This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/05/2022 at 06:07:35 (UTC).

Alisa Shefke v. Macomb Intermediate School District

Case Summary

On 04/06/2022 Alisa Shefke filed a Civil Right - Education Discrimination lawsuit against Macomb Intermediate School District. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-1283

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Education Discrimination

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

ALISA SHEFKE, as Next Friend of John Doe, a minor

Defendant / Appellee

MACOMB INTERMEDIATE SCHOOL DISTRICT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

David E. Christensen

Steven A. Hicks

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Timothy John Mullins

John Louis Miller

Annabel Frances Shea

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) BRIEFING LETTER SENT by Mediation Office, resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 07/07/2022. appellee brief now due 08/08/2022. (LMR) [Entered: 05/13/2022 05:07 PM]

#19

(#19) VIDEO CONFERENCE: The Mediation conference has been rescheduled for 06/01/2022 at 2:00 PM (ET) with Scott Coburn. [Please open notice for important details.] (LMR) [Entered: 05/13/2022 05:06 PM]

#18

(#18) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Alisa Shefke by David E. Christensen. Certificate of Service: 05/05/2022. [22-1283] (DEC) [Entered: 05/05/2022 09:31 AM]

#17

(#17) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 06/07/2022; appellee brief due 07/07/2022. (MMP) [Entered: 04/28/2022 08:25 AM]

#16

(#16) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Macomb Intermediate School District by Annabel F. Shea. Certificate of Service: 04/27/2022. [22-1283] (AFS) [Entered: 04/27/2022 11:07 AM]

#15

(#15) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. John Louis Miller for Appellee Macomb Intermediate School District Certificate of Service: 04/27/2022. [22-1283] (JLM) [Entered: 04/27/2022 11:01 AM]

#14

(#14) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Macomb Intermediate School District by Timothy J. Mullins. Certificate of Service: 04/27/2022. [22-1283] (TJM) [Entered: 04/27/2022 10:49 AM]

#13

RESTRICTED

#12

(#12) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Macomb Intermediate School District by John L. Miller. Certificate of Service: 04/26/2022. [22-1283] (JLM) [Entered: 04/26/2022 08:39 AM]

#10

RESTRICTED

#9

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

(#7) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Steven A. Hicks for Appellant Alisa Shefke.. Certificate of Service: 04/20/2022. [22-1283] (SAH) [Entered: 04/20/2022 12:08 PM]

#6

(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Steven A. Hicks for Appellant Alisa Shefke Certificate of Service: 04/20/2022. [22-1283] (SAH) [Entered: 04/20/2022 12:02 PM]

#5

(#5) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Alisa Shefke by Steven A. Hicks. Certificate of Service: 04/20/2022. [22-1283] (SAH) [Entered: 04/20/2022 11:58 AM]

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) MEDIATION OFFICE is involved in this appeal. VIDEO CONFERENCE: A Mediation conference has been scheduled for 05/09/2022 at 2:00 PM (ET) with Scott Coburn. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 04/07/2022 01:34 PM]

#1

(#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Alisa Shefke. Transcript needed: n. (MMP) [Entered: 04/06/2022 12:35 PM]

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) BRIEFING LETTER SENT by Mediation Office, resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 07/07/2022. appellee brief now due 08/08/2022. (LMR) [Entered: 05/13/2022 05:07 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) VIDEO CONFERENCE: The Mediation conference has been rescheduled for 06/01/2022 at 2:00 PM (ET) with Scott Coburn. [Please open notice for important details.] (LMR) [Entered: 05/13/2022 05:06 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Alisa Shefke by David E. Christensen. Certificate of Service: 05/05/2022. [22-1283] (DEC) [Entered: 05/05/2022 09:31 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 06/07/2022; appellee brief due 07/07/2022. (MMP) [Entered: 04/28/2022 08:25 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Macomb Intermediate School District by Annabel F. Shea. Certificate of Service: 04/27/2022. [22-1283] (AFS) [Entered: 04/27/2022 11:07 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. John Louis Miller for Appellee Macomb Intermediate School District Certificate of Service: 04/27/2022. [22-1283] (JLM) [Entered: 04/27/2022 11:01 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Macomb Intermediate School District by Timothy J. Mullins. Certificate of Service: 04/27/2022. [22-1283] (TJM) [Entered: 04/27/2022 10:49 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ***LOCKED***APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Macomb Intermediate School District by Timothy J. Mullins. Certificate of Service: 04/27/2022. [22-1283]--[Edited 04/28/2022 by MMP] (TJM) [Entered: 04/27/2022 10:13 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Macomb Intermediate School District by John L. Miller. Certificate of Service: 04/26/2022. [22-1283] (JLM) [Entered: 04/26/2022 08:39 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ***LOCKED - COUNSEL IS ADVISED TO REFILE AS A NON-MODIFIABLE PDF*** APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Macomb Intermediate School District by Annabel F. Shea. Certificate of Service: 04/26/2022. [22-1283]--[Edited 04/27/2022 by MMP] (AFS) [Entered: 04/26/2022 08:36 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ***LOCKED - COUNSEL IS ADVISED TO REFILE AS A NON-MODIFIABLE PDF AND REFILE USING HIS OWN PACER ACCOUNT*** CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. John Louis Miller for Appellee Macomb Intermediate School District Certificate of Service: 04/26/2022. [22-1283]--[Edited 04/27/2022 by MMP] (JLM) [Entered: 04/26/2022 08:23 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ***LOCKED - COUNSEL IS ADVISED TO REFILE AS A NON-MODIFIABLE PDF AND COUNSEL MUST REFILE USING HIS OWN PACER ACCOUNT** APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Macomb Intermediate School District by Timothy J. Mullins. Certificate of Service: 04/26/2022. [22-1283]--[Edited 04/27/2022 by MMP] (JLM) [Entered: 04/26/2022 08:20 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ***LOCKED - COUNSEL IS ADVISED TO REFILE AS A NON-MODIFIABLE PDF*** APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Macomb Intermediate School District by Timothy John Mullins. Certificate of Service: 04/25/2022. [22-1283]--[Edited 04/26/2022 by MMP] (TJM) [Entered: 04/25/2022 05:07 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Steven A. Hicks for Appellant Alisa Shefke.. Certificate of Service: 04/20/2022. [22-1283] (SAH) [Entered: 04/20/2022 12:08 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Steven A. Hicks for Appellant Alisa Shefke Certificate of Service: 04/20/2022. [22-1283] (SAH) [Entered: 04/20/2022 12:02 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Alisa Shefke by Steven A. Hicks. Certificate of Service: 04/20/2022. [22-1283] (SAH) [Entered: 04/20/2022 11:58 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ***LOCKED - COUNSEL IS ADVISED TO REFILE AS A NON-MODIFIABLE PDF*** APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Macomb Intermediate School District by Timothy J. Mullins. Certificate of Service: 04/20/2022. [22-1283]--[Edited 04/21/2022 by MMP] (TC) [Entered: 04/20/2022 10:55 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MEDIATION OFFICE is involved in this appeal. VIDEO CONFERENCE: A Mediation conference has been scheduled for 05/09/2022 at 2:00 PM (ET) with Scott Coburn. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 04/07/2022 01:34 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • Docket(#2) The case manager for this case is: Monica Page (MMP) [Entered: 04/06/2022 12:40 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Alisa Shefke. Transcript needed: n. (MMP) [Entered: 04/06/2022 12:35 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less