This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 05/23/2021 at 06:03:56 (UTC).

Allstar Pipe Services v. BP Expl

Case Summary

On 03/24/2021 Allstar Pipe Services filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against BP Expl. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-30156

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

Transocean, Limited

Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling, Incorporated

Transocean Deepwater, Incorporated

Transocean Holdings, L.L.C.

BP, P.L.C.

BP America Production Company

BP Exploration & Production, Incorporated

Sperry Drilling Services, a division of Halliburton Energy Services, Incorporated

Triton Asset Leasing GmBH

Halliburton Energy Services, Incorporated

Plaintiff / Appellant

Allstar Pipe Services, Incorporated

322 Toulouse Road

Opelousas, LA 70570

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Allstar Pipe Services, Incorporated

Attorney at Attention: Thomas Wright

322 Toulouse Road

Opelousas, LA 70570

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

George W. Hicks Jr.

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis, L.L.P.

1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20004

Aaron Lloyd Nielson

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis, L.L.P.

1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20004

Devin Chase Reid Esq.

Attorney at Liskow & Lewis, P.L.C.

701 Poydras Street, Hancock Whitney Center

New Orleans, LA 70139

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #1

MDT-1 Letter

Open Document #2

DIS-2 Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK ORDER dismissing appeal pursuant to 5th Circuit Rule 42 for failure to comply with the Court's notice of 03/30/2021 [21-30156] (MAS) [Entered: 05/04/2021 04:08 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK ORDER granting motion for an extension of time until 04/29/2021 to comply with court's notice of 03/30/2021, regarding retention of counsel filed by Appellant Allstar Pipe Services, Incorporated [ # 9551680-2 ] [21-30156] (CB) [Entered: 04/19/2021 04:30 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION filed by Appellant Allstar Pipe Services, Incorporated Extend time to comply with the court's notice of obtaining an attorney to represent the company Allstar Pipe Services, Inc. [9551680-2]. Date of service: 04/13/2021 [21-30156] (MAS) [Entered: 04/15/2021 02:30 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Aaron Lloyd Nielson for party(s) Appellee BP America Production Company Appellee BP Exploration & Production, Incorporated Appellee BP, P.L.C., in case 21-30156 [21-30156] (MAS) [Entered: 04/01/2021 01:24 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) George W. Hicks Jr. for party(s) Appellee BP America Production Company Appellee BP Exploration & Production, Incorporated Appellee BP, P.L.C., in case 21-30156 [21-30156] (MAS) [Entered: 04/01/2021 12:36 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Devin Chase Reid for party(s) Appellee BP America Production Company Appellee BP Exploration & Production, Incorporated Appellee BP, P.L.C., in case 21-30156 [21-30156] (MAS) [Entered: 04/01/2021 12:34 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-30156] (Aaron Lloyd Nielson ) [Entered: 03/31/2021 12:16 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-30156] (George W. Hicks Jr.) [Entered: 03/31/2021 12:15 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-30156] (Devin Chase Reid ) [Entered: 03/31/2021 12:12 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9538833-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Miscellaneous due on 04/14/2021 for Appellant Allstar Pipe Services, Incorporated. Company must retain counsel in order to proceed with the appeal. [21-30156] (AGL) [Entered: 03/30/2021 02:09 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Allstar Pipe Services, Incorporated [21-30156] (MAS) [Entered: 03/24/2021 09:17 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sperry Drilling Services, a division of Halliburton Energy Services, Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases where TRANSOCEAN, LIMITED is a litigant

Latest cases where TRITON ASSET LEASING GMBH is a litigant

Latest cases where Transocean Holdings, LLC is a litigant