This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2019 at 06:03:13 (UTC).

Alexander Keaton v. Superintendent Greene SCI, et al

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 Alexander Keaton filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Superintendent Greene SCI. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-2633

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

ALEXANDER G. KEATON

Bellefonte, PA 16823

Defendant / Appellees

ATTORNEY GENERAL PENNSYLVANIA

DISTRICT ATTORNEY PHILADELPHIA

SUPERINTENDENT GREENE SCI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Patrick J. Egan Esq.

Attorney at Fox Rothschild

2000 Market Street, 20Th Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Alexander G. Keaton

Attorney at Benner Township SCI

301 Institution Drive

Bellefonte, PA 16823

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Catherine B. Kiefer Esq.

Attorney at Philadelphia County Office of District Attorney

3 South Penn Square

Philadelphia, PA 19107

Ronald Eisenberg Esq.

Attorney at Office of Attorney General of Pennsylvania

1600 Arch Street, Suite 300

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Max C. Kaufman Esq.

Attorney at Philadelphia County Office of District Attorney

3 South Penn Square

Philadelphia, PA 19107

 

Court Documents

Open Document

ECF FILER: Memorandum in Support of motion to expand certificate of appealibility on behalf of Appellant Alexander G. Keaton, filed. Certificate of Service dated 08/29/2019. Service made by ECF. [19-2633] (PJE) [Entered: 08/29/2019 02:14 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: Motion filed by Appellant Alexander G. Keaton to expand certificate appealability. Certificate of Service dated 08/29/2019. Service made by ECF. [19-2633] (PJE) [Entered: 08/29/2019 02:12 PM]

Open Document

STATE COURT RECORD returned. One box. (SJB) [Entered: 08/02/2019 01:39 PM]

Open Restricted Document #5

Record Received

Open Restricted Document #4

Record Received

Open Restricted Document #2

Record Received

Open Restricted Document #3

Record Received

Open Restricted Document #7

Record Received

Open Restricted Document #6

Record Received

Open Restricted Document #8

Record Received

Open Restricted Document #1

Record Received

Open Document

ORDER (Clerk) Motion for extension of time to file application for certificate of appealability filed by Appellant Alexander G. Keaton is granted. Appellant's application for a certificate of appealability must be filed within 30 days of the date of this order, filed. (TMM) [Entered: 07/31/2019 04:28 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: UNOPPOSED Motion filed by Appellant Alexander G. Keaton for Extension of Time to file Certificate of Appealability until/for 30 days. Certificate of Service dated 07/29/2019. Service made by ECF. [19-2633] (PJE) [Entered: 07/29/2019 02:00 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Catherine B. Kiefer on behalf of Appellee(s) Supt. Greene SCI; District Attorney of the County of Philadelphia; Attorney General of the State of Pennsylvania. [19-2633] (CBK) [Entered: 07/18/2019 10:27 AM]

Open Document

LEGAL DIVISION LETTER SENT advising that the case will be submitted to a panel of this Court for a decision on the issuance of certificate of appealability. (MW) [Entered: 07/17/2019 03:24 PM]

Open Document #6

Civil Counsel Habeas Letter

Open Document #5

Standing Order

Open Document #4

caption

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: Memorandum in Support of motion to expand certificate of appealibility on behalf of Appellant Alexander G. Keaton, filed. Certificate of Service dated 08/29/2019. Service made by ECF. [19-2633] (PJE) [Entered: 08/29/2019 02:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: Motion filed by Appellant Alexander G. Keaton to expand certificate appealability. Certificate of Service dated 08/29/2019. Service made by ECF. [19-2633] (PJE) [Entered: 08/29/2019 02:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATE COURT RECORD returned. One box. (SJB) [Entered: 08/02/2019 01:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RECORD received. One box. (SJB) [Entered: 08/02/2019 01:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER (Clerk) Motion for extension of time to file application for certificate of appealability filed by Appellant Alexander G. Keaton is granted. Appellant's application for a certificate of appealability must be filed within 30 days of the date of this order, filed. (TMM) [Entered: 07/31/2019 04:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: UNOPPOSED Motion filed by Appellant Alexander G. Keaton for Extension of Time to file Certificate of Appealability until/for 30 days. Certificate of Service dated 07/29/2019. Service made by ECF. [19-2633] (PJE) [Entered: 07/29/2019 02:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Catherine B. Kiefer on behalf of Appellee(s) Supt. Greene SCI; District Attorney of the County of Philadelphia; Attorney General of the State of Pennsylvania. [19-2633] (CBK) [Entered: 07/18/2019 10:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • LEGAL DIVISION LETTER SENT advising that the case will be submitted to a panel of this Court for a decision on the issuance of certificate of appealability. (MW) [Entered: 07/17/2019 03:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • PARTIAL RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF.--[Edited 07/17/2019 by TMM] (TMM) [Entered: 07/16/2019 10:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Alexander G. Keaton in District Court No. 2-11-cv-07225. (TMM) [Entered: 07/16/2019 10:02 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.