This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 09/22/2019 at 06:02:09 (UTC).

Alexandre Solomakha, et al v. Safety International, LLC

Case Summary

On 07/24/2019 Alexandre Solomakha filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Safety International, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-2395

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellees

ALEXANDRIA TRANSPORTATIONS, INC.

ALEXANDRE SOLOMAKHA

ALEX EXPRESS, LLC

Defendant / Appellant

SAFETY INTERNATIONAL, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorney

Lori A. Vanderlaan

Attorney at BEST, VANDERLAAN & HARRINGTON

25 E. Washington Street

Chicago, IL 60602-0000

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

David P. Bub

Attorney at BROWN & JAMES, P.C.

800 Market Street

St. Louis, MO 63101-2501

Brandon B. Copeland

Attorney at BROWN & JAMES, P.C.

800 Market Street

St. Louis, MO 63101-2501

Kelsey McLean

Attorney at BROWN & JAMES, P.C.

800 Market Street

St. Louis, MO 63101-2501

 

Court Documents

#22

(#22) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Kelsey L. McLean for Appellee Safety International, LLC in 19-2414, Appellant Safety International, LLC in 19-2395. [22] [7025355] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [19-2414, 19-2395] (McLean, Kelsey) [Entered: 08/22/2019 04:07 PM]

#21

(#21) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Kelsey L. McLean for Appellant Safety International, LLC in 19-2395, Appellee Safety International, LLC in 19-2414. [21] [7025353] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [19-2395, 19-2414] [Edited 08/22/2019 by AG to reflect addition of counsel] (McLean, Kelsey) [Entered: 08/22/2019 04:04 PM]

#20

(#20) ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Main appeal brief due on or before 10/25/2019 for Alex Express, LLC, Alexandria Transportations, Inc. and Alexandre Solomakha. Appellee Cross-Appellant brief due on or before 11/25/2019 for Safety International, LLC. Appellant Reply Cross-Appellee brief due by 12/26/2019 for Appellees Alex Express, LLC, Alexandria Transportations, Inc. and Alexandre Solomakha. Reply Brief in Cross Appeal due by 01/27/2020 for Appellant Safety International, LLC RJS [7023549] [19-2414, 19-2395] (AP) [Entered: 08/14/2019 10:49 AM]

#19

(#19) ORDER: The court orders these appeals CONSOLIDATED for purposes of briefing and disposition: Main appeal brief due on or before 09/23/2019 for Alex Express, LLC, Alexandria Transportations, Inc. and Alexandre Solomakha. Appellee Cross-Appellant brief due on or before 10/21/2019 for Safety International, LLC. Appellant Reply Cross-Appellee brief due by 11/21/2019 for Appellees Alex Express, LLC, Alexandria Transportations, Inc. and Alexandre Solomakha. Reply Brief in Cross Appeal due by 12/23/2019 for Appellant Safety International, LLC. DW [19] [7023404] [19-2414, 19-2395] (ER) [Entered: 08/13/2019 03:35 PM]

#5

(#5) Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Safety International, LLC. Prior or Related proceedings: Yes. 19-2378 and 19-2414 [5] [7020657] [19-2395] (Copeland, Brandon) [Entered: 07/31/2019 09:59 AM]

#19

(#18) ORDER re: This appeal is DISMISSED as unnecessary. (See order for further details) Diane P. Wood, Chief Circuit Judge; William J. Bauer, Circuit Judge and Amy J. St. Eve, Circuit Judge. [18] [7023354] [19-2378] (PS) [Entered: 08/13/2019 02:29 PM]

#18

(#17) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Lori A. Vanderlaan for Appellees Alex Express, LLC, Alexandria Transportations, Inc. and Alexandre Solomakha in 19-2395. [17] [7022245] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [19-2395, 19-2378, 19-2414] (Vanderlaan, Lori) [Entered: 08/07/2019 02:32 PM]

#17

(#16) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Lori A. Vanderlaan for Appellees Alex Express, LLC, Alexandria Transportations, Inc. and Alexandre Solomakha in 19-2395. [16] [7022242] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [19-2395, 19-2378, 19-2414] (Vanderlaan, Lori) [Entered: 08/07/2019 02:25 PM]

#16

(#15) Amended Jurisdictional memorandum filed by Appellants Alex Express, LLC, Alexandria Transportations, Inc. and Alexandre Solomakha in 19-2414, 19-2378. [15] [7022238] [19-2414, 19-2378, 19-2395] (Vanderlaan, Lori) [Entered: 08/07/2019 02:18 PM]

#14

(#13) ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Main appeal brief due on or before 09/20/2019 for Alex Express, LLC, Alexandria Transportations, Inc. and Alexandre Solomakha. Appellee Cross-Appellant brief due on or before 10/21/2019 for Safety International, LLC. Appellant Reply Cross-Appellee brief due by 11/20/2019 for Appellants Alex Express, LLC, Alexandria Transportations, Inc. and Alexandre Solomakha. Reply Brief in Cross Appeal due by 12/11/2019 for Appellant Safety International, LLC RJS [7021820] [19-2378, 19-2395, 19-2414] (FP) [Entered: 08/06/2019 09:40 AM]

#2

(#2) ORDER: The court orders these appeals CONSOLIDATED for purposes of briefing and disposition: Main appeal brief due on or before 08/28/2019 for Alex Express, LLC, Alexandria Transportations, Inc. and Alexandre Solomakha. Appellee Cross-Appellant brief due on or before 09/27/2019 for Safety International, LLC. Appellant Reply Cross-Appellee brief due by 10/28/2019 for Appellants Alex Express, LLC, Alexandria Transportations, Inc. and Alexandre Solomakha. Reply Brief in Cross Appeal due by 11/18/2019 for Appellant Safety International, LLC. DW [2] [7020005] [19-2378, 19-2395] (CG) [Entered: 07/29/2019 08:05 AM]

#9

(#7) Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellants/Cross-Appellees Alex Express, LLC, Alexandria Transportations, Inc. and Alexandre Solomakha in 19-2378, 19-2395 & 19-2414. [7] [7021037] [19-2378, 19-2395, 19-2414] (JR) [Entered: 08/01/2019 11:58 AM]

#8

(#6) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Lori A. Vanderlaan for Appellants Alex Express, LLC, Alexandria Transportations, Inc. and Alexandre Solomakha in 19-2414, 19-2378. [6] [7020785] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [19-2414, 19-2378, 19-2395] (Vanderlaan, Lori) [Entered: 07/31/2019 02:46 PM]

#6

(#4) Filed Certificate of Service to Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement filed on 07/30/2019 by Appellant Safety International, LLC in 19-2395, Appellee Safety International, LLC in 19-2378, 19-2414. [4] [7020606] [19-2395, 19-2378, 19-2414] (Copeland, Brandon) [Entered: 07/30/2019 06:58 PM]

#5

(#3) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Brandon B. Copeland for Appellant Safety International, LLC in 19-2395, Appellee Safety International, LLC in 19-2378, 19-2414. [3] [7020604] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [19-2395, 19-2378, 19-2414] [Edited 07/31/2019 by CAG to reflect the addition of counsel.] (Copeland, Brandon) [Entered: 07/30/2019 06:20 PM]

1 #3

Notice to District Court

1 #2

Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing

#1

Civil Case

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Kelsey L. McLean for Appellee Safety International, LLC in 19-2414, Appellant Safety International, LLC in 19-2395. [22] [7025355] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [19-2414, 19-2395] (McLean, Kelsey) [Entered: 08/22/2019 04:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Kelsey L. McLean for Appellant Safety International, LLC in 19-2395, Appellee Safety International, LLC in 19-2414. [21] [7025353] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [19-2395, 19-2414] [Edited 08/22/2019 by AG to reflect addition of counsel] (McLean, Kelsey) [Entered: 08/22/2019 04:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Main appeal brief due on or before 10/25/2019 for Alex Express, LLC, Alexandria Transportations, Inc. and Alexandre Solomakha. Appellee Cross-Appellant brief due on or before 11/25/2019 for Safety International, LLC. Appellant Reply Cross-Appellee brief due by 12/26/2019 for Appellees Alex Express, LLC, Alexandria Transportations, Inc. and Alexandre Solomakha. Reply Brief in Cross Appeal due by 01/27/2020 for Appellant Safety International, LLC RJS [7023549] [19-2414, 19-2395] (AP) [Entered: 08/14/2019 10:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ORDER: The court orders these appeals CONSOLIDATED for purposes of briefing and disposition: Main appeal brief due on or before 09/23/2019 for Alex Express, LLC, Alexandria Transportations, Inc. and Alexandre Solomakha. Appellee Cross-Appellant brief due on or before 10/21/2019 for Safety International, LLC. Appellant Reply Cross-Appellee brief due by 11/21/2019 for Appellees Alex Express, LLC, Alexandria Transportations, Inc. and Alexandre Solomakha. Reply Brief in Cross Appeal due by 12/23/2019 for Appellant Safety International, LLC. DW [19] [7023404] [19-2414, 19-2395] (ER) [Entered: 08/13/2019 03:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ORDER re: This appeal is DISMISSED as unnecessary. (See order for further details) Diane P. Wood, Chief Circuit Judge; William J. Bauer, Circuit Judge and Amy J. St. Eve, Circuit Judge. [18] [7023354] [19-2378] (PS) [Entered: 08/13/2019 02:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Lori A. Vanderlaan for Appellees Alex Express, LLC, Alexandria Transportations, Inc. and Alexandre Solomakha in 19-2395. [17] [7022245] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [19-2395, 19-2378, 19-2414] (Vanderlaan, Lori) [Entered: 08/07/2019 02:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Lori A. Vanderlaan for Appellees Alex Express, LLC, Alexandria Transportations, Inc. and Alexandre Solomakha in 19-2395. [16] [7022242] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [19-2395, 19-2378, 19-2414] (Vanderlaan, Lori) [Entered: 08/07/2019 02:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Amended Jurisdictional memorandum filed by Appellants Alex Express, LLC, Alexandria Transportations, Inc. and Alexandre Solomakha in 19-2414, 19-2378. [15] [7022238] [19-2414, 19-2378, 19-2395] (Vanderlaan, Lori) [Entered: 08/07/2019 02:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Main appeal brief due on or before 09/20/2019 for Alex Express, LLC, Alexandria Transportations, Inc. and Alexandre Solomakha. Appellee Cross-Appellant brief due on or before 10/21/2019 for Safety International, LLC. Appellant Reply Cross-Appellee brief due by 11/20/2019 for Appellants Alex Express, LLC, Alexandria Transportations, Inc. and Alexandre Solomakha. Reply Brief in Cross Appeal due by 12/11/2019 for Appellant Safety International, LLC RJS [7021820] [19-2378, 19-2395, 19-2414] (FP) [Entered: 08/06/2019 09:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted by phone, Tuesday, August 20, 2019 at 9:30 p.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. RJS. [12] [7021811] [19-2414, 19-2378, 19-2395] (FP) [Entered: 08/06/2019 09:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Brandon Copeland for Appellee Safety International, LLC in 19-2414, 19-2378. [9] [7021504] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [19-2414, 19-2378, 19-2395] (Copeland, Brandon) [Entered: 08/05/2019 11:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Brandon B. Copeland for Appellee Safety International, LLC in 19-2378, 19-2414. [8] [7021501] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [19-2378, 19-2395, 19-2414] [Edited 08/05/2019 by AG to reflect addition of counsel] (Copeland, Brandon) [Entered: 08/05/2019 11:14 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellee/Cross-Appellant Safety International, LLC in 19-2378, 19-2395 & 19-2414. [14] [7022062] [19-2378, 19-2395, 19-2414] (JR) [Entered: 08/07/2019 09:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellants/Cross-Appellees Alex Express, LLC, Alexandria Transportations, Inc. and Alexandre Solomakha in 19-2378, 19-2395 & 19-2414. [7] [7021037] [19-2378, 19-2395, 19-2414] (JR) [Entered: 08/01/2019 11:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Lori A. Vanderlaan for Appellants Alex Express, LLC, Alexandria Transportations, Inc. and Alexandre Solomakha in 19-2414, 19-2378. [6] [7020785] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [19-2414, 19-2378, 19-2395] (Vanderlaan, Lori) [Entered: 07/31/2019 02:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Safety International, LLC. Prior or Related proceedings: Yes. 19-2378 and 19-2414 [5] [7020657] [19-2395] (Copeland, Brandon) [Entered: 07/31/2019 09:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Filed Certificate of Service to Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement filed on 07/30/2019 by Appellant Safety International, LLC in 19-2395, Appellee Safety International, LLC in 19-2378, 19-2414. [4] [7020606] [19-2395, 19-2378, 19-2414] (Copeland, Brandon) [Entered: 07/30/2019 06:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Brandon B. Copeland for Appellant Safety International, LLC in 19-2395, Appellee Safety International, LLC in 19-2378, 19-2414. [3] [7020604] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [19-2395, 19-2378, 19-2414] [Edited 07/31/2019 by CAG to reflect the addition of counsel.] (Copeland, Brandon) [Entered: 07/30/2019 06:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER: The court orders these appeals CONSOLIDATED for purposes of briefing and disposition: Main appeal brief due on or before 08/28/2019 for Alex Express, LLC, Alexandria Transportations, Inc. and Alexandre Solomakha. Appellee Cross-Appellant brief due on or before 09/27/2019 for Safety International, LLC. Appellant Reply Cross-Appellee brief due by 10/28/2019 for Appellants Alex Express, LLC, Alexandria Transportations, Inc. and Alexandre Solomakha. Reply Brief in Cross Appeal due by 11/18/2019 for Appellant Safety International, LLC. DW [2] [7020005] [19-2378, 19-2395] (CG) [Entered: 07/29/2019 08:05 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Safety International, LLC by 07/30/2019. Transcript information sheet due by 08/07/2019. Appellant's brief due on or before 09/03/2019 for Safety International, LLC [1] [7019190] [19-2395] (ER) [Entered: 07/24/2019 12:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kelsey Leigh McLean

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David P. Bub