This case was last updated from PACER on 04/04/2020 at 05:29:57 (UTC).

Allen Pullen v. T. Brown, et al

Case Summary

On 04/01/2020 Allen Pullen filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against T Brown. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-11258

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

SERVICE

Plaintiff / Appellant

ALLEN PULLEN

Kissimmee, FL 34744

Defendant / Appellees

HALL

DOUGLAS

L. THOMPSON

SCOTT

T. A. BROWN, Major

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Ana Francolin Dolney

Attorney at Cruser Mitchell Novitz Sanchez Gaston & Zimet, LLP

121 S Orange Ave Ste 1500

Orlando, FL 32801

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Allen Pullen

581 Woodlawn Ter

Kissimmee, FL 34744

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Jeremy A. Mutz

Attorney at Attorney General's Office

Pl-01 The Capitol

Tallahassee, FL 32399-1050

Ashley Moody

Attorney at Attorney General's Office

Pl-01 The Capitol

Tallahassee, FL 32399-1050

Joe Belitzky

Attorney at Attorney General's Office

Pl-01 The Capitol

Tallahassee, FL 32399-1050

 

Court Documents

Open Document #3

USDC Order- doc #95

Open Document #2

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #1

DKT-2 Notice to Counsel/Parties

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Allen Pullen on 03/30/2020. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 04/15/2020 as to Appellant Allen Pullen. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 04/29/2020 as to Appellee T. A. Brown [Entered: 04/02/2020 08:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.