This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2019 at 06:06:14 (UTC).

Alfredo Quintero v. Geico Marine Insurance Co.

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 Alfredo Quintero filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Geico Marine Insurance Co. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-12734

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellee

GEICO MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY

Plaintiff / Appellant

ALFREDO QUINTERO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Jack Roy Reiter

Attorney at GrayRobinson, PA

333 Se 2Nd Ave Ste 3200

Miami, FL 33131

Lesley-Anne Marks

Attorney at GrayRobinson, PA

1795 W Nasa Blvd

Melbourne, FL 32940

Michael A. Packer

Attorney at Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman & Goggin, PC

100 Ne 3Rd Ave Ste 1100

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301-1827

Ted Livingston Shinkle

Attorney at GrayRobinson, PA

1795 W Nasa Blvd

Melbourne, FL 32940

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Jose P. Font

Attorney at Font & Nelson, PLLC

200 S Andrews Ave Ste 501

Ft Lauderdale, FL 33301

Douglas H. Stein

Attorney at Law Offices of Douglas H. Stein, PA

1200 Brickell Ave Ste 2000

Miami, FL 33131

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Appendix filed [VOLUME 2 of 2] by Appellant Alfredo Quintero. [19-12734] --[Edited 09/11/2019 by GF] (ECF: Douglas Stein) [Entered: 09/09/2019 09:51 AM]

Open Document

Appendix filed [VOLUME 1 of 2] by Appellant Alfredo Quintero. [19-12734] --[Edited 09/11/2019 by GF] (ECF: Douglas Stein) [Entered: 09/09/2019 09:49 AM]

Open Document

Appellant's brief filed by Alfredo Quintero. [19-12734] (ECF: Douglas Stein) [Entered: 09/09/2019 06:31 AM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Jack Roy Reiter for Appellee Geico Marine Insurance Company. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-12734] (ECF: Jack Reiter) [Entered: 08/13/2019 02:14 PM]

Open Document

Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Douglas H. Stein for Appellant Alfredo Quintero. [19-12734] (ECF: Douglas Stein) [Entered: 07/31/2019 06:03 AM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-12734] (ECF: Douglas Stein) [Entered: 07/31/2019 06:02 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Douglas H. Stein for Alfredo Quintero Jose P. Font for Alfredo Quintero and Lesley-Anne Marks for Geico Marine Insurance Company, Michael A. Packer for Geico Marine Insurance Company, Jack Roy Reiter for Geico Marine Insurance Company and Ted Livingston Shinkle for Geico Marine Insurance Company. [19-12734] (ECF: Douglas Stein) [Entered: 07/30/2019 10:28 AM]

Open Document #2

Civil Appeal Statement

Open Document #1

Certificate of Interested Persons

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Lesley Anne Marks for GEICO Marine Insurance Company [19-12734] (ECF: Lesley-Anne Marks) [Entered: 07/24/2019 08:57 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Theodore Shinkle for GEICO Marine Insurance Company [19-12734] (ECF: Ted Shinkle) [Entered: 07/23/2019 04:38 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jack Reiter for GEICO Marine Insurance Company [19-12734] (ECF: Jack Reiter) [Entered: 07/23/2019 04:02 PM]

Open Document #5

DC Order Appealed Document No. 63

Open Document #4

DC Judgment Appealed Document No. 54

Open Document #3

DC Order Appealed Document No. 53

Open Document #2

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2019
  • Received paper copies of EAppendix filed by Appellant Alfredo Quintero. 2 VOLUMES - 2 COPIES [Entered: 09/11/2019 10:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • Received paper copies of EBrief filed by Appellant Alfredo Quintero. [Entered: 09/11/2019 10:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Appendix filed [VOLUME 2 of 2] by Appellant Alfredo Quintero. [19-12734] --[Edited 09/11/2019 by GF] (ECF: Douglas Stein) [Entered: 09/09/2019 09:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Appendix filed [VOLUME 1 of 2] by Appellant Alfredo Quintero. [19-12734] --[Edited 09/11/2019 by GF] (ECF: Douglas Stein) [Entered: 09/09/2019 09:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Appellant's brief filed by Alfredo Quintero. [19-12734] (ECF: Douglas Stein) [Entered: 09/09/2019 06:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • Over the phone extension granted by clerk as to Attorney Douglas H. Stein for Appellant Alfredo Quintero. Appellants brief due on 09/09/2019 as to Appellant Alfredo Quintero. Appendix due on 09/16/2019 as to Appellant Alfredo Quintero. [Entered: 08/21/2019 10:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Jack Roy Reiter for Appellee Geico Marine Insurance Company. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-12734] (ECF: Jack Reiter) [Entered: 08/13/2019 02:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Douglas H. Stein for Appellant Alfredo Quintero. [19-12734] (ECF: Douglas Stein) [Entered: 07/31/2019 06:03 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-12734] (ECF: Douglas Stein) [Entered: 07/31/2019 06:02 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • Notice of deficient filings by Douglas H. Stein for Alfredo Quintero. The CIP and civil appeal statement must be docketed using separate entries. Please file these documents again within three days of this date. [Entered: 07/30/2019 02:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Douglas H. Stein for Alfredo Quintero Jose P. Font for Alfredo Quintero and Lesley-Anne Marks for Geico Marine Insurance Company, Michael A. Packer for Geico Marine Insurance Company, Jack Roy Reiter for Geico Marine Insurance Company and Ted Livingston Shinkle for Geico Marine Insurance Company. [19-12734] (ECF: Douglas Stein) [Entered: 07/30/2019 10:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Douglas H. Stein representng Appellant. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-12734] (ECF: Douglas Stein) [Entered: 07/30/2019 09:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Lesley Anne Marks for GEICO Marine Insurance Company [19-12734] (ECF: Lesley-Anne Marks) [Entered: 07/24/2019 08:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Theodore Shinkle for GEICO Marine Insurance Company [19-12734] (ECF: Ted Shinkle) [Entered: 07/23/2019 04:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jack Reiter for GEICO Marine Insurance Company [19-12734] (ECF: Jack Reiter) [Entered: 07/23/2019 04:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Alfredo Quintero on 07/16/2019. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 08/26/2019. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 07/30/2019 as to Appellant Alfredo Quintero. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 08/13/2019 as to Appellee Geico Marine Insurance Company [Entered: 07/22/2019 12:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less