This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 01/30/2021 at 06:19:49 (UTC).

Alliance for Water Efficiency, et al v. DOE, et al

Case Summary

On 01/27/2021 Alliance for Water Efficiency filed an Other lawsuit against DOE. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1167

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Petitioners

ENVIRONMENT AMERICA

U.S. PUBLIC INTEREST RESEARCH GROUP

ALLIANCE FOR WATER EFFICIENCY

Respondents

UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY

DAVID G. HUIZENGA, Acting Secretary, United States Department of Energy

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Michael Landis

Attorney at CENTER FOR PUBLIC INTEREST RESEARCH

1543 Wazee Street

Denver, CO 80202

Keith Bradley

Attorney at SQUIRE PATTON BOGGS (US) LLP

1801 California Street

Denver, CO 80202

Respondent Attorney

Amelia Whiting

Attorney at DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY

1000 Independence Avenue S.W.

Washington, DC 20585

 

Court Documents

#1

Petition for Review

1 #2

Agency Cover Letter

1 #3

Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing

1 #4

Agency Fee Letter

#2

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docketing Statement filed by Petitioners Alliance for Water Efficiency, Environment America and U.S. Public Interest Research Group. Prior or Related proceedings: Yes. 21-1166 [2] [7137821] [21-1167] (PS) [Entered: 01/28/2021 01:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Petition for Review docketed with proof of service, pursuant to FRAP 15(c). Fee due. Agency record or certified list due by 03/08/2021. Fee or IFP forms due on 02/10/2021 for Petitioners Alliance for Water Efficiency, Environment America and U.S. Public Interest Research Group. [1] [7137817] [21-1167] (PS) [Entered: 01/28/2021 01:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where US PUBLIC INTEREST RESEARCH GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases where Environment America is a litigant

Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant