This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/03/2021 at 06:02:23 (UTC).

Alister Cook v. Carter

Case Summary

On 10/04/2021 Alister Cook filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Carter. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-13407

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

ALISTER COOK

Union Springs, AL 36089-5107

Defendant / Appellee

CARTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Alister Cook

Attorney at Bullock CF - Inmate Legal Mail

Po Box 5107

Union Springs, AL 36089-5107

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Bart Gregory Harmon

Attorney at Alabama Department of Corrections

301 S Ripley St, Po Box 301501

Montgomery, AL 36130-1501

Thomas Michael McCarthy

Attorney at Alabama Department of Corrections

301 S Ripley St, Po Box 301501

Montgomery, AL 36130-1501

 

Court Documents

Open Document #1

DKT-2 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #2

PLRA Prisoner Case Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #3

USDC Judgment- doc #91

Open Document

Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Alister Cook. [Entered: 10/28/2021 09:26 AM]

Open Document

This APPELLANT has been notified that upon expiration of fourteen (14) days from this date, this appeal will be dismissed by the clerk without further notice unless the required filing fee has been received or a motion for relief from the obligation to pay in advance is filed in the District Court. The appellant is being served with this letter. [Entered: 11/03/2021 12:18 PM]

Open Document

Returned Mail was received for Attorney Thomas Michael McCarthy for Appellee Carter. Address has been verified and updated, and mail has been re-sent. IN RE: DKT-2 Letter [Entered: 11/08/2021 03:08 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Bart Harmon for Ronald Carter. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-13407] (ECF: Joseph Stewart) [Entered: 11/10/2021 02:44 PM]

Open Document

MOTION for continuance of time construed as extension of time to file a Transcript Order Form to 12/15/2021 filed by Appellant Alister Cook. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [9535227-1] [Entered: 11/18/2021 03:23 PM]

Open Document

ORDER: Motion for extension to file TOF filed by Appellant Alister Cook is GRANTED by clerk. [ # 9535227-2 ] to 12/15/2021. [Entered: 11/19/2021 12:00 PM]

Open Document

MOTION for extension of time to file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis to 12/22/2021 filed by Appellant Alister Cook. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [9543906-1] [Entered: 12/02/2021 09:04 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION for extension of time to file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis to 12/22/2021 filed by Appellant Alister Cook. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [9543906-1] [Entered: 12/02/2021 09:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER: Motion for extension to file TOF filed by Appellant Alister Cook is GRANTED by clerk. [ # 9535227-2 ] to 12/15/2021. [Entered: 11/19/2021 12:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION for continuance of time construed as extension of time to file a Transcript Order Form to 12/15/2021 filed by Appellant Alister Cook. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [9535227-1] [Entered: 11/18/2021 03:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Bart Harmon for Ronald Carter. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-13407] (ECF: Joseph Stewart) [Entered: 11/10/2021 02:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturned Mail was received for Attorney Thomas Michael McCarthy for Appellee Carter. Address has been verified and updated, and mail has been re-sent. IN RE: DKT-2 Letter [Entered: 11/08/2021 03:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Bart Gregory Harmon for Carter and Thomas Michael McCarthy for Carter. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol CIP via the court's public web-page and have not filed the CIP via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 11/03/2021 12:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketThis APPELLANT has been notified that upon expiration of fourteen (14) days from this date, this appeal will be dismissed by the clerk without further notice unless the required filing fee has been received or a motion for relief from the obligation to pay in advance is filed in the District Court. The appellant is being served with this letter. [Entered: 11/03/2021 12:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Alister Cook. [Entered: 10/28/2021 09:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRISONER (PLRA) APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Alister Cook on 10/04/2021. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid.. [Entered: 10/06/2021 02:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Carter is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer THOMAS M. MCCARTHY(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bart Gregory Harmon