This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 09/28/2020 at 06:15:45 (UTC).

Alejandro Rodriguez, et al v. William Barr, et al

Case Summary

On 07/30/2020 Alejandro Rodriguez, filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against William Barr,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-55770

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

 

Party Details

Petitioners

JOSE FARIAS CORNEJO

YUSSUF ABDIKADIR

ALEJANDRO RODRIGUEZ

ALEX CACHO CASTILLO, for themselves and on behalf of a class of similarly-situated individuals

ABEL PEREZ RUELAS

ANGEL ARMANDO AYALA

ABDIRIZAK ADEN FARAH

Respondents

NGUYEN, Officer-in-Charge, Theo Lacy Facility

DAVID MARIN, Field Office Director, Los Angeles District, Immigration and Customs Enforcement

LUKE SOUTH, Commander, Theo Lacy Facility

JAMES MCHENRY, Director, Executive Office for Immigration Review

DON BARNES, Sheriff of Orange County

LISA VON NORDHEIM, Captain, James A. Musick Facility

WILLIAM P. BARR, Attorney General

CHAD F. WOLF, Acting Secretary, Homeland Security

TERRY NELSEN, Assistant Field Office Director, Adelanto Detention Facility

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Zoe McKinney

Attorney at ACLU Foundation of Southern California

1313 West 8Th Street

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Peter Jay Eliasberg

Attorney at ACLU Foundation of Southern California

1313 West 8Th Street

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Michael K.T. Tan

Attorney at ACLU-American Civil Liberties Union Foundation

125 Broad Street

New York, NY 10004

Cecillia D. Wang

Attorney at American Civil Liberties Union Foundation

39 Drumm Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

Ahilan Thevanesan Arulanantham

Attorney at ACLU Foundation of Southern California

1313 West 8Th Street

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Sean Ashley Commons Esquire

Attorney at Sidley Austin LLP

555 West 5Th Street

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Michael Kaufman

Attorney at ACLU Foundation of Southern California

1313 West 8Th Street

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Jayashri Srikantiah

Attorney at Mills Legal Clinic

559 Nathan Abbott Way

Stanford, CA 94305-8610

Judy Rabinovitz

Attorney at ACLU Immigrants' Rights Project

125 Broad Street, 18Th Floor

New York, NY 10004

Respondent Attorney

Sarah Stevens Wilson

Attorney at U.S. Attorney Office

1801 Fourth Avenue North

Birmingham, AL 35203

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Case Opening Packet

#2

#3

#4

5 #1

ER Vol 1

5 #2

ER Vol 2

#6

#7

#10

#12

#13

#14

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: KWH): Briefing in this appeal is stayed pending resolution of appellees motion to dismiss. See 9th Cir. R. 27-11(a)(1). [11834520] (JBS) [Entered: 09/23/2020 02:14 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator by email should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [11833716] (VS) [Entered: 09/23/2020 08:42 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Filed (ECF) Appellees Yussuf Abdikadir, Angel Armando Ayala, Alex Cacho Castillo, Jose Farias Cornejo, Abdirizak Aden Farah, Alejandro Rodriguez and Abel Perez Ruelas Motion for miscellaneous relief [MOTION TO DISMISS APPEAL IN PART FOR LACK OF APPELLATE JURISDICTION AND TO STAY BRIEFING PENDING RESOLUTION OF THIS MOTION]. Date of service: 09/16/2020. [11826970] [20-55770] (Arulanantham, Ahilan) [Entered: 09/16/2020 06:34 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • Docket(#11) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 09/14/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11823616]. [20-55770] (AD) [Entered: 09/14/2020 06:44 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Filed (ECF) Appellees Angel Armando Ayala, Yussuf Abdikadir, Alex Cacho Castillo, Jose Farias Cornejo, Abdirizak Aden Farah, Alejandro Rodriguez and Abel Perez Ruelas Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 09/14/2020. [11823304] [20-55770] (McKinney, Zoe) [Entered: 09/14/2020 04:09 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Received 6 paper copies of excerpts of record [ # 5 ] in 2 volume(s) filed by Appellants Don Barnes, William P. Barr and David Marin. [11821943] (KWG) [Entered: 09/14/2020 09:21 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Received 6 paper copies of Opening Brief [ # 6 ] filed by appellants. [11821069] (MAE) [Entered: 09/11/2020 03:12 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Filed clerk order: The opening brief [ # 6 ] submitted by appellants is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 6 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification (attached to the end of each copy of the brief) that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: blue. The excerpts of record [ # 5 ] submitted by appellants are filed. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 3 copies of the excerpts in paper format securely bound on the left side, with white covers. The paper copies shall be submitted to the principal office of the Clerk. [11814396] (SML) [Entered: 09/04/2020 04:53 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Submitted (ECF) Opening Brief for review. Submitted by Appellants Don Barnes, William P. Barr, David Marin, James McHenry, Nguyen, Luke South, Lisa Von Nordheim and Chad F. Wolf. Date of service: 09/03/2020. [11813195] [20-55770] (Wilson, Sarah) [Entered: 09/03/2020 10:13 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Submitted (ECF) excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellants Don Barnes, William P. Barr, David Marin, James McHenry, Terry Nelsen, Nguyen, Luke South, Lisa Von Nordheim and Chad F. Wolf. Date of service: 09/03/2020. [11812756] [20-55770] (Wilson, Sarah) [Entered: 09/03/2020 03:33 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: LBS): The parties joint motion (Docket Entry No. [ # 3 ]) to modify the briefing schedule is granted. The opening brief is due September 3, 2020. The answering brief is due October 15, 2020. The optional reply brief is due November 5, 2020. [11796853] (JBS) [Entered: 08/20/2020 02:48 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filed (ECF) Appellants Don Barnes, William P. Barr, David Marin, James McHenry, Terry Nelsen, Nguyen, Luke South, Lisa Von Nordheim and Chad F. Wolf Joint Motion to extend time to file Opening brief until 09/03/2020. Date of service: 08/18/2020. [11792526] [20-55770] (Wilson, Sarah) [Entered: 08/18/2020 07:29 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: TSP): The appeal filed July 27, 2020 is a preliminary injunction appeal. Accordingly, Ninth Circuit Rule 3-3 shall apply. If they have not already done so, within 7 calendar days after the filing date of this order, the parties shall make arrangements to obtain from the court reporter an official transcript of proceedings in the district court that will be included in the record on appeal. The briefing schedule shall proceed as follows: the opening brief and excerpts of record are due not later than August 24, 2020; the answering brief is due September 21, 2020 or 28 days after service of the opening brief, whichever is earlier; and the optional reply brief is due within 21 days after service of the answering brief. See 9th Cir. R. 3-3(b). No streamlined extensions of time will be approved. See 9th Cir. R. 31-2.2(a)(3). Any request for an extension of time to file a brief must be made by written motion under Ninth Circuit Rule 31-2.2(b). Failure to file timely the opening brief shall result in the automatic dismissal of this appeal by the Clerk for failure to prosecute. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. [11773204] (JMR) [Entered: 07/31/2020 12:12 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: To be set. Preliminary Injunction Appeal, C.R. 3-3. [11771848] (JBS) [Entered: 07/30/2020 11:15 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JAMES MCHENRY, Director of the Executive Office for Immigration Review is a litigant

Latest cases where CHAD WOLF, Acting Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Kaufman

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jayashri Srikantiah