This case was last updated from PACER on 02/25/2021 at 05:02:51 (UTC).

Alliance for Water Efficiency v. United States Department

Case Summary

On 02/22/2021 Alliance for Water Efficiency filed an Other lawsuit against United States Department. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-428

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Environment America

U.S. Public Interest Research Group

Alliance for Water Efficiency

Respondents

United States Department of Energy

David G. Huizenga, Acting Secretary, United States Department of Energy

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Michael Landis Esq.

Attorney at The Center for Public Interest Research, Inc.

1543 Wazee Street

Denver, CO 80202

Keith Bradley Esq.

Attorney at Squire Patton Boggs (US) LLP

1801 California Street

Denver, CO 80202

Respondent Attorney

Katherine Twomey Allen Esq.

Attorney at United States Department of Justice

1100 L Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

 

Court Documents

#22

(#22) MOTION, to consolidate appeals, to extend time, on behalf of Respondent David G. Huizenga and United States Department of Energy, FILED. Service date 02/24/2021 by CM/ECF. [3043773] [21-428] [Entered: 02/24/2021 07:27 PM]

#15

(#15) LETTER, on behalf of Petitioner Environment America and U.S. Public Interest Research Group, informing the Court, Petitioners Environment America and U.S. Public Interest Research Group join in full the Motion for Stay Pending Review filed on 02/23/2021, RECEIVED. Service date 02/24/2021 by CM/ECF.[3043216] [21-428] [Entered: 02/24/2021 11:36 AM]

#14

(#14) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Petitioner Environment America and U.S. Public Interest Research Group, FILED. Service date 02/24/2021 by CM/ECF.[3043199] [21-428] [Entered: 02/24/2021 11:27 AM]

#11

(#11) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Petitioner U.S. Public Interest Research Group and Environment America, FILED. Service date 02/24/2021 by CM/ECF. [3043130] [21-428] [Entered: 02/24/2021 10:50 AM]

#9

(#9) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, [7], on behalf of Petitioner Environment America and U.S. Public Interest Research Group, FILED.[3042897] [21-428] [Entered: 02/24/2021 04:52 AM]

6 #16

Exhibit N

6 #15

Exhibit M

6 #14

Exhibit L

6 #12

Exhibit J

6 #10

Exhibit H

6 #8

Exhibit F

6 #7

Exhibit E

#6

Exhibit D

6 #5

Exhibit C

6 #4

Exhibit B

6 #3

Exhibit A

6 #2

Exhibit List

6 #1

Motion for Stay Pending Review

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) MOTION, to consolidate appeals, to extend time, on behalf of Respondent David G. Huizenga and United States Department of Energy, FILED. Service date 02/24/2021 by CM/ECF. [3043773] [21-428] [Entered: 02/24/2021 07:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) LETTER, on behalf of Petitioner Environment America and U.S. Public Interest Research Group, informing the Court, Petitioners Environment America and U.S. Public Interest Research Group join in full the Motion for Stay Pending Review filed on 02/23/2021, RECEIVED. Service date 02/24/2021 by CM/ECF.[3043216] [21-428] [Entered: 02/24/2021 11:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Petitioner Environment America and U.S. Public Interest Research Group, FILED. Service date 02/24/2021 by CM/ECF.[3043199] [21-428] [Entered: 02/24/2021 11:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CURED DEFECTIVE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL [ # 9 ], [ # 11 ], on behalf of Petitioner Environment America and U.S. Public Interest Research Group, FILED.[3043136] [21-428] [Entered: 02/24/2021 10:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ATTORNEY, Michael Landis, [ # 11 ], in place of attorney Keith Bradley, SUBSTITUTED.[3043134] [21-428] [Entered: 02/24/2021 10:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Petitioner U.S. Public Interest Research Group and Environment America, FILED. Service date 02/24/2021 by CM/ECF. [3043130] [21-428] [Entered: 02/24/2021 10:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, [7], on behalf of Petitioner Environment America and U.S. Public Interest Research Group, FILED.[3042897] [21-428] [Entered: 02/24/2021 04:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Petitioner U.S. Public Interest Research Group and Environment America, FILED. Service date 02/23/2021 by CM/ECF. [3042891] [21-428] [Entered: 02/23/2021 11:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION, to stay, on behalf of Petitioner Alliance for Water Efficiency, FILED. Service date 02/23/2021 by CM/ECF. [3042853] [21-428] [Entered: 02/23/2021 07:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PETITION FOR REVIEW OF AGENCY ORDER, SERVED. [3042757] [21-428] [Entered: 02/23/2021 04:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) AGENCY DECISION AND ORDER, dated 12/16/2021, RECEIVED.[3042739] [21-428] [Entered: 02/23/2021 04:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION FOR REVIEW OF AGENCY ORDER, on behalf of Petitioner Alliance for Water Efficiency, Environment America and U.S. Public Interest Research Group, FILED. [3042721] [21-428] [Entered: 02/23/2021 04:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where US PUBLIC INTEREST RESEARCH GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases where Environment America is a litigant

Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Katherine Twomey Allen