This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 09/20/2021 at 06:13:02 (UTC).

Aliign Activation Wear, LLC v. Lululemon Athletica Canada Inc, et al

Case Summary

On 07/22/2021 Aliign Activation Wear, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Lululemon Athletica Canada Inc,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-55775

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

 

Party Details

Appellant

ALIIGN ACTIVATION WEAR, LLC, a California limited liability company

Counter Claimants

LULULEMON ATHLETICA CANADA, INC., a Canadian corporation

LULULEMON USA, INC., a Nevada corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

Charles Avrith Esquire

Attorney at Browne George Ross O'Brien Annaguey & Ellis LLP

2121 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 2800

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Peter Wayne Ross Esquire

Attorney at Browne George Ross O'Brien Annaguey & Ellis LLP

2121 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 2800

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Scott Shaw

Attorney at Merchant & Gould, PC

611 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 808

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Counter Claimant Attorneys

Ali S. Razai

Attorney at Knobbe Martens Olson & Bear LLP

2040 Main Street

Irvine, CA 92614

Craig Steven Summers

Attorney at Knobbe Martens Olson & Bear LLP

2040 Main Street

Irvine, CA 92614

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #4

Case Opening Packet

#2

#4

#5

6 #1

Main Document

6 #2

Additional Document

#7

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2021
  • Docket(#9) Streamlined request [8] by Appellant Aliign Activation Wear, LLC to extend time to file the brief is approved. Amended briefing schedule: Appellant Aliign Activation Wear, LLC opening brief due 10/20/2021. Appellees Lululemon Athletica Canada, Inc. and Lululemon USA, Inc. answering brief due 11/19/2021. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [12217073] (JN) [Entered: 08/31/2021 04:07 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • Docket(#8) Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Opening Brief by Appellant Aliign Activation Wear, LLC. New requested due date is 10/20/2021. [12217045] [21-55775] (Ross, Peter) [Entered: 08/31/2021 03:59 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. All further inquiries regarding this appeal, including request for extensions of time, should be directed to the Clerk's Office. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [12210019] (VS) [Entered: 08/24/2021 12:23 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Received copy of amended notice of appeal from district court. [12197777] (RR) [Entered: 08/10/2021 05:00 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Filed (ECF) Appellant Aliign Activation Wear, LLC Correspondence: APPELLANT'S CERTIFICATE REGARDING TRANSCRIPTS. Date of service: 08/02/2021 [12190095] [21-55775] (Ross, Peter) [Entered: 08/02/2021 10:18 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 08/16/2021, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case name and number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [12189031] (VS) [Entered: 08/02/2021 10:46 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • Docket(#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 07/29/2021. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12187450]. [21-55775] (AD) [Entered: 07/30/2021 06:44 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant Aliign Activation Wear, LLC Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 07/29/2021. [12187393] [21-55775] (Ross, Peter) [Entered: 07/29/2021 07:26 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Aliign Activation Wear, LLC Mediation Questionnaire due on 07/29/2021. Appellant Aliign Activation Wear, LLC opening brief due 09/20/2021. Appellees Lululemon Athletica Canada, Inc. and Lululemon USA, Inc. answering brief due 10/20/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12180113] (JBS) [Entered: 07/22/2021 11:51 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where lululemon usa inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Lululemon Athletica Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ali S Razai

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Craig S Summers