This case was last updated from PACER on 06/02/2019 at 06:09:34 (UTC).

Alice Westbrook v. NASA Federal Credit Union, et al

Case Summary

On 04/03/2019 Alice Westbrook filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against NASA Federal Credit Union. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-11292

  • Filing Date:

    04/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

TWENTY 4 SEVEN RECOVERY INC.

TWENTY FOUR SEVEN TOWING AND RECOVERY LLC

NASA FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

Plaintiff / Appellant

ALICE WESTBROOK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Rachelle E. Sanchez

Attorney at Lightfoot Franklin & White, LLC

400 20Th St N

Birmingham, AL 35126

Sanford G. Hooper

Attorney at Lightfoot Franklin & White, LLC

400 20Th St N

Birmingham, AL 35126

Chad W. Bryan

Attorney at Capell & Howard, PC

150 S Perry St, Po Box 2069

Montgomery, AL 36104

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Wallace Whitney Seals

Attorney at Pate & Cochrun, LLP

Po Box 10448

Birmingham, AL 35202-0448

John Hubbard

Attorney at Frazer Hubbard Brandt Trask & Yacavone, LLP

595 Main St

Dunedin, FL 34698-4998

John Crad Hubbard

Attorney at John C Hubbard LLC

Po Box 953

Birminham, AL 35203

W. Whitney Seals

Attorney at Cochrun & Seals, LLC

Po Box 10448

Birmingham, AL 35202-0448

 

Court Documents

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by W. Whitney Seals for Alice Westbrook. [19-11292] (ECF: W. Seals) [Entered: 05/22/2019 11:59 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by John C. Hubbard for Alice Westbrook [19-11292] (ECF: John Hubbard) [Entered: 05/21/2019 05:29 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Sanford G. Hooper for Appellee Twenty 4 Seven Recovery Inc.. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11292] (ECF: Sanford Hooper) [Entered: 05/08/2019 04:11 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Chad W. Bryan for NASA Federal Credit Union Attorney Chad W. Bryan for Appellee NASA Federal Credit Union. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11292] (ECF: Chad Bryan) [Entered: 05/01/2019 09:13 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by [19-11292] (ECF: Rachelle Sanchez) [Entered: 04/24/2019 03:03 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Sanford G. Hooper for Twenty 4 Seven Recovery Inc.. [19-11292] (ECF: Sanford Hooper) [Entered: 04/24/2019 02:01 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Chad W. Bryan for NASA Federal Credit Union Chad W. Bryan for NASA Federal Credit Union. [19-11292] (ECF: Chad Bryan) [Entered: 04/24/2019 11:16 AM]

Open Document

Briefing Notice issued to Appellant Alice Westbrook and Appellees NASA Federal Credit Union, Twenty 4 Seven Recovery Inc. and Twenty Four Seven Towing and Recovery LLC. The appellant's brief is due on or before 05/28/2019. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 04/16/2019 08:26 AM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Wallace Whitney Seals for Appellant Alice Westbrook. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11292] (ECF: W. Seals) [Entered: 04/15/2019 12:14 PM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Wallace Whitney Seals for Appellant Alice Westbrook. No hearings. [19-11292] (ECF: W. Seals) [Entered: 04/15/2019 12:11 PM]

Open Document

Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Wallace Whitney Seals for Appellant Alice Westbrook. [19-11292] (ECF: W. Seals) [Entered: 04/15/2019 12:08 PM]

Open Document #5

DC Order Doc 49

Open Document #4

DC Memorandum Opinion Doc 27

Open Document #3

DC Memorandum Opinion Doc 48

Open Document #2

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #1

DKT-2 Notice to Counsel/Parties

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by W. Whitney Seals for Alice Westbrook. [19-11292] (ECF: W. Seals) [Entered: 05/22/2019 11:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • ***DOCKETED IN ERROR***Appearance of counsel form has not been processed. According to our records, John Hubbard for Alice Westbrook is not a member of the Eleventh Circuit bar. The appearance of counsel form has not been processed allowing fourteen days to complete and return the required application for admission.--[Edited 05/22/2019 by BWH] [Entered: 05/22/2019 09:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by John C. Hubbard for Alice Westbrook [19-11292] (ECF: John Hubbard) [Entered: 05/21/2019 05:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Sanford G. Hooper for Appellee Twenty 4 Seven Recovery Inc.. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11292] (ECF: Sanford Hooper) [Entered: 05/08/2019 04:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Chad W. Bryan for NASA Federal Credit Union Attorney Chad W. Bryan for Appellee NASA Federal Credit Union. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11292] (ECF: Chad Bryan) [Entered: 05/01/2019 09:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by [19-11292] (ECF: Rachelle Sanchez) [Entered: 04/24/2019 03:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Sanford G. Hooper for Twenty 4 Seven Recovery Inc.. [19-11292] (ECF: Sanford Hooper) [Entered: 04/24/2019 02:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Chad W. Bryan for NASA Federal Credit Union Chad W. Bryan for NASA Federal Credit Union. [19-11292] (ECF: Chad Bryan) [Entered: 04/24/2019 11:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Briefing Notice issued to Appellant Alice Westbrook and Appellees NASA Federal Credit Union, Twenty 4 Seven Recovery Inc. and Twenty Four Seven Towing and Recovery LLC. The appellant's brief is due on or before 05/28/2019. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 04/16/2019 08:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Wallace Whitney Seals for Appellant Alice Westbrook. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11292] (ECF: W. Seals) [Entered: 04/15/2019 12:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Wallace Whitney Seals for Appellant Alice Westbrook. No hearings. [19-11292] (ECF: W. Seals) [Entered: 04/15/2019 12:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Wallace Whitney Seals for Appellant Alice Westbrook. [19-11292] (ECF: W. Seals) [Entered: 04/15/2019 12:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Alice Westbrook on 04/02/2019. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 04/17/2019 as to Appellant Alice Westbrook. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 05/01/2019 as to Appellee NASA Federal Credit Union [Entered: 04/10/2019 10:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less