This case was last updated from PACER on 04/12/2020 at 06:06:16 (UTC).

Alex Bilbrew v. Megan Brennan, et al

Case Summary

On 02/12/2020 Alex Bilbrew filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Megan Brennan. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-55148

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant

YVONNE SMITH

Plaintiff / Appellant

ALEX BILBREW

Pacific Palisades, CA 90272

Defendant / Appellee

MEGAN J. BRENNAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Alex Bilbrew

P.O. Box 103

Pacific Palisades, CA 90272

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Aaron C.G. Carpenter

Attorney at USLA - Office of the U.S. Attorney

300 North Los Angeles Street

Los Angeles, CA 90012

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) Filed Appellant Alex Bilbrew letter dated re: Due to the National emergency the nation is facing with a very big challenge, I wish that the Court would please grant an extension for the Brief Deadline from April 15, 2020 to May 15, 2020.. Paper filing deficiency: None. [11653953] (JFF) [Entered: 04/07/2020 11:37 AM]

2 #3

Additional Document

#2

Main Document

2 #1

Fee Due OSC

1 #3

Case Opening Packet

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUpdated deadlines. Automatic 60 day extension Re: Notice Covid 19 (Docket Entry No. [ # 4 ]). Appellant Alex Bilbrew opening brief due 05/15/2020. Appellee Megan J. Brennan answering brief due 06/15/2020. The optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11655723] (EU) [Entered: 04/08/2020 03:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Filed Appellant Alex Bilbrew letter dated re: Due to the National emergency the nation is facing with a very big challenge, I wish that the Court would please grant an extension for the Brief Deadline from April 15, 2020 to May 15, 2020.. Paper filing deficiency: None. [11653953] (JFF) [Entered: 04/07/2020 11:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • Docket(#3) Received notification from District Court re: payment of docket fee. Amount Paid: USD 505.00. Date paid: 03/13/2020. [11629485] (BY) [Entered: 03/13/2020 01:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CKP): Order to show cause docket fee due [11606783] (CKP) [Entered: 02/24/2020 01:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Alex Bilbrew opening brief due 04/15/2020. Appellee Megan J. Brennan answering brief due 05/15/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11595373] (RT) [Entered: 02/12/2020 03:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.