This case was last updated from PACER on 05/24/2019 at 06:05:10 (UTC).

Almanzar v. US

Case Summary

On 03/25/2019 Almanzar filed a Prisoner - Vacate Sentence lawsuit against US. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1289

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Vacate Sentence

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit

 

Party Details

Respondent / Appellee

UNITED STATES

Petitioner / Appellants

ROGER JOSE ALMANZAR, a/k/a Roger Villalona, a/k/a Gallo

Joint Base Mdl, NJ 08640-0000

ROGER JOSE ALMANZAR

Cumberland, MD 21501-1000

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent / Appellee Attorneys

Cynthia A. Young

Attorney at US Attorney's Office

1 Courthouse Way, Ste 9200

Boston, MA 02110-0000

Katherine H. Ferguson

Attorney at US Attorney's Office

1 Courthouse Way, Ste 9200

Boston, MA 02110-0000

Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

Roger Jose Almanzar

Attorney at FCI Cumberland

Po Box 1000

Cumberland, MD 21501-1000

 

Court Documents

Open Document

ORDER granting motion to extend time to file CAP memorandum filed by Appellant Roger Jose Almanzar. Memorandum supporting issuance of CAP due 05/31/2019. [19-1289] (GK) [Entered: 05/09/2019 12:38 PM]

Open Document

MOTION to extend time to file a memorandum supporting issuance of a certificate of appealability filed by Appellant Roger Jose Almanzar. Certificate of service dated 04/26/2019. [19-1289] (GRC) [Entered: 05/03/2019 02:01 PM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant Roger Jose Almanzar indicating transcripts are not necessary for this appeal. [19-1289] (GRC) [Entered: 04/16/2019 02:59 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE of change of address filed by Party Roger Jose Almanzar. [19-1289] (GRC) [Entered: 04/16/2019 02:53 PM]

Open Document

ORDER directing petitioner to file a request for a certificate of appealabilty in this court by 05/01/2019. Date of denial by district court: January 30, 2019 and March 1, 2019. [19-1289] (GRC) [Entered: 04/01/2019 11:35 AM]

Open Document

Mail returned as undeliverable to Appellant Roger Jose Almanzar. Copy of Case Opening Notice issued Marhc 25, 2019. Forwarded to FCI Fort Dix PO Box 2000 Joint Base MDL, NJ 08640-0000. [19-1289] (ZN) [Entered: 03/28/2019 11:34 AM]

Open Document #3

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document #2

Case Opening Notice

Open Document #1

Abbreviated Record

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER granting motion to extend time to file CAP memorandum filed by Appellant Roger Jose Almanzar. Memorandum supporting issuance of CAP due 05/31/2019. [19-1289] (GK) [Entered: 05/09/2019 12:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION to extend time to file a memorandum supporting issuance of a certificate of appealability filed by Appellant Roger Jose Almanzar. Certificate of service dated 04/26/2019. [19-1289] (GRC) [Entered: 05/03/2019 02:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant Roger Jose Almanzar indicating transcripts are not necessary for this appeal. [19-1289] (GRC) [Entered: 04/16/2019 02:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of change of address filed by Party Roger Jose Almanzar. [19-1289] (GRC) [Entered: 04/16/2019 02:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER directing petitioner to file a request for a certificate of appealabilty in this court by 05/01/2019. Date of denial by district court: January 30, 2019 and March 1, 2019. [19-1289] (GRC) [Entered: 04/01/2019 11:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Mail returned as undeliverable to Appellant Roger Jose Almanzar. Copy of Case Opening Notice issued Marhc 25, 2019. Forwarded to FCI Fort Dix PO Box 2000 Joint Base MDL, NJ 08640-0000. [19-1289] (ZN) [Entered: 03/28/2019 11:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #901) filed by Appellant Roger Jose Almanzar. Transcript Report/Order form due 04/08/2019. [19-1289]. CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to attach a missing document. (GRC) [Entered: 03/25/2019 02:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less