Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 06/13/2021 at 06:16:52 (UTC).

Alex Morgan, et al v. United States Soccer Federatio

Case Summary

On 04/14/2021 Alex Morgan filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against United States Soccer Federatio. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-55356

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

ALEX MORGAN

MALLORY PUGH

MEGAN RAPINOE

MORGAN BRIAN

DANIELLE COLAPRICO

CHRISTEN PRESS

CASEY SHORT

LINDSEY HORAN

JANE CAMPBELL

ASHLYN HARRIS

SAMANTHA MEWIS

ABBY DAHLKEMPER

MCCALL ZERBONI, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated

ROSE LAVELLE

TOBIN HEATH

KELLEY O'HARA

ALYSSA NAEHER

CARLI LLOYD

CRYSTAL DUNN

Defendant / Appellee

UNITED STATES SOCCER FEDERATION, INC.

9 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Diana Hughes Leiden

Attorney at Winston & Strawn, LLP

333 S Grand Avenue, 38Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Nicole A. Saharsky

Attorney at Mayer Brown LLP

1999 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Brian David Netter

Attorney at Mayer Brown LLP

1999 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Jeanifer E. Parsigian

Attorney at Winston & Strawn, LLP

101 California Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

Jeffrey L. Kessler

Attorney at Winston & Strawn, LLP

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

David G. Feher

Attorney at Winston & Strawn, LLP

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

Michael Anthony Scodro

Attorney at Mayer Brown LLP

71 South Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60606-4637

Minh Nguyen-Dang

Attorney at Mayer Brown LLP

1999 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Carmen Longoria-Green

Attorney at Mayer Brown LLP

1999 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Michele D. Johnson

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP

650 Town Center Drive

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

 

Court Documents

14 #2

Exhibit A

14 #1

Main Document

#13

(#13) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 05/19/2021, 10:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [12100696] (CL) [Entered: 05/03/2021 05:44 PM]

#5

(#5) Filed (ECF) Appellee United States Soccer Federation, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 04/21/2021. [12082230] [21-55356] (Johnson, Michele) [Entered: 04/21/2021 12:08 PM]

#3

(#3) Filed (ECF) Appellants Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley O'Hara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan and McCall Zerboni Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 04/21/2021. [12081743] [21-55356] (Saharsky, Nicole) [Entered: 04/21/2021 08:23 AM]

1 #5

Case Opening Packet

1 #4

Mediation Questionnaire

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Filed (ECF) Appellants Morgan Brian, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley O'Hara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan and McCall Zerboni Correspondence: Notice Regarding Transcript Order. Date of service: 05/14/2021 [12113242] [21-55356] (Saharsky, Nicole) [Entered: 05/14/2021 11:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 05/19/2021, 10:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [12100696] (CL) [Entered: 05/03/2021 05:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • Docket(#12) Added Attorney(s) Carmen Longoria-Green and Minh Nguyen-Dang for party(s) Appellant Alex Morgan Appellant Kelley O'Hara Appellant Jane Campbell Appellant Rose Lavelle Appellant Mallory Pugh Appellant Morgan Brian Appellant Abby Dahlkemper Appellant Alyssa Naeher Appellant Casey Short Appellant Adrianna Franch Appellant Tobin Heath Appellant Julie Ertz Appellant Crystal Dunn Appellant Ashlyn Harris Appellant Danielle Colaprico Appellant Becky Sauerbrunn Appellant Carli Lloyd Appellant Christen Press Appellant McCall Zerboni Appellant Samantha Mewis Appellant Andi Sullivan Appellant Allie Long Appellant Lindsey Horan Appellant Merritt Mathias Appellant Jessica McDonald Appellant Megan Rapinoe Appellant Tierna Davidson Appellant Emily Sonnett. [12083391] (RL) [Entered: 04/22/2021 11:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • Docket(#11) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Carmen Longoria-Green (Mayer Brown LLP, 1999 K Street NW, Washington, DC 20006) for Appellants Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley O'Hara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan and McCall Zerboni. Date of service: 04/22/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12083370] [21-55356] (Longoria-Green, Carmen) [Entered: 04/22/2021 11:05 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • Docket(#10) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Minh Nguyen-Dang (Mayer Brown LLP, 1999 K Street NW, Washington, DC 20006) for Appellants Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley O'Hara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan and McCall Zerboni. Date of service: 04/22/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12083352] [21-55356] (Nguyen-Dang, Minh) [Entered: 04/22/2021 11:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • Docket(#9) Added Attorney(s) Michael Anthony Scodro for party(s) Appellant Alex Morgan Appellant Kelley O'Hara Appellant Jane Campbell Appellant Rose Lavelle Appellant Mallory Pugh Appellant Morgan Brian Appellant Abby Dahlkemper Appellant Alyssa Naeher Appellant Casey Short Appellant Adrianna Franch Appellant Tobin Heath Appellant Julie Ertz Appellant Crystal Dunn Appellant Ashlyn Harris Appellant Danielle Colaprico Appellant Becky Sauerbrunn Appellant Carli Lloyd Appellant Christen Press Appellant McCall Zerboni Appellant Samantha Mewis Appellant Andi Sullivan Appellant Allie Long Appellant Lindsey Horan Appellant Merritt Mathias Appellant Jessica McDonald Appellant Megan Rapinoe Appellant Tierna Davidson Appellant Emily Sonnett. [12083138] (RL) [Entered: 04/22/2021 09:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • Docket(#8) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Michael A. Scodro (Mayer Brown LLP, 71 S. Wacker Drive, Chicago, IL 60606) for Appellants Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley O'Hara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan and McCall Zerboni. Date of service: 04/22/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12083064] [21-55356] (Scodro, Michael) [Entered: 04/22/2021 08:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • Docket(#7) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 04/21/2021. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12082274]. [21-55356] (AD) [Entered: 04/21/2021 12:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • Docket(#6) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 04/21/2021. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12082271]. [21-55356] (AD) [Entered: 04/21/2021 12:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Filed (ECF) Appellee United States Soccer Federation, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 04/21/2021. [12082230] [21-55356] (Johnson, Michele) [Entered: 04/21/2021 12:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • Docket(#4) Terminated Brian David Netter for McCall Zerboni, Andi Sullivan, Emily Sonnett, Casey Short, Becky Sauerbrunn, Megan Rapinoe, Mallory Pugh, Christen Press, Kelley O'Hara, Alyssa Naeher, Alex Morgan, Samantha Mewis, Jessica McDonald, Merritt Mathias, Allie Long, Carli Lloyd, Rose Lavelle, Lindsey Horan, Tobin Heath, Ashlyn Harris, Adrianna Franch, Julie Ertz, Crystal Dunn, Tierna Davidson, Abby Dahlkemper, Danielle Colaprico, Jane Campbell and Morgan Brian. [12082218] (RL) [Entered: 04/21/2021 12:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filed (ECF) Appellants Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley O'Hara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan and McCall Zerboni Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 04/21/2021. [12081743] [21-55356] (Saharsky, Nicole) [Entered: 04/21/2021 08:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Notice of withdrawal of counsel. Filed by Attorney Brian David Netter for Appellants Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley O'Hara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan and McCall Zerboni. Party proceeding without counsel: No. Date of service: 04/20/2021. [12080797] [21-55356] (Netter, Brian) [Entered: 04/20/2021 12:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley O'Hara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan and McCall Zerboni Mediation Questionnaire due on 04/21/2021. Transcript ordered by 05/14/2021. Transcript due 06/14/2021. Appellants Morgan Brian, Jane Campbell, Danielle Colaprico, Abby Dahlkemper, Tierna Davidson, Crystal Dunn, Julie Ertz, Adrianna Franch, Ashlyn Harris, Tobin Heath, Lindsey Horan, Rose Lavelle, Carli Lloyd, Allie Long, Merritt Mathias, Jessica McDonald, Samantha Mewis, Alex Morgan, Alyssa Naeher, Kelley O'Hara, Christen Press, Mallory Pugh, Megan Rapinoe, Becky Sauerbrunn, Casey Short, Emily Sonnett, Andi Sullivan and McCall Zerboni opening brief due 07/23/2021. Appellee United States Soccer Federation, Inc. answering brief due 08/23/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12074408] (RT) [Entered: 04/14/2021 03:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michele D. Johnson