This case was last updated from PACER on 09/08/2020 at 06:02:57 (UTC).

Alissa Allen, et al v. County of Cumberland New Jerse, et al

Case Summary

On 07/10/2020 Alissa Allen filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against County of Cumberland New Jerse. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-2411

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

WARDEN JEFFREY B. BALICKI, in his official capacity

MELANIE LOATMAN

CORRECTIONS OFFICER D. ORTIZ

CORRECTIONS OFFICER MICHAEL PUGLISE

CORRECTIONS OFFICER RICHARD SERRANO

CORRECTIONS OFFICER MICHAEL FOWLKES

CORRECTIONS OFFICER SANTOS

A. GARCIA, RN

CORRECTIONS OFFICER BADGE NO 120

COUNTY OF CUMBERLAND NEW JERSEY

CORRECTIONS OFFICER FLOYD

Plaintiff / Appellants

THE ESTATE OF ALISSA MARIE ALLEN, by and through its administrator Ad Prosequendum Christine Allen

CHRISTINE ALLEN, In her own right

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Lilia Londar Esq.

Attorney at Holzman McClain & Londar

524 Maple Avenue, Suite 200

Linwood, NJ 08221

John C. Eastlack Esq. Jr.

Attorney at Cambria County Office of District Attorney

200 South Center Street, Cambria County Court House

Ebensburg, PA 15931

Daniel E. Rybeck Esq.

Attorney at Weir & Partners

20 Brace Road, Suite 200

Cherry Hill, NJ 08034

A. Michael Barker Esq.

Attorney at Barker Gelfand & James

210 New Road, Linwood Greene, Suite 12

Linwood, NJ 08221

Vanessa E. James Esq.

Attorney at Barker Gelfand & James

210 New Road, Linwood Greene, Suite 12

Linwood, NJ 08221

Stephen D. Holtzman Esq.

Attorney at Holtzman McClain & Londar

524 Maple Avenue, Suite 200

Linwood, NJ 08221

Jeffrey S. McClain Esq.

Attorney at Holtzman McClain & Londar

524 Maple Avenue, Suite 200

Linwood, NJ 08221

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Conrad J. Benedetto Esq.

1615 South Broad Street

Philadelphia, PA 19148

John E. Kusturiss Esq. Jr.

323 East Front Street

Media, PA 19063

Melissa Y. Hoffman Esq.

Attorney at Hladik Onorato & Federman

298 Wissahickon Avenue

North Wales, PA 19454

 

Court Documents

13 #2

Mediation Notice of Assignment Telephone

13 #1

Mediation Instructions

#12

(#12) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from John E. Kusturiss, Jr., Esquire on behalf of Appellant(s) Estate of Alissa Allen, Christine (parent). [20-2411] (CJB) [Entered: 07/20/2020 02:44 PM]

#11

(#11) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Conrad J. Benedetto, Esquire on behalf of Appellant(s) Estate of Alissa Allen, Christine (parent). [20-2411] (CJB) [Entered: 07/20/2020 02:41 PM]

#10

(#10) ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellants Alissa Marie Allen and Christine Allen advising this court that no transcripts are available. [20-2411] (CJB) [Entered: 07/20/2020 02:38 PM]

9 #2

Judge's Order/Opinion

9 #1

Concise Summary of the Case

8 #2

Exhibit A

8 #1

Docketing/Information Statement

#7

(#7) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Corrections Officer Melanie Loatman. on behalf of Appellant Alissa Marie Allen. [20-2411] (AMB) [Entered: 07/16/2020 03:26 PM]

#6

(#6) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from A. Michael Barker on behalf of Appellee(s) Corrections Officer Melanie Loatman. [20-2411] (AMB) [Entered: 07/16/2020 03:24 PM]

#5

(#5) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Stephen D. Holtzman, Esquire on behalf of Appellee(s) Amber Garcia. [20-2411] (SDH) [Entered: 07/15/2020 03:34 PM]

#4

(#4) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jeffrey S. McClain, Esquire on behalf of Appellee(s) Amber Garcia. [20-2411] (JSM) [Entered: 07/15/2020 03:32 PM]

#3

(#3) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Daniel E. Rybeck, Esq. on behalf of Appellee(s) Cumberland County, Warden Robert Balicki, Corrections Officers Michael Puglise, Corrections Officer Richard Serrano, Corrections Officer D. Ortiz, Corrections Officer Michael Fowlkes, Corrections Officer Floyd, Corrections Officer Santos, Ofr Badge # 120. [20-2411] (DER) [Entered: 07/10/2020 12:01 PM]

1 #4

Case Caption

1 #3

District Court Opinion

1 #2

District Court Order

#1

Notice of Appeal

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Notice to Counsel. The attached document is restricted. To view document, click on the document number link in the NDA (Notice of Docket Activity). In order to access this document, you must be the attorney of record using your individual ECF login and password. (TNH) [Entered: 07/20/2020 03:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from John E. Kusturiss, Jr., Esquire on behalf of Appellant(s) Estate of Alissa Allen, Christine (parent). [20-2411] (CJB) [Entered: 07/20/2020 02:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Conrad J. Benedetto, Esquire on behalf of Appellant(s) Estate of Alissa Allen, Christine (parent). [20-2411] (CJB) [Entered: 07/20/2020 02:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellants Alissa Marie Allen and Christine Allen advising this court that no transcripts are available. [20-2411] (CJB) [Entered: 07/20/2020 02:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellants Alissa Marie Allen and Christine Allen. [20-2411] (CJB) [Entered: 07/20/2020 02:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellants Alissa Marie Allen and Christine Allen. [20-2411] (CJB) [Entered: 07/20/2020 02:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Corrections Officer Melanie Loatman. on behalf of Appellant Alissa Marie Allen. [20-2411] (AMB) [Entered: 07/16/2020 03:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from A. Michael Barker on behalf of Appellee(s) Corrections Officer Melanie Loatman. [20-2411] (AMB) [Entered: 07/16/2020 03:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Stephen D. Holtzman, Esquire on behalf of Appellee(s) Amber Garcia. [20-2411] (SDH) [Entered: 07/15/2020 03:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jeffrey S. McClain, Esquire on behalf of Appellee(s) Amber Garcia. [20-2411] (JSM) [Entered: 07/15/2020 03:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Daniel E. Rybeck, Esq. on behalf of Appellee(s) Cumberland County, Warden Robert Balicki, Corrections Officers Michael Puglise, Corrections Officer Richard Serrano, Corrections Officer D. Ortiz, Corrections Officer Michael Fowlkes, Corrections Officer Floyd, Corrections Officer Santos, Ofr Badge # 120. [20-2411] (DER) [Entered: 07/10/2020 12:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • Docket(#2) RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (SB) [Entered: 07/10/2020 10:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellants Alissa Marie Allen and Christine Allen in District Court No. 1-15-cv-06273. (SB) [Entered: 07/10/2020 10:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Melissa Y. Hoffman Esq.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John E. Kusturiss Esq. Jr.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CONRAD J. BENEDETTO