This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 07/18/2022 at 06:06:11 (UTC).

Allred v. Commissioner, SSA

Case Summary

On 05/19/2022 Allred filed a Government Benefit - Social Security lawsuit against Commissioner, SSA. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-4044

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

RANDA K. ALLRED

Defendant / Appellees

KILOLO KIJAKAZI, Acting Commissioner of Social Security

COMMISSIONER, SSA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Patricia K. Abbott

Attorney at Utah Legal Services, Inc.

205 North 400 West

Salt Lake City, UT 84103

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

James Burgess

1961 Stout Street, Suite 4169

Denver, CO 80294-4003

Kirsten A. Westerland

1961 Stout Street, Suite 4169

Denver, CO 80294-4003

Amanda A. Berndt

111 South Main Street, Suite 1800

Salt Lake City, UT 84111-2176

Narissa C. Webber

Attorney at Social Security Administration, Region VIII

1961 Stout Street, Suite 4169

Denver, CO 80294-4003

 

Court Documents

Open Restricted Document #1

Preliminary Record

Open Restricted Document #2

General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document #1

Main Document

Open Restricted Document #2

Notice ROA Complete

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document #1

Appendix Volume 1

Open Restricted Document #2

Appendix Volume 2

Open Restricted Document #3

Appendix Volume 3

Open Restricted Document #4

Appendix Volume 4

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2022
  • Docket[10927174] Minute order filed - the brief and appendix submitted by appellant is accepted for filing. Paper copies shall now be filed with the court within 5 business days of this order. All copies must be exact replicas of the electronic filings, including all attachments and number of volumes filed (for appendices). Paper copies due 07/22/2022 by Randa K. Allred. Appellee's brief now due 08/15/2022 for Commissioner, SSA. (Text Only - No Attachment) [22-4044] [Entered: 07/15/2022 02:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketThis entry has been removed from the docket by MLB to consolidate docket entries for appendix. [10927116] Appellant's appendix filed by Randa K. Allred. Total number of volumes filed: 4. Served on 07/12/2022. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required privacy and virus certifications: Yes. [22-4044] PKA [Entered: 07/15/2022 01:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketThis entry has been removed from the docket by MLB to consolidate docket entries for appendix. [10927115] Appellant's appendix filed by Randa K. Allred. Total number of volumes filed: 4. Served on 07/12/2022. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required privacy and virus certifications: Yes. [22-4044] PKA [Entered: 07/15/2022 01:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketThis entry has been removed from the docket by MLB to consolidate docket entries for appendix. [10927113] Appellant's appendix filed by Randa K. Allred. Total number of volumes filed: 4. Served on 07/12/2022. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required privacy and virus certifications: Yes. [22-4044] PKA [Entered: 07/15/2022 01:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10927111] Appellant's appendix filed by Randa K. Allred. Total number of volumes filed: 4. Served on 07/12/2022. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required privacy and virus certifications: Yes. [22-4044] PKA [Entered: 07/15/2022 01:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10927101] Appellant/Petitioner's brief filed by Randa K. Allred. Served on 07/15/2022 by email. Oral argument requested? Yes. Word/page count: 8079. This pleading complies with all required privacy and virus certifications: Yes. [22-4044] PKA [Entered: 07/15/2022 12:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10926128] Notice of appellant's deficient brief and appendix received from Randa K. Allred. See attached letter for specifics. Appellant's brief and appendix due on 07/15/2022 for Randa K. Allred. [22-4044] [Entered: 07/12/2022 01:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketThis entry has been removed from the docket by MLB - Corrected appendix filed on 07/15/22 [10926015] Appellant's appendix filed by Randa K. Allred. Total number of volumes filed: 4. Served on 07/12/2022. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required privacy and virus certifications: Yes. [22-4044] PKA [Entered: 07/12/2022 10:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketThis entry has been removed from the docket by MLB - Corrected appendix filed on 07/15/22 [10926013] Appellant's appendix filed by Randa K. Allred. Total number of volumes filed: 4. Served on 07/12/2022. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required privacy and virus certifications: Yes. [22-4044] PKA [Entered: 07/12/2022 10:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketThis entry has been removed from the docket by MLB - Corrected appendix filed on 07/15/22 [10926011] Appellant's appendix filed by Randa K. Allred. Total number of volumes filed: 4. Served on 07/12/2022. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required privacy and virus certifications: Yes. [22-4044] PKA [Entered: 07/12/2022 10:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10917473] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 06/02/2022. Appellant's brief and appendix due on 07/12/2022 for Randa K. Allred. [22-4044] [Entered: 06/02/2022 03:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • Docket[10917450] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 06/09/2022 for Kimberly A. Free, Clerk of Court. (Text Only - No Attachment) [22-4044] [Entered: 06/02/2022 02:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10917432] Notice filed that the transcript is already on file in the district court filed by Randa K. Allred. Served on: 06/02/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-4044] PKA [Entered: 06/02/2022 01:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketThis entry has been removed from the docket. [KLP] Refiled using proper event. [10917429] Acknowledgment of transcript order filed by Randa K. Allred. Transcript ordered: N/A. Served on: 06/02/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-4044] PKA [Entered: 06/02/2022 01:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10917424] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Patricia K. Abbott for Randa K. Allred. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 06/02/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-4044] [Entered: 06/02/2022 01:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • Docket[10917410] Entry of appearance submitted by Patricia Kay Abbott for Appellant Randa K. Allred for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 06/02/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-4044]--[Edited 06/02/2022 by JM PDF removed filed 6/2/22.] PKA [Entered: 06/02/2022 01:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10917406] Docketing statement filed by Randa K. Allred. Served on 06/02/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-4044] PKA [Entered: 06/02/2022 01:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10917264] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Narissa C. Webber for Commissioner, SSA. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. [22-4044] [Entered: 06/02/2022 09:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • Docket[10917262] Entry of appearance submitted by Narissa C. Webber for Appellee Commissioner, SSA for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 06/02/2022. Manner of Service: email. [22-4044]--[Edited 06/02/2022 by KLP to delete the attachment; entry filed.] NCW [Entered: 06/02/2022 09:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10914306] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 05/19/2022 Docketing statement, transcript order form and notice of appearance due 06/02/2022 for Randa K. Allred. Notice of appearance due on 06/02/2022 for Commissioner, SSA--[Edited 05/24/2022 by MLB to correct docket text] [22-4044] [Entered: 05/19/2022 09:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer James Burgess

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Narissa C. Webber

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kirsten A. Westerland

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Amanda A. Berndt