This case was last updated from PACER on 09/13/2019 at 06:01:24 (UTC).

Allen Feingold v. Palmer & Barr, et al

Case Summary

On 07/15/2019 Allen Feingold filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Palmer Barr. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-2621

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendants and Defendant / Appellees

STATE FARM MUTUAL INSURANCE CO, AKA State Farm

STATE FARM INSURANCE CO, AKA State Farm

STATE FARM AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE CO, AKA State Farm

Defendant / Appellees

MARK S. KARDOS

Philadelphia, PA 19102

BCMAC

STATE FARM MUTUAL INSURANCE CO, AKA State Farm

BARBARA J. LYONS

STATE FARM INSURANCE CO, AKA State Farm

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE CO, AKA State Farm

THERESA MOGAVERO SIMMONS

JOHN BARR

Willow Grove, PA 19090

THOMAS DELEVIE

WALTER S. JENKINS

STATE FARM AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE CO, AKA State Farm

STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY CO, AKA State Farm

PALMER & BARR

JOHN MCGRATH

Plaintiff / Appellant

ALLEN L. FEINGOLD

Philadelphia, PA 19102

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Eric J. Kadish Esq.

Attorney at Maron Marvel Bradley & Anderson

1717 Arch Street, Three Logan Square, Suite 3710

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Mark S. Kardos Esq.

Attorney at Kardos & Goch

1515 Market Street, Suite 1510

Philadelphia, PA 19102

John S. Thome Esq.

Attorney at Harris & Harris

1760 Bristol Road, P.O. Box 160

Warrington, PA 18976

John S. Thome Esq. Jr.

Attorney at Harris & Harris

1760 Bristol Road, P.O. Box 160

Warrington, PA 18976

Katherine C. Douglas Esq.

Attorney at Bennett Bricklin & Saltzburg

1601 Market Street, 16Th Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Lise Luborsky Esq.

Attorney at Bennett Bricklin & Saltzburg

1601 Market Street, 16Th Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19103

John J. Barr Esq.

Attorney at Palmer & Barr

607 Easton Road, Suite E3, Grove Summit Office Park

Willow Grove, PA 19090

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Allen L. Feingold

P.O. Box 60171

Philadelphia, PA 19102

 

Court Documents

Open Document

PRO SE BRIEF with Volume I of appendix attached on behalf of Appellant Allen L. Feingold, filed. Pages: 24, Certificate of Service dated 09/09/2019 by US mail. (KEL) [Entered: 09/10/2019 11:08 AM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from John S. Thome, Jr. on behalf of Respondent(s) Barbara Lyons; BCMAC. [19-2621, 19-1495] (JST) [Entered: 08/23/2019 01:36 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Barbara J. Lyons in 19-2621, filed. [19-2621, 19-1495] (JST) [Entered: 08/23/2019 01:34 PM]

Open Document #2

Standing Order

Open Document #1

Briefing and Scheduling Order

Open Document

DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Allen L. Feingold, filed. (KR) [Entered: 07/30/2019 03:19 PM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT PURCHASE ORDER FORM (Part 1), filed on behalf of Appellant Allen L. Feingold. No proceedings in District Court. (KR) [Entered: 07/30/2019 03:16 PM]

Open Document

CONCISE SUMMARY OF THE CASE on behalf of Appellant Allen L. Feingold, received. (KR) [Entered: 07/30/2019 03:14 PM]

Open Document

CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Allen L. Feingold, received. (KR) [Entered: 07/30/2019 03:09 PM]

Open Document

Notice received from district court that ifp has been granted to Appellant Allen L. Feingold. (KR) [Entered: 07/29/2019 10:07 AM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Katherine Cole Douglas on behalf of Appellee(s) State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. [19-2621] (KCD) [Entered: 07/29/2019 08:53 AM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee State Farm Fire and Casualty Co, filed. [19-2621] (LL) [Entered: 07/26/2019 03:26 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co, filed. [19-2621] (LL) [Entered: 07/26/2019 03:24 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Lise Luborsky on behalf of Appellee(s) State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company; State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. [19-2621] (LL) [Entered: 07/26/2019 03:19 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Walter S. Jenkins in 19-2621, filed. --[Edited 07/18/2019 by KR] (EJK) [Entered: 07/18/2019 12:37 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Eric J. Kadish on behalf of Appellee(s) Walter S. Jenkins. --[Edited 07/18/2019 by KR] (EJK) [Entered: 07/18/2019 12:31 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellees John Barr, Thomas Delevie, Palmer & Barr, John McGrath and Theresa Mogavero Simmons in 19-2621, filed. --[Edited 07/18/2019 by KR] (JJB) [Entered: 07/16/2019 10:19 AM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from John Barr on behalf of Appellee(s) Palmer & Barr, John Barr, Thomas Delevie, John McGrath, Theresa Simmons. --[Edited 07/18/2019 by KR] (JJB) [Entered: 07/16/2019 10:17 AM]

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PRO SE BRIEF with Volume I of appendix attached on behalf of Appellant Allen L. Feingold, filed. Pages: 24, Certificate of Service dated 09/09/2019 by US mail. (KEL) [Entered: 09/10/2019 11:08 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from John S. Thome, Jr. on behalf of Respondent(s) Barbara Lyons; BCMAC. [19-2621, 19-1495] (JST) [Entered: 08/23/2019 01:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Barbara J. Lyons in 19-2621, filed. [19-2621, 19-1495] (JST) [Entered: 08/23/2019 01:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellant Allen L. Feingold due on or before 09/10/2019. Appendix due on or before 09/10/2019. (KR) [Entered: 08/01/2019 09:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Allen L. Feingold, filed. (KR) [Entered: 07/30/2019 03:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT PURCHASE ORDER FORM (Part 1), filed on behalf of Appellant Allen L. Feingold. No proceedings in District Court. (KR) [Entered: 07/30/2019 03:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CONCISE SUMMARY OF THE CASE on behalf of Appellant Allen L. Feingold, received. (KR) [Entered: 07/30/2019 03:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Allen L. Feingold, received. (KR) [Entered: 07/30/2019 03:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice received from district court that ifp has been granted to Appellant Allen L. Feingold. (KR) [Entered: 07/29/2019 10:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Katherine Cole Douglas on behalf of Appellee(s) State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. [19-2621] (KCD) [Entered: 07/29/2019 08:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee State Farm Fire and Casualty Co, filed. [19-2621] (LL) [Entered: 07/26/2019 03:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co, filed. [19-2621] (LL) [Entered: 07/26/2019 03:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Lise Luborsky on behalf of Appellee(s) State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company; State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. [19-2621] (LL) [Entered: 07/26/2019 03:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Walter S. Jenkins in 19-2621, filed. --[Edited 07/18/2019 by KR] (EJK) [Entered: 07/18/2019 12:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Eric J. Kadish on behalf of Appellee(s) Walter S. Jenkins. --[Edited 07/18/2019 by KR] (EJK) [Entered: 07/18/2019 12:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellees John Barr, Thomas Delevie, Palmer & Barr, John McGrath and Theresa Mogavero Simmons in 19-2621, filed. --[Edited 07/18/2019 by KR] (JJB) [Entered: 07/16/2019 10:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from John Barr on behalf of Appellee(s) Palmer & Barr, John Barr, Thomas Delevie, John McGrath, Theresa Simmons. --[Edited 07/18/2019 by KR] (JJB) [Entered: 07/16/2019 10:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (KR) [Entered: 07/15/2019 03:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Allen L. Feingold in District Court No. 2-18-cv-04991. (KR) [Entered: 07/15/2019 03:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.