This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/06/2021 at 06:11:15 (UTC).

Alfred Bouchard, et al v. 3M Company, et al

Case Summary

On 10/07/2021 Alfred Bouchard filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against 3M Company. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-3252

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellees

Alfred Bouchard

Ramon Verdugo

Defendant / Appellants

3M Company

Aearo Technologies LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Matthew James Barber

Attorney at SCHWEBEL & GOETZ

5120 Ids Center, 80 S. Eighth Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402-2246

Daniel E. Gustafson

Attorney at GUSTAFSON & GLUEK

Suite 2600, 120 S. Sixth Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402-0000

Alicia N. Sieben

Attorney at SCHWEBEL & GOETZ

5120 Ids Center, 80 S. Eighth Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402-2246

William R. Sieben

Attorney at SCHWEBEL & GOETZ

5120 Ids Center, 80 S. Eighth Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402-2246

Amanda M. Williams

Attorney at GUSTAFSON & GLUEK

Suite 2600, 120 S. Sixth Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402-0000

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Jerry Blackwell

Attorney at BLACKWELL & BURKE

Suite 2500, 431 S. Seventh Street

Minneapolis, MN 55415

Benjamin Winters Hulse

Attorney at BLACKWELL & BURKE

Suite 2500, 431 S. Seventh Street

Minneapolis, MN 55415

Andrew Crowder

Attorney at BLACKWELL & BURKE

Suite 2500, 431 S. Seventh Street

Minneapolis, MN 55415

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Benjamin W. Hulse for Appellants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC w/service 10/18/2021 [5088143] [21-3252] (BWH) [Entered: 10/18/2021 10:39 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Andrew J. Crowder for Appellants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC w/service 10/18/2021 [5088145] [21-3252] (BWH) [Entered: 10/18/2021 10:40 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Jerry W. Blackwell for Appellants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC w/service 10/18/2021 [5088146] [21-3252] (BWH) [Entered: 10/18/2021 10:42 AM]

Open Document

STIPULATION for dismissal filed by Appellants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC. w/service 11/09/2021 [5096256] [21-3252] (BWH) [Entered: 11/09/2021 03:29 PM]

Open Document

JUDGMENT FILED - The stipulation of dismissal [ # 5096256-2 ] is granted. The case is dismissed in accordance with Rule 42(b), Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. Mandate shall issue forthwith. [5096698] [21-3252] (NDG) [Entered: 11/10/2021 03:52 PM]

Open Document

MANDATE ISSUED. [5096702] [21-3252] (NDG) [Entered: 11/10/2021 03:53 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMANDATE ISSUED. [5096702] [21-3252] (NDG) [Entered: 11/10/2021 03:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT FILED - The stipulation of dismissal [ # 5096256-2 ] is granted. The case is dismissed in accordance with Rule 42(b), Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. Mandate shall issue forthwith. [5096698] [21-3252] (NDG) [Entered: 11/10/2021 03:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION for dismissal filed by Appellants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC. w/service 11/09/2021 [5096256] [21-3252] (BWH) [Entered: 11/09/2021 03:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Jerry W. Blackwell for Appellants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC w/service 10/18/2021 [5088146] [21-3252] (BWH) [Entered: 10/18/2021 10:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Andrew J. Crowder for Appellants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC w/service 10/18/2021 [5088145] [21-3252] (BWH) [Entered: 10/18/2021 10:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Benjamin W. Hulse for Appellants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC w/service 10/18/2021 [5088143] [21-3252] (BWH) [Entered: 10/18/2021 10:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Daniel E. Gustafson for Appellees Alfred Bouchard and Ramon Verdugo w/service 10/08/2021 [5085519] [21-3252] (DEG) [Entered: 10/08/2021 02:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK LETTER sent to hold case in abeyance. [5085346] [21-3238, 21-3240, 21-3242, 21-3245, 21-3246, 21-3249, 21-3251, 21-3252] (MMH) [Entered: 10/08/2021 11:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSOLIDATED BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Appendix due on 11/16/2021. BRIEF OF APPELLANT 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC due 11/16/2021. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [5085094] [21-3238, 21-3240, 21-3242, 21-3245, 21-3246, 21-3249, 21-3251, 21-3252] (MMH) [Entered: 10/07/2021 03:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, and Judgment 9/21/21 [5084978] [21-3252] (MMH) [Entered: 10/07/2021 12:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case docketed. [5084973] [21-3252] (MMH) [Entered: 10/07/2021 12:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 3M COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew Crowder

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jerry Blackwell