] [20-3432] (KH) [Entered: 11/24/2020 11:05 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Paul A. Sortland for Appellants Bruce Engkjer, Wane Engkjer and Legacy Steel Building, Inc. w/service 11/20/2020 [4977910] [20-3432] (PAS) [Entered: 11/20/2020 01:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Appendix due on 12/30/2020. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Bruce Engkjer, Wane Engkjer and Legacy Steel Building, Inc. due 12/30/2020. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [4977877] [20-3432] (MMH) [Entered: 11/20/2020 12:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Order granting motion for summary judgment 10/23/20, and Judgment 10/23/20 [4977874] [20-3432] (MMH) [Entered: 11/20/2020 12:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case docketed. [4977869] [20-3432] (MMH) [Entered: 11/20/2020 12:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALPS Property & Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant