This case was last updated from PACER on 05/31/2019 at 06:09:23 (UTC).

Aliechia Smith v. Mike Deal, et al

Case Summary

On 04/01/2019 Aliechia Smith filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Mike Deal. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-11206

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

DOUG LEWIS, Jesup Police Department, Individually

MIKE DEAL, Individually, and in his official capacity as City Manager of The City of Jesup, Georgia

Plaintiff / Appellant

ALIECHIA SMITH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

David Michael Conner

Attorney at The Conner Law Group, PC

7 E Congress St, Po Box 2388

Savannah, GA 31402

Emily Rose Hancock

Attorney at Brown Readdick Bumgartner Carter Strickland & Watkins, LLP

5 Glynn Ave, Po Box 220

Brunswick, GA 31521-0220

Richard K. Strickland

Attorney at Brown Readdick Bumgartner Carter Strickland & Watkins, LLP

5 Glynn Ave, Po Box 220

Brunswick, GA 31521-0220

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Cameron C. Kuhlman

Attorney at Duffy & Feemster, LLC

340 Eisenhower Dr Ste 800

Savannah, GA 31406

Cameron Crandell Kuhlman

Attorney at Duffy & Feemster, LLC

340 Eisenhower Dr Ste 800

Savannah, GA 31406

 

Court Documents

Open Document

MOTION MOOT: Motion for Leave to File Civil Appeal Statement Out of Time is MOOT [ # 8770590-2 ] due to clerk's dismissal order filed 05/15/2019. Motion filed by Appellant Aliechia Smith. [Entered: 05/15/2019 10:30 AM]

Open Document #2

Appearance of Counsel Form Filed

Open Document #1

DKT-7CIV Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document

ENTRY OF DISMISSAL: Pursuant to the 11th Cir.R. 42-2(c), this appeal is hereby DISMISSED for want of prosecution because the appellant Aliechia Smith has failed to file an appellant's brief within the time fixed by the rules. [Entered: 05/15/2019 10:25 AM]

Open Document #1

Motion filed

Open Document #3

USDC Order- Doc #22

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11206] (ECF: Richard Strickland) [Entered: 04/03/2019 11:13 AM]

Open Document #2

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #1

Appearance of Counsel Form Filed

Open Document

NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Cameron C. Kuhlman for Aliechia Smith. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol CIP via the court's public web-page and have not filed the CIP. Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. **** Attorneys who wish to participate in this appeal must be properly admitted either to the bar of this court or for this particular proceeding pursuant to 11th Cir. R. 46-1. In addition, all attorneys who wish to participate in this appeal must complete and return an appearance form. Applications for Admission to the Bar and Appearance of Counsel Forms are available on the Internet at www.ca11.uscourts.gov. The clerk may not process filings from an attorney until that attorney files an appearance form. See 11th Cir. R. 46-6. [Entered: 04/16/2019 03:47 PM]

Open Document

Attorney Cameron C. Kuhlman for Appellant Aliechia Smith has been notified that upon expiration of fourteen (14) days from this date, this appeal will be dismissed by the clerk without further notice unless the required Civil Appeal Statement has been received. A motion to file the Civil Appeal Statement out of time should be filed at this time with the Civil Appeal Statement attached to the motion as an exhibit. [Entered: 04/17/2019 04:18 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Cameron Crandell Kuhlman for Aliechia Smith. [19-11206] (ECF: Cameron Kuhlman) [Entered: 05/06/2019 04:48 PM]

Open Document #2

Exhibit "A" - Proposed Civil Appeal Statement

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION MOOT: Motion for Leave to File Civil Appeal Statement Out of Time is MOOT [ # 8770590-2 ] due to clerk's dismissal order filed 05/15/2019. Motion filed by Appellant Aliechia Smith. [Entered: 05/15/2019 10:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ENTRY OF DISMISSAL: Pursuant to the 11th Cir.R. 42-2(c), this appeal is hereby DISMISSED for want of prosecution because the appellant Aliechia Smith has failed to file an appellant's brief within the time fixed by the rules. [Entered: 05/15/2019 10:25 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION RENDERED MOOT - MOTION to file a Civil Appeal Statement Out of Time filed by Aliechia Smith. Opposition to Motion is Unknown. [8770590-1] [19-11206]--[Edited 05/13/2019 by CJ] Changed the relief to out of time instead of extension.--[Edited 05/15/2019 by CJ] See dismissal order dated 05/15/2019.--[Edited 05/15/2019 by CJ] (ECF: Cameron Kuhlman) [Entered: 05/13/2019 10:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • Notice of deficient Civil Appeal Statement filed by Cameron Crandell Kuhlman for Aliechia Smith. Document filed without leave of the Court. Counsel must file a motion to file the Civil Appeal Statement out of time with the Civil Appeal Statement attached as an exhibit (per letter dated 04/17/2019). Counsel must file the motion within 3 days. *** Counsel should also file the Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement and complete the Web-Based Stock Tickler Symbol CIP. [Entered: 05/07/2019 09:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • ERROR [Entered: 05/07/2019 09:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Cameron Crandell Kuhlman for Aliechia Smith. [19-11206] (ECF: Cameron Kuhlman) [Entered: 05/06/2019 04:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • ***FILED WITHOUT LEAVE OF COURT*** Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Cameron Crandell Kuhlman for Appellant Aliechia Smith. [19-11206]--[Edited 05/07/2019 by CJ] CAS must be attached to a motion to file out of time. (ECF: Cameron Kuhlman) [Entered: 05/06/2019 04:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Attorney Cameron C. Kuhlman for Appellant Aliechia Smith has been notified that upon expiration of fourteen (14) days from this date, this appeal will be dismissed by the clerk without further notice unless the required Civil Appeal Statement has been received. A motion to file the Civil Appeal Statement out of time should be filed at this time with the Civil Appeal Statement attached to the motion as an exhibit. [Entered: 04/17/2019 04:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Cameron C. Kuhlman for Aliechia Smith. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol CIP via the court's public web-page and have not filed the CIP. Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. **** Attorneys who wish to participate in this appeal must be properly admitted either to the bar of this court or for this particular proceeding pursuant to 11th Cir. R. 46-1. In addition, all attorneys who wish to participate in this appeal must complete and return an appearance form. Applications for Admission to the Bar and Appearance of Counsel Forms are available on the Internet at www.ca11.uscourts.gov. The clerk may not process filings from an attorney until that attorney files an appearance form. See 11th Cir. R. 46-6. [Entered: 04/16/2019 03:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11206] (ECF: Richard Strickland) [Entered: 04/03/2019 11:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Richard K. Strickland for Mike Deal and Doug Lewis and Emily Rose Hancock for Mike Deal and Doug Lewis. [19-11206] (ECF: Richard Strickland) [Entered: 04/03/2019 11:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Aliechia Smith on 03/29/2019. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 05/13/2019. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 04/15/2019 as to Appellant Aliechia Smith. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 04/29/2019 as to Appellee Mike Deal [Entered: 04/02/2019 11:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.