This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 05/26/2019 at 06:11:12 (UTC).

Allan Lavut, et al v. Bank of America, et al

Case Summary

On 03/27/2019 Allan Lavut filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Bank of America. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-11123

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON, formerly known as The Bank of New York as trustee for J.P. Morgan as trustee for Bear Stearns Alt-A as trustee for Mortgage Pass- Through Certificates as trustee for Series Holders2005-05

MERSCORP HOLDINGS, INC., f.k.a. Merscorp, Inc.

BAC HOME LOANS SERVICING, LP

BANK OF AMERICA

MORTGAGE ELECTRIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC.

Plaintiff / Appellants

CIPORA LAVUT

ALLAN LAVUT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Andrew G. Phillips

Attorney at McGuireWoods, LLP

1230 Peachtree St Ne Ste 2100

Atlanta, GA 30309

Jarrod Sean Mendel

Attorney at McGuireWoods, LLP

1230 Peachtree St Ne Ste 2100

Atlanta, GA 30309

Kyle Shigeyuki Kotake

Attorney at Brock & Scott, PLLC

4360 Chamblee Dunwoody Rd Ste 310

Atlanta, GA 30341

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Latrice L. Latin

Attorney at The Latin Law Group, LLC

1425 Market Blvd Ste 330-237

Roswell, GA 30076

Rick Louis Brunner

Attorney at Brunner Quinn

35 N 4Th St Ste 200

Columbus, OH 43215

Patrick M. Quinn

Attorney at Brunner Quinn

35 N 4Th St Ste 200

Columbus, OH 43215

 

Court Documents

Open Document #5

Appendix Certificate of Service

Open Document #4

Appendix - Volume 3

Open Document #3

Appendix - Volume 2

Open Document #2

Appendix - Volume 1

Open Document #1

Motion to Reinstate

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #2

Appearance of counsel form not processed

Open Document #1

ATTY-1 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION to reinstate appeal filed by Allan Lavut and Cipora Lavut. Motion is Unopposed. [8775241-1] [19-11123] (ECF: Rick Brunner) [Entered: 05/16/2019 04:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • Docket***ERROR*** Certificate of Service of Appendix filed by Attorney Rick Louis Brunner for Appellants Allan Lavut and Cipora Lavut. [19-11123]--[Edited 05/17/2019 by CJ] (ECF: Rick Brunner) [Entered: 05/16/2019 04:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • Docket***FILED WITHOUT LEAVE OF THE COURT*** Appendix filed [3 VOLUMES] by Appellants Allan Lavut and Cipora Lavut. [19-11123]--[Edited 05/17/2019 by CJ] (ECF: Rick Brunner) [Entered: 05/16/2019 03:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF DISMISSAL: Pursuant to the 11th Cir.R. 42-2(c), this appeal is DISMISSED for want of prosecution because the appellants Allan Lavut and Cipora Lavut failed to file an appendix within the time fixed by the rules. [Entered: 05/15/2019 11:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • DocketReceived paper copies of EBrief filed by Appellants Allan Lavut and Cipora Lavut. [Entered: 05/10/2019 11:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppellant's brief filed by Allan Lavut and Cipora Lavut. [19-11123] (ECF: Rick Brunner) [Entered: 05/06/2019 11:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Jarrod Sean Mendel for Appellees BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP, Bank of America, MERSCORP Holdings, Inc., Mortgage Electric Registration Systems, Inc. and The Bank of New York Mellon. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11123] (ECF: Jarrod Mendel) [Entered: 04/22/2019 01:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jarrod Mendel for Appellees [19-11123] (ECF: Jarrod Mendel) [Entered: 04/22/2019 10:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBriefing Notice issued to Appellants Allan Lavut and Cipora Lavut. The appellant's brief is due on or before 05/06/2019. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 04/10/2019 02:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Rick Louis Brunner for Appellants Allan Lavut and Cipora Lavut. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11123] (ECF: Rick Brunner) [Entered: 04/10/2019 02:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppearance of counsel form has not been processed. According to our records, Patrick M. Quinn for Allan Lavut and Cipora Lavut is not a member of the Eleventh Circuit bar. The appearance of counsel form has not been processed allowing fourteen days to complete and return the required application for admission. [Entered: 04/10/2019 02:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Rick Louis Brunner for Appellants Allan Lavut and Cipora Lavut. No hearings. [19-11123] (ECF: Rick Brunner) [Entered: 04/10/2019 02:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Rick Louis Brunner for Appellants Allan Lavut and Cipora Lavut. [19-11123] (ECF: Rick Brunner) [Entered: 04/10/2019 02:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Patrick M. Quinn for Allan Lavut and Cipora Lavut. [19-11123] (ECF: Rick Brunner) [Entered: 04/10/2019 02:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Rick Louis Brunner for Allan Lavut and Cipora Lavut. [19-11123] (ECF: Rick Brunner) [Entered: 04/10/2019 02:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppellate fee was paid on 03/27/2019 as to Appellant Allan Lavut. [Entered: 03/28/2019 07:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellants Allan Lavut and Cipora Lavut on 03/27/2019. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 04/10/2019 as to Appellant Allan Lavut. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 04/24/2019 as to Appellee BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP [Entered: 03/28/2019 07:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MERSCORP is a litigant

Latest cases where BAC Home Loan Servicing, LP is a litigant

Latest cases where Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant